Toto, Inc. v. Sony Music Entertainment
Plaintiff: Toto, Inc.
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Not Classified By Court: Apple Inc. and UMG Recordings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013mc80168
Filed: August 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TERMINATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSTIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #27 MOTION FOR RELIEF, filed by Toto, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 20, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 27 OBJECTIONS to re #23 Order on Discovery Letter Brief /TOTO INC.'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE by Toto, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Paul H. Duvall in Support of Toto, Inc.'s Motion for Relief from Dispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, #2 Proposed Order Granting Toto Inc.'s Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu)(Duvall, Paul) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 26 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/13/2014, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Transcriber Tara Bauer/Echo Reporting Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2014. (Related documents(s) #25 , #24 ) (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 10, 2014 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Apple Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Weatherford, Victoria) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
March 5, 2014 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Toto, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Duvall, Paul) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #18 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 13, 2014 Filing 22 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD on 2/13/2014 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu (Date Filed: 2/13/2014) re #18 Joint Discovery Letter Brief(CORRECTED JOINT SECTION) filed by Toto, Inc., Apple Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc. Motion DENIED. Written Order from the Court to follow. (Recording FTR 3:36-3:44) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion #18 Joint Discovery Letter Brief(CORRECTED JOINT SECTION) : Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2014 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/16/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 16, 2014 Filing 20 Letter from UMG Recordings, Inc. requesting continuance of hearing currently scheduled for January 23, 2014. (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #18 Joint Discovery Letter Brief(CORRECTED JOINT SECTION) : Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/19/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 17, 2013 Filing 18 Joint Discovery Letter Brief(CORRECTED JOINT SECTION) filed by Apple Inc., Toto, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc.. (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc., Toto, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc.. (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda Eades LeMoine for Non-Party UMG Recordings, Inc. (LeMoine, Melinda) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 15 ***REVISED***** Transcript of electronically recorded proceedings held on October 10, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. ***To replace Docket #14. Correction to appearance on cover page.*** Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Tape Number: FTR#11:11-11:22. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (Related document(s) #13 ) (rhm) (Filed on 10/21/2013)
October 21, 2013 Filing 14 See document #15 For Corrected Entry.Transcript of FTR electronically recorded proceedings held on October 10, 20113, before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR#11:11-11:22. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2014. (Related document(s) #13 ) (rhm) (Filed on 10/21/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2013 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Toto, Inc. for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Duvall, Paul) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
October 10, 2013 Filing 12 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2013 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re #8 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Joint Discovery Letter HELD IN ABEYANCE. See minute order for particulars. (Recording #FTR 11:11-11:22.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/013) Modified on 10/11/2013 (ig, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2013 Filing 11 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Toto, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit /Attachment re December 10, 1977 Recording Agreement, #2 Exhibit /Attachment re January 27, 1983 Recording Agreement)(Duvall, Paul) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Submit Additional Information re #8 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/07/2013. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2013 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/4/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 30, 2013 Filing 8 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice #1 Motion to Quash. Joint letter due 8/30/2013.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 15, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toto, Inc. v. Sony Music Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toto, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Hamilton Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Music Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Represented By: Victoria Leigh Weatherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda Eades LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?