Symantec Corporation v. RPost Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Defendant: RPost Communications Limited, RPost Holdings, Inc., RPost International Limited and RMail Limited
Case Number: 3:2014cv00238
Filed: January 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER STAYING CASE, ***Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/24/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re 49 STIPULATION TO EXTEND SCHEDULE filed by Symantec Corporation. Markman hearing set for 12/9/2014 01:00 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/25/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/27/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C 13-5227 VC and C 14-0376 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/4/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Tutorial Hearing set for 11/21/2014 10:00 AM; Markman hearing set for 12/5/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/15/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS RPOST INTERNATIONAL LIMITED AND RMAIL LIMITED. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/29/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/8/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symantec Corporation v. RPost Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPost Communications Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPost Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPost International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMail Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symantec Corporation
Represented By: Lauren Estelle Whittemore
Represented By: David Douglas Schumann
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?