Fuapau v. Central Mortgage Company et al
Plaintiff: Talanoa Fuapau
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Central Mortgage Company and HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00421
Filed: January 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 27 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION For Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint 24 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/30/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 20 . Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/24/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuapau v. Central Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Company
Represented By: Ronald M. Arlas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank U.S.A, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talanoa Fuapau
Represented By: Eunji Cho
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?