Sciortino et al v. Pepsico, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacy Sciortino and Arielle Weinstock
Defendant: Pepsico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00478
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 142 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 141 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing Date for Motion for Preliminary Approval and Further Case Management Conference filed by Pepsico, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset from 3/24/2016 to 5/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER,granting 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing October 21 Hearing Date filed by Pepsico, Inc., Resetting Hearing as to 119 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Kelly Ree, and 125 Cross-Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Ree. Motions Hearing reset for 12/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/2/2015. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Mediation & Continuation of Class Certification Deadlines and advancing Motion to Withdraw 119 from 11/9/15 to 10/21/15 at 9:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 116 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Pepsico, Inc. filed by Pepsico, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 .STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 7/16/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/12/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 82 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint Re-setting Hearing to February 19, 2015 filed by Mary Hall, Set/Reset Deadlines as to [ 93] STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint Re-setting Hearing to February 19, 2015, 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/4/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint RE-SETTING HEARING TO FEBRUARY 12, 2015 filed by Pepsico, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint RE-SETTING HEARING TO FEBRUARY 12, 2015, 82 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Set Briefing Schedule for PepsiCo's Respone to Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Pepsico, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015. Further Case Mana gement Conference set for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/26/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Re 70 Plaintiffs' Proposed Guidelines to Limit Costs and Expenses. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/18/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER to advance status conference and continue time for defendant Pepsico, Inc. to respond to plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaint. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/17/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (44 in 3:14-cv-00478-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CONSOLIDATING CASES (except for Case Nos. C14-0713EMC and C14-2020EMC are not consolidated) filed by Mary Hall. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/20/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (39 in 3:14-cv-00478-EMC and all related cases) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Stacy Sciortino, Arielle Weinstock Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2014 01:29 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sciortino et al v. Pepsico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Sciortino
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arielle Weinstock
Represented By: William Anthony Baird
Represented By: Marcus Joseph Bradley
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Hal Davis Cunningham
Represented By: Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Represented By: Stanley Donald Saltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsico, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Chorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?