McDonald v. Forest Laboratories Inc et al
Plaintiff: Amy McDonald
Defendant: Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Forest Laboratories Inc and Brian Maeyama
Case Number: 3:2014cv00487
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 38 Stipulation filed by Amy McDonald. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/8/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Forest Laboratories Inc, Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 9/4/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Forest Laboratories Inc, Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/11/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Forest Laboratories Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. Cox
Represented By: Gary D. Friedman
Represented By: Allison Millie Warner
Represented By: Ami G. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Gary D. Friedman
Represented By: Christopher J. Cox
Represented By: Allison Millie Warner
Represented By: Ami G. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Maeyama
Represented By: Gary D. Friedman
Represented By: Allison Millie Warner
Represented By: Ami G. Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy McDonald
Represented By: Craig A. Pinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?