Kyle Hudson v. Ziebarth
Plaintiff: Kyle Hudson
Defendant: Martin Ziebarth, Roberto Ruiz, Jr and E. Martin
Case Number: 3:2014cv00620
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement until the completion of the settlement terms or by December 16, 2015, whichever comes first. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/23/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SET DATES 50 . Deadline to complete mandatory settlement conference, currently set for 2/11/2015, is continued to 3/25/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/6/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER VACATING REFERRAL to Federal Pro Bono Project 31 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/21/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 21 . Case Management Statement due by 8/20/2014. Case Management Conference set for 8/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/31/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyle Hudson v. Ziebarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Ziebarth
Represented By: Arlene Marcia Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Ruiz, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?