Perez v. Animal Clinic of Alamo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Defendant: Animal Clinic of Alamo, Inc., Deborah Knibb, John C. Baine, III and Animal Clinic of Alamo Profit Sharing Plan
Case Number: 3:2014cv00667
Filed: February 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF CROSS-CLAIMS AND THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/05/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF CASE DEADLINES re 55 Stipulation. Fact discovery deadline: 5/29/2015. Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2015 02:00 PM and Bench Trial set for 9/21/2015 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/20/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/4/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND OTHER DATES - Last day to amend pleadings: 1/12/2015. Discovery cutoff: 3/30/2015. Dispositive motions to be heard by 5/6/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2015 02:00 PM and Bench Trial set for 7/13/2015 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/30/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/28/2014. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE - Expert disclosures: 1/15/2015. Discovery (fact and expert) cutoff: 2/13/2015. Dispositive motions to be heard by 3/18/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/21/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER RE SECRETARY'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/15/2014. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Animal Clinic of Alamo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal Clinic of Alamo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Knibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Baine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Animal Clinic of Alamo Profit Sharing Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Perez
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts
Represented By: Danielle Lee Jaberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?