Roe v. Frito-Lay, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jane Roe
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00751
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE 127 MOTION TO RELATE CASES. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 108 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 109 MOTION FOR CLASS COUNSELS ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REGARDING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE FAIRNESS HEARING AND AMENDED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/12/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 105 Stipulation for a Schedule of Dates, Approving Revised Class Notice and Filing of a Supplemental Stipulation and Settlement Agreement re 103 Order on Motion for Settlement. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Plaintiff's 86 Motion for Sanctions. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 100 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 89 Stipulated Request for Order Finding Good Cause to Take Depositions Past the Currently-Scheduled Discovery Cut-Off. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re Unusable Chambers Copies of Plaintiff's 86 MOTION for Sanctions against Defendant Frito-Lay, Inc., filed by Jane Roe. Plaintiff shall lodge a usable copy by May 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Kandis A.Westmore on 5/2/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 82 Discovery Letter Brief re: 30(b)(6) Deposition and Additional Interrogatories. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 83 Discovery Letter Brief re: Fenton deposition. (kawlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore regarding 75 , 76 Joint Discovery Letter Briefs. Defendant to furnish supplemental responses by 3/11/2016.(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 73 Stipulated Request to Change Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating Plaintiff's 68 Discovery Letter Brief. The parties are ordered to meet and confer. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/6/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 62 Motion to Appear by Telephone for the January 5, 2015 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Motion to Appear by Telephone at the 1/5/16 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 55 Motion to Appear by Telephone AT THE HEARING FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582- 6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 48 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference on September 29, 2015. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation re 44 for a 14-day continuance to file a motion for preliminary approval.(terminated as moot 46 Motion to Appear by Telephone) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Motions due by 9/4/2015; Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2015 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/31/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2015)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. RE CASE DEADLINES RE 36 .(terminating 35 Stipulation, refilled as docket no. 36 ) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION to Extend Trial & All Related Dates. Class Discovery due by 5/22/2015. Fact and Expert Discovery due by 2/5/2016. Hearing on Motion for Class Certification set for 8/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor , Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Ho n. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Selection set for 7/27/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 8/1/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/30/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/29/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/28/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Frito-Lay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Roe
Represented By: Devin Heng Fok
Represented By: Joshua E. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito-Lay, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha D. Hardy
Represented By: Ashley Teiko Hirano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?