Seraphin v. The Mens Wearhouse
Plaintiff: Dominique Seraphin
Defendant: The Mens Wearhouse
Case Number: 3:2014cv00752
Filed: February 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation for Dismissal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 14 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration by Dominique Seraphin filed by Dominique Seraphin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 22, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 11 MOTION to Dismiss / Stay Further Court Proceedings filed by The Mens Wearhouse. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/13/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seraphin v. The Mens Wearhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mens Wearhouse
Represented By: Rachel Fischetti
Represented By: Bonnie A. Glatzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Seraphin
Represented By: Bailey Bifoss
Represented By: Stephen R. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?