Robinson v. Open Top Sightseeing San Francisco, LLC

Plaintiff: Harold C. Robinson, Jr.
Defendant: Open Top Sightseeing San Francisco, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00852
Filed: February 26, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 249 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 240 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 239 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/14/2018. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 235 NOTICE RE EXHIBIT 11. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/17/2017. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 200 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 166 Defendant's Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 168 Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 154 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 135 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 133 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 151 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 146 Motion to Compel Discovery.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 137 ORDER Moving Hearing Date re 135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Open Top Sightseeing San Francisco, LLC, 133 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Harold C. Robinson, Jr. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 04/03/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 127 Order Regarding Discovery Deadlines by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton re: 126 Stipulation.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 111 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 107 Motion to Certify Class.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order 103 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 102 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/25/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order 95 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 74 Motion to Certify Class (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order 90 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 82 Motion (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2015)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order 51 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 46 Motion as modified by the court (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2014)
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order 38 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 32 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 7 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2014 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/21/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/6/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Open Top Sightseeing San Francisco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Top Sightseeing San Francisco, LLC
Represented By: Eileen Marie Hansen
Represented By: Michael Paul Purcell
Represented By: Antonio Valla, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold C. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole E. Forde
Represented By: Steven Gregory Tidrick
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?