Karl Storz Endoscopy-America, Inc. v. Stryker Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Karl Storz Endoscopy-America, Inc.
Defendant: Stryker Corporation and Stryker Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00876
Filed: February 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part 380 Motion to Strike ; granting 393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part 397 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 412 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 410 Motion for Third Supplemental Amendment to Second Further Case Management Scheduling Order AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Motions Hearing set for 9/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/3/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 371 AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 359 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 360 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 365 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 335 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 336 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; granting in part and denying in part 342 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 322 KSEA's Motion to Compel Interrogatory Responses and For Sanctions. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL ATTORNEY WORK PRODUCT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/8/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S 5TH SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORY NO. 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/5/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 261 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Dkt. Nos. 254 & 255 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/17/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 252 TO AMEND SECOND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference 9/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/15/2018 at 09:00 AM in Co urtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 236 Motion for Leave TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 233 Motion ; denying 236 Motion for Leave to File. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Redacted ORDER RE: MOTION TO RETAIN CONFIDENTIALITY DESIGNATIONS AND ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/23/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER ALLOWING EQUIPMENT IN COURTROOM FOR TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL HEARING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part 167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 168 Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/10/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 184 To Change The Date Of The Claim Construction Hearing And To Extend The Deadling To File Responsive Claim Construction Briefs. Claim Construction Hearing set for 6/6/2016 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/25/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016) Modified on 4/25/2016 (cl, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 162 To Alter The Deadline To File A Motion To Retain Confidentiality Designations Under The Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/24/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline for Simultaneous Opening ClaimConstruction Briefs and Supporting Evidence 4/15/2016. Deadline for Simultaneous Responsive Claim Construction Briefs 4/29/2016. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/9/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Markman hearing set for 5/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on February 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re 132 withdrawal of Attorney Gregory Joseph Vogler. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 149 Motion to Lift Stay (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER ALTERING PATENT L.R. 4-4 DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE TIME ON TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/15/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claim Construction Hearing set for 4/24/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/24/2015.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 PROTECTIVE ORDER for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets re 113 Proposed Order filed by Karl Storz Endoscopy-America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/4/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015) Modified on 2/4/2015 (cl, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER ALTERING DEADLINES RELATED TO PATENT L.R. 4-4 AND 4-5(a). Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND TO COMPLY WITH PATENT L.R. 4-3. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/22/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014) Modified on 12/22/2014 (cl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/21/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Stipulation and Order Re [#87] To Hear Plaintiffs Motion To Strike And Dismiss On Shortened Time. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/2/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Stipulation and order re: 79 for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Two Pending Motions to Strike and Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 76, 77) Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/11/14. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Moot as to 39 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 54 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 61 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE AND DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Tutorial Hearing set for 3/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/20/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/9/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FIRST EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE BRIEFING FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/28/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/17/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karl Storz Endoscopy-America, Inc. v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Storz Endoscopy-America, Inc.
Represented By: Alfredo A. Bismonte
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Duggan
Represented By: Michael J Kosma
Represented By: Michael A Lavine
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Represented By: Benjamin C White
Represented By: Wesley W Whitmyer
Represented By: Kimberly Paul Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: William R. Overend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Communications, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Overend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?