Verde Media Corp. v. Levi et al
Plaintiff: Verde Media Corp.
Defendant: Ron Levi, Ardeshir S. Akhavan, Harklet Enterprises, Ltd., Nunaton Company, Ltd., Internet Business Services, LLC, Nautell Capital Ltd., Cash Traffic Ltd. and Alacre Trading Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00891
Filed: February 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 94 Motion to Dismiss (ygrlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion To Extend Deadline for Service. The 3/17/2015 Hearing is vacated. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/9/2015 is CONTINUED to Monday, 3/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/3/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 33 Motion to Dismiss; granting 38 Motion to Dismiss; granting 39 Motion to Dismiss; granting 50 Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO NOVEMBER 17, 2014 (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE: MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS AND/OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER 56 by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER, Set Deadlines as to 56 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas and/or for Protective Order . Motion Hearing reset to 8/28/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/25/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER STRIKING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY KRISTI LUHAR re 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kristi Luhar. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/30/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as moot 40 Motion to Appear by Telephone; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Quash; granting 27 Motion to Extend Deadline for Service of Summons and Complaint. The Court VACATES the hearing set for Friday, July 11, 2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 19 Motion to Dismiss as moot (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by The Executive Committee, on 3/13/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verde Media Corp. v. Levi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verde Media Corp.
Represented By: Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Represented By: Virginia Anne Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Levi
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardeshir S. Akhavan
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harklet Enterprises, Ltd.
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nunaton Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internet Business Services, LLC
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautell Capital Ltd.
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash Traffic Ltd.
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alacre Trading Ltd.
Represented By: Ira P. Rothken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?