Perez et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Monique Perez, Thaxton Rowe, Porcelynne Hawthorne, Corry A Williams, Elizabeth Villa-Montes, Karla Salazar, Brian Lynch, Sezgin Unay, John Sorocenski, Brandon Grzan, John Lynch, Jason L. Hoffman and Sona K. Anand
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., WFC Holdings Corporation, Wachovia Corporation, Wachovia Bank, N.A. and Does 1-50, Inclusive
Case Number: 3:2014cv00989
Filed: March 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 153 Motion to Certify Class; granting 158 Stipulation; ranting 165 Stipulation; granting 168 Administrative Motion. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re 159 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Wachovia Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/10/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 151 Discovery Letter Brief (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 141 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/20/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Hamilton terminating 102 Motion to Sever and Transfer, 107 Motion for Leave to File, Motion for Leave to File; deferring ruling on 120 Motion to Sever and denying 120 Motion to Transfer; granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion to Strike (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/24/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 93 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 73 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore terminating 57 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating 58 Discovery Letter Brief upon the request of the parties. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/14/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re Chambers Copy of 41 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Wachovia Bank, N.A., WFC Holdings Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company, Wachovia Corporation. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/18/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 MOTION to Certify Class for FLSA Conditional Certification and Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Thaxton Rowe. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/26/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/5/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/12/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique Perez
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaxton Rowe
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porcelynne Hawthorne
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corry A Williams
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Villa-Montes
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Salazar
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lynch
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sezgin Unay
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sorocenski
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Grzan
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lynch
Represented By: John Manuel Padilla
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Hoffman
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sona K. Anand
Represented By: Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFC Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?