Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and ATI Technologies ULC
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. and LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv01012
Filed: March 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/16/17. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR LETTER ROGATORY 242 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY 240 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION 237 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER DENYING MSILICON'S MOTION TO QUASH (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING AMD'S MOTION SEEKING PERMISSION TO DISCLOSE SOURCE CODE AND TECHNICAL DOCUMENTS 208 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 184 188 201 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER RE: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING AND USE EQUIPMENT AND PROCEDURE FOR TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING 165 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS 128 153 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 145 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING FURTHER DEADLINES 106 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF JOINT STATUS REPORT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY re 67 , 78 , 90 , 97 . The parties shall file a joint status report within seven days of the PTO issuing its decision on whether to institute the IPRs challenging the patents-in-suit, informing the Court of the PTOs decision. In addition, every 90 days the parties shall file a joint status report advising as to the status of the IPR proceeding. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER, Motions terminated: 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Rescheduling of Further CMC and Motion Hearing from January 30 to February 13, 2015 filed by ATI Technologies ULC, LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics U. S.A., Inc., LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc., Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/15 is continued to 2/13/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/8/15. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DENYNG AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS 49 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 51 Stipulation re: Discovery (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CORRECTED ORDER, Motions terminated: 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Rescheduling of July 11, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by ATI Technologies ULC, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/14 is continued to 7/18/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/6/14 is continued to 7/11/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14., Motions terminated: 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Rescheduling of June 6, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by ATI Technologies ULC, Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGE ILLSTON'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/19/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. et al v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Culpepper
Represented By: Logan Drew
Represented By: Aaron R Fahrenkrog
Represented By: William H. Manning
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Richard M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ATI Technologies ULC
Represented By: John Scott Culpepper
Represented By: Logan Drew
Represented By: Aaron R Fahrenkrog
Represented By: William H. Manning
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Richard M. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Mobilecomm U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?