Fernandez v. D. Scott Carruthers
Plaintiff: Sergio Fernandez
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers
Case Number: 3:2014cv01151
Filed: March 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/20/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
July 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 26 Stipulation Allowing Plaintiff to file First Amended Complaint.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 19 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation, to be completed no later than September 22, 2014.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/6/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. D. Scott Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Fernandez
Represented By: Crosby Scott Connolly
Represented By: Robert L. Hyde
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?