LocusPoint Networks, LLC v. D.T.V. LLC
Plaintiff: LocusPoint Networks, LLC
Defendant: D.T.V. LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv01278
Filed: March 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF LOCUSPOINT NETWORKS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT RE THIRD-PARTY APPOINTMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/8/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 88 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 94 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 70 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by D.T.V. LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/16/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2015)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 FIRST AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/9/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Please disregard - duplicate of Dkt. No. 51
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Stipulation to continue mediation deadline filed by LocusPoint Networks, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/21/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on August 7, 2014. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. (jsclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
June 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 23 Supplemental Brief filed by D.T.V. LLC. Defense counsel Charles Tweedy may appear by phone for the motion hearing scheduled for June 19, 2014 at 9:00 a.m.. Counsel/parties shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make arrangements to appear by telephone. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/18/14. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE: JUNE 19, 2014 HEARING AND JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/17/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LocusPoint Networks, LLC v. D.T.V. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LocusPoint Networks, LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Andrew Bednark
Represented By: Mark E Berghausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.T.V. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?