Saba v. UNISYS Corporation
Plaintiff: Fadi Saba
Defendant: UNISYS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv01310
Filed: March 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER REGARDING SABA'S 169 RESPONSE TO TAXATION OF COSTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/18/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING 163 MOTION TO REVIEW COSTS by Hon. William H. Orrick. Unisys's motion to review costs is GRANTED. It is entitled to an additional $72.00 to reflect copying costs that the clerk disallowed, and to $5,095.76 in costs for videotaping the two expert depositions. It is not entitled to additional costs for the videotaped depositions or the process servers' fees. Saba's 162 letter (construed as a motion to compel) is DENIED. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING 135 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED PRO SE. Wisch shall immediately serve Saba with this Order and underscore the importance of filing any post judgment motions or notice of appeal, if desired, in a timely manner. This Order does not enlarge the time for Saba to file any pleadings or notices. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/6/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING 76 UNISYS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING 75 SABA'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Unisys's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Saba's motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED.Two we eks after the motions for summary judgment were submitted at oral argument, Saba filed a substitution of counsel form and requested a temporary stay. In light of this Order, Saba's request for a temporary stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 91 Motion Relief from Nondispositive Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER 73 Settlement Conference Continued to 9/11/2015 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on May 13, 2015. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 67 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER on Joint Discovery Letters 56 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re after acquired evidence filed by Fadi Saba, 61 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re: Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Discovery Requests filed by UNISYS Corporation, 63 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Aetna subpoena filed by Fadi Saba. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/24/2015. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
December 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DATE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. Mediation deadline extended to 2/6/2015. Non-expert Discovery deadline: 3/11/2015. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 4/15/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/29/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 35 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part 30 Discovery Letter Brief. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/19/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/25/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saba v. UNISYS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNISYS Corporation
Represented By: Steven R. Blackburn
Represented By: Andrew Jonathon Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fadi Saba
Represented By: Charles Jerome Wisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?