Fitness Anywhere LLC v. Woss Enterprises LLC
Plaintiff: Fitness Anywhere LLC
Defendant: Woss Enterprises LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv01725
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER ENTERING PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT WOSS ENTERPRISES LLC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER GRANTING 281 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF 149 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 122 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO INVALIDITY OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,806,814. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/25/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING 281 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON THE FINDING OF INVALIDITY OF THE 814 PATENT; SETTING OCTOBER 24, 2018 DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/10/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER GRANTING 274 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANT BY BRUCKER AND KIPPERMAN; VACATING DECEMBER 13, 2018 HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/9/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER DENYING 247 FITNESS ANYWHERE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/8/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER APPROVING 200 JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/7/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER REGARDING 156 157 158 159 160 163 168 171 172 173 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER DENYING 181 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/24/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER DENYING 151 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/7/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 122 WOSS'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, (2) DENYING AS MOOT 132 FITNESS ANYWHERE'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND (3) DENYING 110 FITNESS ANYWHERE'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/23/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO BRING ACCUSED PRODUCT SST SUSPENSION TRAINER TO HEARING ON JUNE 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/27/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER CLARIFYING DATES REGARDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/16/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER REGARDING 115 UNREDACTED VERSIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND EXHIBIT G. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/12/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER STRIKING OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND DECLARATIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/9/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Order on 83 Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Itemized Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/9/15. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/3/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NOS. 7,044,896; 7,806,814; AND 8,043,197. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/19/2015. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 63 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/19/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING 82 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 7/2/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER STRIKING MOTION FOR NON-COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES, re: 77 Motion for Relief. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 6/25/2015. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/11/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Its Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/1/2015. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Approving 39 Amended Joint Case Management Statement. The proposed schedule at Exhibit A is approved and shall be the case schedule through claim construction. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 10/14/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Counterclaims. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order Striking 25 Amended Counterclaim, With Directions to Defendant; Terminating 20 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant shall file Answer and Amended Counterclaim within seven (7) days of the date of this order. Plaintiff shall have until 8/22/2014 to respond to Defendant's Amended Counterclaim. Signed by Hon. Beth Labson Freeman on 8/4/2014. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitness Anywhere LLC v. Woss Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitness Anywhere LLC
Represented By: Ayse Kuzucuoglu
Represented By: Heather Murray Sager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woss Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?