Randy Stevens, et al -v- Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Randy Stevens and Elissa Stevens
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2014cv02043
Filed: May 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/5/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 Letter, filed by Randy Stevens, Elissa Stevens. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/3/2015. Plaintiffs must file their opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by August 12, 2015. Defendant must file its reply by August 19, 2015. A hearing on Defendant's motion for summary judgment will be held at 10AM on August 31, 2015 in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco Courthouse.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Partial Summary Judgment filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Any papers in opposition to the Motion shall be served and filed on or before two (2) d ays after Mr. Spohn is released from the hospital and returns to work; and any reply papers in support of the Motion shall be served and filed on or before seven (7) days after Plaintiffs file their Opposition. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/17/2015. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 33 Stipulation Re: Request for Extension of Deadline for Filing of Dispositive Motions. The Motion Hearing is reset for 7/31/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/14/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2015)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 02/19/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Scheduling of Cross Motions for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/19/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/3/14. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Motions for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 09/03/2014. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Samuel Conti. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/5/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randy Stevens, et al -v- Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Sheila Thompson Addiego
Represented By: Jonathan Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Stevens
Represented By: Vincent M. Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elissa Stevens
Represented By: Vincent M. Spohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?