Crago et al v. Mitsubishi Electric Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Crago, Arch Electronics, Inc, Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Nathan Muchnick, Inc., Princeton Display Technologies, Inc., Radio & TV Equipment, Inc, Studio Spectrum, Inc., Wettstein and Sons, Inc, Christopher Donnelly, Christopher Wirth, Jimmy Jahar Thule, Edward Breivik, Ramzi Yusef and Richard Reid
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corporation, Technicolor USA, Inc., Technicolor SA, Videocon Industries, Ltd., Technologies Displays Americas LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc and Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc.
Miscellaneous: Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI Malaysia Sdn. Bhd., Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V., Samsung SDI Brasil, Ltda, Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Hitachi Ltd., Hitachi Displays, Ltd. nka Japan Display Inc., Hitachi America, Ltd., Hitachi Asia, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices USA, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C., Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc. and Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Special_master: Vaughn R. Walker
Case Number: 3:2014cv02058
Filed: May 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER SETTING TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 14 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 04/04/2008. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crago et al v. Mitsubishi Electric Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crago
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Richard Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arch Electronics, Inc
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meijer, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meijer Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Muchnick, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Display Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radio & TV Equipment, Inc
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Jason Kilene
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cathy K. Smith
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Studio Spectrum, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wettstein and Sons, Inc
Represented By: Christopher L. Lebsock
Represented By: Michael Paul Lehmann
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Geoffrey Conrad Rushing
Represented By: Guido Saveri
Represented By: R Alexander Saveri
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Jahar Thule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Breivik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramzi Yusef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Corporation
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Gabriel A. Fuentes
Represented By: Molly McGrail Powers
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Shaun M. Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technicolor SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Videocon Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technologies Displays Americas LLC
Represented By: Nathan Lane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Represented By: Charles M Malaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Electronics North America Corporation
Represented By: Charles M Malaise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric Visual Solutions America, Inc
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Gabriel A. Fuentes
Represented By: Molly McGrail Powers
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Shaun M. Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Electric US, Inc.
Represented By: Michael T. Brody
Represented By: Gabriel A. Fuentes
Represented By: Molly McGrail Powers
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Shaun M. Van Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Samsung SDI America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Samsung SDI Malaysia Sdn. Bhd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Samsung SDI Mexico S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Samsung SDI Brasil, Ltda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Shenzen Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Tianjin Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Hitachi Ltd.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Hitachi Displays, Ltd. nka Japan Display Inc.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Hitachi America, Ltd.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Hitachi Asia, Ltd.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Hitachi Electronic Devices USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Toshiba America, Inc.
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Toshiba America Consumer Products, L.L.C.
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Dana E. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Vaughn R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?