Salazar et al v. McDonald's Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Salazar, Genoveva Lopez and Judith Zarate
Defendant: McDonald's Corp., McDonald's U.S.A., LLC, McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc. and Bobby O. Haynes Sr. and Carol R. Haynes Family Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2014cv02096
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 276 AMENDED ORDER OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/28/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 269 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 268 Regarding Briefing and Hearing Schedule. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg ORDER DENYING 251 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND GRANTING 253 PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 195 Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Motions Related to Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/26/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re 97 to remove incorrectly filed documents. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/10/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 78 joint motion to modify order regarding briefing and hearing schedule for McDonald's defendants' motion for summary judgment and plaintiffs' motion for class certification as modified by the court.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Discovery Order re: 75 Discovery Letter Brief, 72 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/25/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Discovery Order Reinstating Meet and Confer set for 2/17/2016 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/16/2016. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Discovery Order re: 70 . Discovery Meet and Confer set for 2/17/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/2/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR MCDONALDS DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/8/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/10/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO SET CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MODIFY THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/23/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salazar et al v. McDonald's Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Salazar
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Matthew J. Murray
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Joseph Marc Sellers
Represented By: Abigail Evans Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genoveva Lopez
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Matthew J. Murray
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Joseph Marc Sellers
Represented By: Abigail Evans Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Zarate
Represented By: Barbara Jane Chisholm
Represented By: Matthew J. Murray
Represented By: Patrick Casey Pitts
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Joseph Marc Sellers
Represented By: Abigail Evans Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corp.
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Restaurants of California, Inc.
Represented By: Fred W. Alvarez
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby O. Haynes Sr. and Carol R. Haynes Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Regina Alvinette Petty
Represented By: Alice Shelor Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?