American Small Business League v. Department of Defense
Plaintiff: American Small Business League
Defendant: Department of Defense
Case Number: 3:2014cv02166
Filed: May 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/23/2018. Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER RE 127 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER DENYING 104 STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE by Judge William Alsup [granting 75 Motion to Intervene]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REQUEST FOR STATUS UPDATE REGARDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/12/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER STAYING RULING PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/21/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 36 MOTION TO INTERVENE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE 31 MOTION TO STAY PENDING APPEAL DETERMINATION BY SOLICITOR GENERAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
November 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING 18 , 20 CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2014).
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE REQUESTED DOCUMENT AND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/6/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014).
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE RE ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/4/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014).
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/1/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Small Business League v. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Small Business League
Represented By: Robert E. Belshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?