Koller v. Med Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott Koller
Defendant: Med Foods, Inc. and Deoleo USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02400
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 179 Re: Distribution of Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/14/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 141 To Continue Case Deadlines Pending Continued Settlement Negotiations filed by Scott Koller. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/9/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER 139 to Continue Case Deadlines Pending Continued Settlement Negotiations. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/20/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 135 Continuing Hearing and CMC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 129 TO CONTINUE DEADLINES PENDING CONTINUED SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 126 Continuing Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/16/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Amended Letter of Request. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 15, 2017. Defendants may arrange with the Court to obtain the original bearing the Court's seal. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2017)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/19/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 82 Motion to Lift Stay. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 70 Motion to Stay (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 63 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; conditionally granting 64 Motion for Letter of Request. Deoleo shall file unredacted documents and corrected letter no earlier than 11/23/2015 and no later than 11/30/2015. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RESETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/12/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2015)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE ADMINISTRATIVE MATTERS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/3/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER re 53 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Deoleo USA, Inc., Med Foods, Inc. Discovery Hearing (lead trial counsel meet and confer), set for 4/10/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/9/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/8/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/14/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/3/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/24/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/4/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koller v. Med Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Koller
Represented By: Adam Gutride
Represented By: Marie Ann McCrary
Represented By: Seth Adam Safier
Represented By: Kristen Gelinas Simplicio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deoleo USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?