Luis Colom v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Plaintiff: Luis Colom
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02410
Filed: May 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against Luis Colom. The above-titled action is hereby DISMISSED, without further leave to amend. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The First Amended Complaint is dismissed. If plaintiff wishes to amend, plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than November 7, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 20, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 26, 2014 to January 16, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 22, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Court sets August 25, 2014 as the deadline for defendant to file a response to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE; STAYING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counsel for plaintiff and for defendant shall participate in a telephone conference, to be scheduled by the ADR Unit as soon as possible but no later than August 22, 2014. The deadline for defendant to file a response to plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is stayed, pending further order of the Court. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 29, 2014 to September 26, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 28, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. The complaint is dismissed. If plaintiff wishes to amend, plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint no later than July 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 25, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF SPECIFIED FILINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 13, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/2/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/27/14. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis Colom v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Jon David Ives
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Colom
Represented By: Arasto Farsad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?