Genetic Technologies Limited v. Natera Inc.
Plaintiff: Genetic Technologies Limited
Defendant: Natera Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv02448
Filed: May 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE Of Continuance of Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Settlement Conference is continued to 9/29/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2014)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AND DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genetic Technologies Limited v. Natera Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genetic Technologies Limited
Represented By: Benjamin Baughman Lieb
Represented By: Benjamin B. Lieb
Represented By: Raymond H. Lemisch
Represented By: Robert R. Brunelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natera Inc.
Represented By: Pilar Gabrielle Kraman
Represented By: William Paul Schuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?