Hung Duong v. ITT Educational Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hung Duong
Defendant: Sam Russell, ITT Educational Services, Inc. and Allison Hawkins
Case Number: 3:2014cv02653
Filed: June 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 13 Motion to Transfer Case (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 9 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/7/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Defendants must show cause why this action should not be remanded to state court within fourteen days of this order. Plaintiff's response due within seven days of defendants submission. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/16/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hung Duong v. ITT Educational Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Russell
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Represented By: Joseph Lawrence John Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Educational Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Represented By: Joseph Lawrence John Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Hawkins
Represented By: Joseph Lawrence John Appel
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hung Duong
Represented By: Kevin Michael Schwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?