Mackensen v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Ken Mackensen
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv02812
Filed: June 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 15 Motion to Dismiss (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PRETRIAL ORDER. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/22/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley dismissing 9 Motion to Dismiss as moot.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: To be scheduled by the ADR Unit as soon as possible but no later than 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/23/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackensen v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Macey Amy Chan
Represented By: Howard Dorsey Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Mackensen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Adelaars
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?