UNUM Life Insurance Company of America v. Pauu
Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Sione Pauu
Case Number: 3:2014cv02960
Filed: June 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 4/24/2015 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing by 4/17/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/12/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 32 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for TRO and/or Preliminary Injunction. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/30/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/15/2014. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 24 Stipulation to Permit Defendant to Delay Filing of Responsive Pleading to Attempt Informal Discovery and Resolution. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for MONDAY, 10/6/2014 02:01 PM. Show Cause Response due by 9:00am on Monday, 10/6/2014. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/1/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America v. Pauu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Grant Edward Ingram
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sione Pauu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?