O. Matthew Thomas v. San Francisco Travel Association
Plaintiff: O. Matthew Thomas
Defendant: San Francisco Travel Association
Case Number: 3:2014cv03043
Filed: July 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 55 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 5/6/2016 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/22/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 47 Motion to Amend/Correct. Defendant shall submit a proposed form of judgment, approved as to form by plaintiff, within five(5) business days. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/20/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR WITHDRAWAL BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE 24 27 DECLARATIONS AND RECUSAL. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/24/2015. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O. Matthew Thomas v. San Francisco Travel Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O. Matthew Thomas
Represented By: Stephen Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Travel Association
Represented By: Jamie L. Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?