Maxwell et al v. MOAB Investment Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawn R. Maxwell and Morris S. Maxwell
Defendant: Daniel Rosenbledt, Mohammed Rezaian and MOAB Investment Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv03095
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2016 Filing 31 CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #30 USCA Mandate (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 30 MANDATE of USCAThe judgment of this Court, entered January 28, 2016, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court. FOR THE COURT; as to #22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 29 USCA Memorandum : AFFIRMED; as to #22 Notice of Appeal, filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
April 21, 2015 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT OF THE PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL SOUND RECORDING - FTR: 2:14-2:18 held on 09/17/14, before Judge William H. Orrick. Transcriber Kelly Polvi, Telephone number 503.779.7406; kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR: 2:14-2:18. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #27 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2015. (Related documents(s) #27 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 4/21/2015)
April 10, 2015 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for the 9/17/14 hearing held before Judge Orrick FTR: 2:14-2:18=4 minutes by Shawn R. Maxwell for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
December 23, 2014 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 34611101656 re #22 Notice of Appeal filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell, #26 USCA Order(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER of USCA A review of the docket reflects that appellants have not paid the docketing and filing fees for this appeal. Within 21 days from the date of this order, appellants shall:(1) file a motion with the court to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Pay $505.00 to the District Court as the docketing and filing fees for this appeal and provide proof of payment to this court; or (3) otherwise show cause why the appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute; as to #22 Notice of Appeal filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
November 26, 2014 Filing 25 USCA Case Number 14-17334 USCA for #22 Notice of Appeal filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 Filing 23 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case, #19 ($505.00 Appeal FEE PAID.) Receipt Number 34611101656 14-17334 (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014) Modified on 12/23/2014 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2014 Filing 21 Proposed Order re #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DECLARING PLAINTIFFS VEXATIOUS LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/24/2014. Morris Sylvester Maxwell and Shawn R. Maxwell are enjoined from filing any action in the United States District Court for the Northern District of California concerning the foreclosure on, or their eviction from, the property located at 318 Poinsetta Avenue, San Mateo, California, without first obtaining leave of the Court. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 17, 2014 Filing 18 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2014 before William H. Orrick re #15 MOTION for Sanctions. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter FTR 2:14-2:18) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/17/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2014 Filing 17 OPPOSITION (re #15 MOTION for Sanctions Declare Plaintiffs Vexatious Litigants )& NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; filed byMorris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND RESETTING HEARING DATE - Plaintiffs must Show Cause by filing a response to the sanctions motion on or before 8/27/2014. The #12 motion to dismiss is DENIED as MOOT in light of the voluntary dismissal of this case. Deadlines rescheduled as to #15 MOTION for Sanctions. Response due by 8/27/2014. Reply due by 9/3/2014. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014) Modified on 9/8/2014 to note disposition of Dkt. 12. (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2014 Filing 15 MOTION for Sanctions Declare Plaintiffs Vexatious Litigants filed by MOAB Investment Group, LLC, Mohammed Rezaian, Daniel Rosenbledt. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/31/2014. Replies due by 8/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cruz Keith, Brenda) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by MOAB Investment Group, LLC, Mohammed Rezaian, Daniel Rosenbledt (Cruz Keith, Brenda) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MOAB Investment Group, LLC, Mohammed Rezaian, Daniel Rosenbledt. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 7/31/2014. Replies due by 8/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cruz Keith, Brenda) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/17/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 11, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Hon. William H. Orrick denying #3 Motion for TRO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE. The case shall be reassigned to Judge Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/09/2014. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 8 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:13-cv-03957-WHO. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/9/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2014: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2014 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick #9 . Judge Hon. James Donato no longer assigned to the case. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MOAB Investment Group, LLC, Mohammed Rezaian, Daniel Rosenbledt. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 Notice of Lis Pendens, #1 Complaint, #5 Proposed Order (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 5 Proposed Order re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Morris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2014 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2014 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
July 8, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MOAB Investment Group, LLC, Mohammed Rezaian, Daniel Rosenbledt (Filing fee $ 400 #34611097403). Filed byMorris S. Maxwell, Shawn R. Maxwell. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2014: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2015: #2 Receipt) (aaa, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxwell et al v. MOAB Investment Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn R. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris S. Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rosenbledt
Represented By: Brenda Cruz Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Rezaian
Represented By: Brenda Cruz Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOAB Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Brenda Cruz Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?