Walker et al v. Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company, Financial Indemnity Company and Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Michael Walker and Tashell Mitchel
Case Number: 3:2014cv03161
Filed: July 11, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2016 136 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Financial Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
March 28, 2016 134 Opinion or Order of the Court 90-day Conditional Dismissal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/28/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 22, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Use of Written Discovery Responses. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE COURT'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 2, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Pretrial Filings. Plaintiff shall file all required pretrial filings by 5:00 p.m., March 3, 2016, or he shall be sanctioned. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/2/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
November 25, 2015 83 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Expert Discovery filed by Michael Walker. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
October 19, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) to Continue Deadline to File Discovery Motions filed by Financial Indemnity Company Discovery due by 10/22/2015. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/15. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 29, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 69 Defendant's Leave to Amend. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
August 13, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by Financial Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
June 5, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
January 5, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of (1) All Claims of Plaintiff Tashell Mitchel, and (2) Defendants Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company, and Unitrin Direct Property and Casualty Company; [Proposed] Order filed by Financial Indemnity Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
September 24, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Financial Indemnity Company, Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company filed by Financial Indemnity Company, Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company, Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
July 31, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/31/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitrin Auto & Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kara Louise DiBiasio, Esq.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Francis Hardiman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Lauren Lynn O'Brien(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Indemnity Company
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kara Louise DiBiasio, Esq.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Francis Hardiman(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Lauren Lynn O'Brien(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unitrin Direct Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kara Louise DiBiasio, Esq.(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Walker
Represented By: John F. Vannucci(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashell Mitchel
Represented By: John F. Vannucci(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?