Asante et al v. California Department of Health Care Services et al
Plaintiff: Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Clark County, Nevada, Asante, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Mountainveiw Hosptial, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, University Medical Center, University Medical Center of Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Renown Regional Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC and Sparks Family Hospital, Inc.
Defendant: Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services and Jennifer Kent
Case Number: 3:2014cv03226
Filed: July 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Filing 188 Costs Taxed in amount of $1,740.80 Re: #179 Bill of Costs against Plaintiffs. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 187 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/1/2018. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #181 Defendants' Motion for Entry of Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2018 re #181 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Upon Ninth Circuits Reversal and Issuance of Mandate filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services, Jennifer Kent. Under submission.Total Time in Court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Pam Hebel. Plaintiff Attorney: Mike Sorgen and Thomas Weiss. Defendant Attorney: Joshua Sondheimer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2018)
July 4, 2018 Filing 184 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #181 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Upon Ninth Circuits Reversal and Issuance of Mandate ) filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dean L. Johnson and Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 7/4/2018)
June 21, 2018 Filing 183 Proposed Order re #181 MOTIONfor Entry of Judgment Upon Ninth Circuits Reversal and Issuance of Mandate by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas, Jennifer Kent. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/21/2018) Modified on 6/25/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2018 Filing 182 Declaration of JOSHUA SONDHEIMER in Support of #181 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Upon Ninth Circuits Reversal and Issuance of Mandate filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas, Jennifer Kent. (Related document(s) #181 ) (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/21/2018) Modified on 6/25/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2018 Filing 181 MOTION for Entry of Judgment Upon Ninth Circuits Reversal and Issuance of Mandate; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas, Jennifer Kent. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 7/5/2018. Replies due by 7/12/2018. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/21/2018) Modified on 6/25/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2018 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/7/2018. Defendant's Motion to dismiss due: 6/21/18. Responses due by 7/5/2018. No reply. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M. Chen. FTR Time: 10:39-11:16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 179 BILL OF COSTS by California Department of Health Care Services. Objections due by 6/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 178 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed pursuant to Court Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (Docket Nos. 120 and 121) against California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. Filed byValley Health Systems, LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Asante, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Yuma Regional Medical Center, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc.. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 177 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT (WITH EXHIBITS A to D) filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 176 EXHIBIT B re #175 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT filed by Asante, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 5/31/2018) Modified on 6/4/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2018 Filing 175 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT (Exhibits to Follow) filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 174 MANDATE of USCA as to #129 Notice of Appeal, filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Asante, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC; #141 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services; and #160 Notice of Appeal filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 173 Verified AMENDED COMPLAINT filed pursuant to Court Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend (Docket Nos. 120 and 121) against California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. Filed by Valley Health Systems, LLC, Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Asante, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Yuma Regional Medical Center, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc.. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 5/16/2018) Modified on 5/17/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2018 Filing 172 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE. Due to counsel's unavailability, Further Case Management Conference reset from 5/24/2018 to 6/7/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 171 CLERK'S NOTICE - Further Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER of USCA Denying Petition for Rehearing and Petition for Rehearing En Banc as to #129 Notice of Appeal filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Asante, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC and #141 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 169 USCA Opinion as to #160 Notice of Appeal filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services, #141 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services, and #129 Notice of Appeal filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Asante, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC; Reversed (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #164 Motion to Stay. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 167 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/12/17, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #163 Transcript Order,, #162 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2017. (Related documents(s) #163 , #162 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 20, 2017 Filing 166 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs and for Waiver of Supersedeas Bond ) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 7, 2017 Filing 165 Request for Judicial Notice re #164 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs and for Waiver of Supersedeas Bond filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Related document(s) #164 ) (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 4/7/2017) Modified on 4/10/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2017 Filing 164 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs and for Waiver of Supersedeas Bond; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 4/21/2017. Replies due by 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 4/7/2017) Modified on 4/10/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2017 Filing 163 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/12/2017 before Edward M. Chen by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 5, 2017 Filing 162 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/12/17 before Edward M. Chen by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
March 29, 2017 Filing 161 USCA Case Number 17-15550 for #160 Notice of Appeal filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. Appeal of #159 Order re Motion for Attorney's Fees (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 261FJ82P) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 3/24/2017) Modified on 3/27/2017 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (USCA Case No. 17-15550)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #127 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part #143 Defendants' Motion for Review of Taxation of Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 158 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 1/12/2017. re #143 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services. Motion taken under submission and may or may not require further documentation and briefing. Total Time in Court: 1 Hour. Court Reporter: Kathy Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorneys: Dean Johnson, Michael Sorgen. Defendant Attorneys: Joshua Sondheiner, Susan Carson. This is a text only Minute Entry. There is no pdf image associated with this entry. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2017)
December 12, 2016 Filing 157 USCA Case Number 16-17080 for #141 Notice of Cross Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 156 REPLY (re #143 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS ) filed byCalifornia Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #154 #127 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing reset for 1/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 150 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, #127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 153 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 13, 2014, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #137 Transcript Order,, #146 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2017. (Related documents(s) #137 , #146 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/1/2016) Modified on 12/5/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2016 Filing 152 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 21, 2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #137 Transcript Order,, #146 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2017. (Related documents(s) #137 , #146 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 151 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 14, 2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #137 Transcript Order,, #146 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2017. (Related documents(s) #137 , #146 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 150 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting #127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs from 12/8/2016 to 12/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 149 AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: #68 Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #28 Case Management Conference - Initial,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #38 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, ), by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. Court will send to Dean Johnson at deanl.johnson@gmail.com a link to the files requested in this order. ( Filing fee $ 30, receipt number 0971-10954283). (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 148 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS ) filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 147 *** DISREGARD - ORDER CANCELLED *** AUDIO RECORDINGS ORDER (re: #68 Case Management Conference - Further,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #28 Case Management Conference - Initial,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #38 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, ), by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. Court will send to Joshua Sondheimer at joshua.sondheimer@doj.ca.gov a link to the files requested in this order. Fee waived because filer is USAO, FPD or CJA counsel on this case. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2016) Modified on 11/21/2016 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2016 Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/14; 5/14/15; 1/21/16 before Edward M. Chen by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/22/16 before Edward M. Chen by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas, for Court Reporter Christine Triska. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 144 Transcript Designation Form TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION FORM (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 17, 2016 Filing 143 MOTION for Review of Taxation of Costs MOTION FOR REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 12/1/2016. Replies due by 12/8/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Striking Clerk's Taxation of Costs)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 142 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 22, 2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christine Triska, telephone number (650)743-8425 triskachristine@gmail.com. Tape Number: triskachristine@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2017. (cat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 141 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to #126 Judgment by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10923763 paid.) Appeal Record due by 12/12/2016. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 11/10/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-17080)
November 10, 2016 Filing 140 REPLY (re #127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs ) filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dean Johnson in Support of Attorney Fee and Cost Motion and Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 139 Costs Taxed in amount of $1,727.25, Re: ECF No. 128, against defendants. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 4, 2016 Filing 138 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Sondheimer and Exhibits)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 137 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2014,5/14/2015,1/21/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/22/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center, for Court Reporter Christine Triska. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 135 Transcript Designation Form re #130 USCA Case Number,, #129 Notice of Appeal,, Transcript due by 12/13/2016. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 134 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS' BILL OF COSTS by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #131 Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Briefing and Hearing Schedule. Defendants' Opposition/Response due by 11/4/2016. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 11/11/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 22, 2016 Filing 132 RESPONSE (re #131 MOTION to Enlarge Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses) and Declaration filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dean L. Johnson in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/22/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2016 Filing 131 MOTION to Enlarge Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Sondheimer, #2 Proposed Order)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 10/21/2016) Modified on 10/24/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2016 Filing 130 USCA Case Number 16-16866 for #129 Notice of Appeal filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Asante, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 129 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. Appeal of Judgment #126 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10851874 paid.) and Ninth Circuit Representation Statement (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/14/2016) (USCA Case No. 16-16866)
October 14, 2016 Filing 128 BILL OF COSTS and Johnson Declaration with Supporting Documentation by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. Objections due by 10/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dean Johnson with Exhibits 1-3)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/28/2016. Replies due by 11/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dean Johnson with Exhibits 1-7, #2 Affidavit Michael Sorgen with Exhibit 1)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 12, 2016 Filing 126 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER - AMENDED ORDER Re Outstanding Issues. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/12/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 124 Letter from Defendants re Proposed Amended Order re Outstanding Provisions and Final Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Order Re Outstanding Provisions, #2 Proposed Final Judgment)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 10/6/2016) Modified on 10/7/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2016 Filing 123 Letter from Plaintiffs with Plaintiffs' Proposed Final Judgment. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 28, 2016 Filing 122 ASSOCIATION of Counsel of Thomas J. Weiss with Michael S. Sorgen and Dean L. Johnson by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Weiss, Thomas) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #111 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend; and Granting #115 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 120 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2016 re #115 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services, and #111 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., etc. Total Time in Court 53 minutes. Court Reporter Name Christina Triska. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 119 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 118 REPLY (re #115 MOTION for Reconsideration of December 21, 2015 Order filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 9/12/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2016 Filing 117 RESPONSE (re #115 MOTION for Reconsideration) filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/2/2016) Modified on 9/6/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2016 Filing 116 REPLY (re #111 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ) filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 23, 2016 Electronic filing error Re: #115 MOTION for Reconsideration MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF DECEMBER 21, 2015 ORDER filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services. Incorrect event used [err101]. Corrected by Clerk's Office. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 22, 2016 Filing 115 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of MOTION for Reconsideration of December 21, 2015 Order filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 8/22/2016) Modified on 8/23/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/13/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2016 Filing 114 RESPONSE (re #111 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ) Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 9, 2016 Filing 113 EXHIBITS re #111 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, 112 Clerk's Notice,,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CHANGES FROM EXISTING COMPLAINT HIGHLIGHTED filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #111 , 112 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 9, 2016 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE setting new briefing schedule re: Defendants' Motion for Reconsider and Plaintiff's motion to amend (111) as follows: Defendants' Motion to Reconsider and Opposition to the Motion to Amend due 8/22/2016. Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Reconsider and Reply to the Motion to Amend due 9/5/2016. Defendants' Reply to the Motion to Reconsider due 9/12/2016. Hearing on both motions set for 9/22/2016 at 1:30 p.m. Plaintiff shall file by 8/10/2016 a copy of its Proposed Amended Complaint which highlights all material that is new from the existing Complaint. Further Case Management Conference reset from 8/18/2016 to 9/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2016. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 6, 2016 Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/6/2016)
August 5, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #111 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #92 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration; and Denying #94 #103 Plaintiffs' Motions for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 4, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #110 . Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration to be filed by 8/18/2016. Plaintiffs' Opposition/Response due by 9/1/2016. Defendants' Reply due by 9/8/2016. Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 29, 2016 Filing 109 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Further Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 28, 2016 Filing 108 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND REQUEST TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER extending deadline (emclc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 12, 2016 Filing 106 RESPONSE to re #105 Order to Show Cause by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Chen on 7/11/2016. (emclc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT DEFENDANTS SECOND COMPLIANCE REPORT AND REQUEST TO SET NEW COMPLIANCE DEADLINE by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 22, 2016 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Recosideration filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 20, 2016 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/23/2016 to 8/4/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. The Court will not rule on requests made within a Case Management Statement. If the parties have requests for the Court, these should be brought as noticed motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 101 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 100 CLERK'S Letter Spreading #99 Mandate to Counsel. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER of USCA Granting Motion for Voluntary Dismissal as to #83 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Asante, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 25, 2016 Filing 98 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/10/2016 before Edward M. Chen by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 20, 2016 Filing 97 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's #95 Opposition/Response to Motion Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 5/20/2016) Modified on 5/23/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2016 Filing 96 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/10/2016, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #85 Transcript Order,, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2016. (Related documents(s) #85 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 95 RESPONSE (re #92 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 93 Request for Judicial Notice re #92 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by California Department of Health Care Services. (Related document(s) #92 ) (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 5/12/2016) Modified on 5/13/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2016 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by California Department of Health Care Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 5/12/2016) Modified on 5/13/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2016 Filing 91 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/16/2016 to 6/23/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 90 STATUS REPORT COMPLIANCE REPORT by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 17, 2016 Filing 89 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/15/2015, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #86 Transcript Order,, ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016. (Related documents(s) #86 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/17/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 88 USCA Case Number 16-15658 USCA for #83 Notice of Appeal, filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Asante, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 87 *** DISREGARD - ORDER CANCELLED BY ORDERING PARTY *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2014, 5/14/2015, 1/21/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 4/14/2016) Modified on 11/22/2016 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2016 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/15/2015 before Edward M. Chen by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/10/2016 before Edward M. Chen by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center, for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 84 Transcript Designation Form before Judge Edward M. Chen, re #83 Notice of Appeal,, 11/13/2014, 5/14/2015, 10/15/2015, 1/21/2016, 3/10/2016 Transcript due by 6/13/2016. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 13, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. Appeal of Order #82 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10366330 paid) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 4/13/2016) Modified on 4/14/2016 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (USCA Case No. 16-15658)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Denying Retroactive Relief. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE: OUTSTANDING PROVISIONS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/24/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 80 Letter from Petitioners with Comments on Proposed Order Submitted by the Department. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 79 Letter from Petitioners Regarding Proposed Order . (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 78 Letter from Defendants re Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 77 Statement of Petitioners Re Report on Meet and Confer and Revised Proposed Order by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2016. As stated in court, parties shall meet and confer and to file a revised proposed order by 3/17/16. Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court 1 hour 52 minutes. Court Reporter Name Rhonda Aquilina. Plaintiff Attorney Dean Johnson and Mike Sorogen. Defendant Attorney Jen Addams, Susan Carson and Joshua Sondheimer. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2016)
March 5, 2016 Filing 75 Brief Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Retroactive Damages filed byCalifornia Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 3/5/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT Update to Joint Report re Outcome of Meet and Confer by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Susan) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 73 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 72 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING OUTCOME OF MEET AND CONFER filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 13, 2016 Filing 71 Request for Judicial Notice re #70 Supplemental Brief,, Regarding Retroactive Relief filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #70 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 2/13/2016)
February 13, 2016 Filing 70 Supplemental Brief re #69 Supplemental Brief Regarding Retroactive Relief filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dean L. Johnson with Exhibits 1 and 2)(Related document(s) #69 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 2/13/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 69 Supplemental Brief Regarding Non-Availability of Retroactive Damages filed byCalifornia Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Sondheimer, Joshua) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2016. Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.FTR Time 11:16-11:46. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2016) Modified on 10/31/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2016 Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FIRST AMENDED filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 66 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and Granting in Part #51 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 64 NOTICE re Suggested Text for DSH Letter to HHS. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/23/2015) Modified on 10/26/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2015 Filing 63 RESPONSE to re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant DHCS' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Su SUGGESTED TEXT FOR QUESTION TO CMS by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Carson, Susan) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 15, 2015 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Motion Hearing held on 10/15/2015 re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant DHCS' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication filed by California Department of Health Care Services. As stated on the records, parties shall meet and confer and to submit to the Court the questions to CMS by 10/23/15. Court will then take the motion under submission. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. An updated joint CMC statement shall be filed by 1/14/2016.Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney Dean Johnson and Mike Sorgen. Defendant Attorney Susan Carson, Jennifer Addams and Tim Cornforth. This is a text only Minute Entry (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2015)
October 8, 2015 Filing 61 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 60 AMENDED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; by California Department of Health Care Services. Amendment to #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant DHCS' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Su (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/2/2015) Modified on 10/5/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2015 Filing 59 REPLY (re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant DHCS' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Su ) REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byCalifornia Department of Health Care Services. (Attachments: #1 Declaration SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BELINDA ROWAN, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 58 REPLY (re #39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) and Exhibits1 and 2 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dr. Michael Vaida, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Statement of Decision and Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 57 OBJECTIONS to re #39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendant's Objections to Evidence by California Department of Health Care Services. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 17, 2015 Filing 56 RESPONSE (re #39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Liability Only filed byCalifornia Department of Health Care Services. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Belinda Rowan, #2 Declaration Declaration of Robert Dimand, M.D., #3 Declaration Declaration of Timothy Cornforth, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/17/2015)
September 7, 2015 Filing 55 EXHIBITS re #53 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, Exhibits 2 (Volume II) and 3 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/7/2015)
September 7, 2015 Filing 54 EXHIBITS re #53 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,, Exhibits 1 and 2 (Volume I) filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #53 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/7/2015)
September 7, 2015 Filing 53 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/7/2015)
September 7, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE (re #51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant DHCS' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Su ) OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/7/2015)
August 13, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant DHCS' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative Summary Adjudication filed by California Department of Health Care Services. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 8/27/2015. Replies due by 9/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #9 Proposed Order)(Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 50 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 9 to 12 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 49 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 8 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 48 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 7 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 47 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 8 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 46 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 6 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 45 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibits 4 and 5 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 44 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 3, Part 1 of 2 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 43 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 2 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 42 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 2 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 41 EXHIBITS re #40 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 2 filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 40 Declaration of Dean L. Johnson in Support of #39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byAsante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Related document(s) #39 ) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
August 8, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 9/17/2015. Replies due by 10/1/2015. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Vaida and Exhibits, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Rick Fernandez and Exhibit, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Gomez, #4 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/8/2015)
May 15, 2015 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/14/2015. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2015. MSJ Motion due by 8/13/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. MSJ hearing set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.FTR Time 10:59-11:10. Attachment Minute order.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/15/2015) Modified on 10/31/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2015 Filing 37 Statement re #27 Joint Case Management Statement Joint Supplemental Status Conference Statement by Toby Douglas. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 11, 2015 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Case did not settle. Parties may return for further settlement conference after Motion for Summary Judgment.Settlement Conference held on 5/11/2015.Court Reporter Name Not reported. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/11/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE - Further CMC set for 5/14/15 at 10:30 a.m. An updated joint CMC statement shall be filed after the settlement conference on 5/11/15. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REGARDING PERSONAL ATTENDANCE AT 05/11/15 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/04/2015. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
January 30, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing re #33 Stipulation and Order,, Set Hearings, Settlement Conference set for 5/11/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Toby Douglas, California Department of Health Care Services Settlement Conference set for 5/11/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/30/15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #30 Stipulation to extend settlement conference deadline and resetting further CMC for 5/14/15 at 10:30 a.m. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time for Settlement Conference Completion and Status Conference; Order filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 20, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Settlement Conference set for 2/13/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/19/14. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 14, 2014 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward M. Chen: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2014. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Court Reporter Name or FTR Time FTR 10:13-10:18. (Date Filed: 11/14/2014)(bpf, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/31/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 10, 2014 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard A. Herman Director, ADR Program on 11/7/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
November 5, 2014 Filing 27 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 3, 2014 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 25 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Friday, November 7, 2014 at 2:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center Plaintiffs' Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5-b) of Discussion of ADR Options (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 20 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #12 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Asante, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Clark County, Nevada, Yuma Regional Medical Center, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, Renown Regional Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/8/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #12 Case Management Scheduling Order, filed by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 17 Letter in Response to #14 Clerks Notice Certified by Jennifer C. Addams, Counsel for the Defendants. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2014 Filing 16 Letter from Attorney for Plaintiffs Certifying Discussion Re Magistrate Option . (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
August 19, 2014 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint byCalifornia Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE - LETTER FROM JUDGE CHEN RE: CONSENT BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 13 STANDING ORDERS (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/18/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (emclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING)(Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas re #8 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, DECLARATION OF SERVICE SERVING CIVIL STANDING ORDERS OF JUDGE EDWARD M. CHEN (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/28/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 25, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by California Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas. (Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/25/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Asante, Clark County, Nevada, Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc., Renown Regional Medical Center, Renown South Meadows Medical Center, Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc., Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC, Sparks Family Hospital, Inc., Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Hospial and Medical Center, LLC, Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc., Valley Health Systems, LLC, Yuma Regional Medical Center.. (Johnson, Dean) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34611097683. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 18, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT Please be advised that the filing fee has not been received in this case. The fee must be paid within two business days or the case will be subject to termination. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1441(a) (FEDERAL QUESTION) from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-14-539852. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt # 34611097683). Filed byToby Douglas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Addams, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2014) Modified on 7/18/2014 (sv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asante et al v. California Department of Health Care Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunrise Mountainview Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark County, Nevada
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asante
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sky Lakes Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Health Systems, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Hills Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountainveiw Hosptial
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Havasu Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Medical Center
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Medical Center of Nevada
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuma Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunrise Hospital and Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renown South Meadows Medical Center
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renown Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summerlin Hospital Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparks Family Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Weiss
Represented By: Michael Steven Sorgen
Represented By: Dean L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Douglas
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Sondheimer
Represented By: Susan M. Carson
Represented By: Jennifer C. Addams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Health Care Services
Represented By: Jennifer C. Addams
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Sondheimer
Represented By: Susan M. Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Kent
Represented By: Joshua Nathan Sondheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?