Kellerman v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sherri Kellerman
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Merck & Co., Inc., Schering Corporation and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 3:2014cv03680
Filed: August 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Minnesota. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS 59 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 57 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING PRO HACVICE APPLICATION OFATTORNEY THOMAS CULLEN.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE A TIMELY OPPOSITION Replies due by 12/9/2014. Responses due by 12/1/2014.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/26/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING 40 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellerman v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Kellerman
Represented By: Thomas M Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Alicia J. Donahue
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering Corporation
Represented By: Alicia J. Donahue
Represented By: Amir M Nassihi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?