Shah v. Rocket Fuel Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nipu Shah
Defendant: Rocket Fuel Inc., George H. John, J. Peter Bardwick, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC and Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv03998
Filed: September 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER re Refiling of Documents Lodged Under Seal per 210 Order on Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 02/09/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 186 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint; denying 183 195 201 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal; finding as moot 208 Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Surreply Brief. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date re 186 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/23/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 181 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Surreply; granting 187 Administrative Motion to Stay Class Certification Briefing Schedule. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 172 Administrative Motion to Correct the Case Management Order.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/31/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Dismiss; granting 102 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/4/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. Rocket Fuel Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nipu Shah
Represented By: Ramzi Abadou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocket Fuel Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George H. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Peter Bardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?