Letbetter et al v. Local 514, Transport Workers Union of America et al
Plaintiff: Mark Letbetter, Mike McDonald, Rick Arnegard, William Bell, William Black, Lonnie Bradbury, John Breeden, Roger Brown, Scott Brown, John Bynum, Mike Cody, John Crawford, Billie Cummins, George Danker, Don Draper, Michael Elmore, Wade Faust, Jerry Frazier, Kevin Gorremans, Mary Gorremans, James Hayden, Brenda Higley, Randy Holland, Jim Bob Jackson, Alan Keith, Earl Kuppinger, Soren Lohmar, Deborah McDaniel, Johnny McDaniel, Mike McNamara, Steve Nunn, Mike Reyes, George Rodriquez, Mike Sharp, Jerry Shupe, Curtis Simer, Robert Sommers, Ronald Swan, Terrance Thomas, Bill Thorson, Jim Troskey, James Wall, Larry Weber, Chokushin Urasaki, Steve Abshier, Ralph Bacon, Ronnie Bertrang, Traice Bryant, Dan Burke, Kevin Calman, Donald Caudle, Jerry Collard, Doug Creekmore, Hugh Cooper, Barbara Dejear, Bryan Deshazo, Lidio A Dobrich, David Elder, John Eller, Mike Eller, Ned Elzo, Ron Engles, Donald Farris, Robert Flynn, Randy Forrester, Jesse Foster, Steve Fregara, Paul Goulet, Marion Greenwalt, Roy Haile, Phil Hallman, McKayla Harper, Scott Hermanson, Larry Holmes, Steven Jones, Roger Kemp, Daniel Kitchens, Larry Lawson, Jack Lofgren, Patrice Manns, Edward W Marraccini, Farren Mayfield, Gail Mayfield, Greg McBride, Frank Mefford, Ken Miller, Danny Moore, Gerald Murray, James Pottebaum, John Reed, Abraham Reichman, Sharon Ritter, Ben Roundtree, Gary Runyon, Mary Runyon, Roger Schultz, Tim Sisney, Joseph W Smith, Ronald Smith, Steve Ullrich, Susan Virdell, Mitch Wallace, Terry Walls, Kenneth Warren, Eric Whaley, Ray White, Glenda Wilkerson, Mike Williams, Don Woodrich, Johnny Yeary and Sam York
Defendant: Local 514, Transport Workers Union of America and Transport Workers Union of America
Case Number: 3:2014cv04075
Filed: September 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/20/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/4/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Lapish.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 49 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Letbetter et al v. Local 514, Transport Workers Union of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Letbetter
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike McDonald
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Arnegard
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bell
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Black
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Bradbury
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Breeden
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Brown
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Brown
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bynum
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Cody
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Crawford
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Cummins
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Danker
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Draper
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Elmore
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade Faust
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Frazier
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Gorremans
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Gorremans
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hayden
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Higley
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Holland
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Bob Jackson
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Keith
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Kuppinger
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soren Lohmar
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah McDaniel
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny McDaniel
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike McNamara
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Nunn
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Reyes
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Rodriquez
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Sharp
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Shupe
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Simer
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sommers
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Swan
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Thomas
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Thorson
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Troskey
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wall
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Weber
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chokushin Urasaki
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Abshier
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Bacon
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Bertrang
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traice Bryant
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Burke
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Calman
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Caudle
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Collard
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Creekmore
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugh Cooper
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Dejear
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Deshazo
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidio A Dobrich
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Elder
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eller
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Eller
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ned Elzo
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Engles
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Farris
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Flynn
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Forrester
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Foster
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Fregara
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Goulet
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Greenwalt
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Haile
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Hallman
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKayla Harper
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hermanson
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Holmes
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Jones
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Kemp
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kitchens
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lawson
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Lofgren
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice Manns
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward W Marraccini
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farren Mayfield
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Mayfield
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg McBride
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Mefford
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Miller
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Moore
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Murray
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pottebaum
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Reed
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Reichman
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Ritter
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Roundtree
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Runyon
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Runyon
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Schultz
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Sisney
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph W Smith
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Smith
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Ullrich
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Virdell
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Wallace
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Walls
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Warren
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Whaley
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray White
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Wilkerson
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Williams
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Woodrich
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Yeary
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam York
Represented By: Amy L Evans
Represented By: Michael D Myers
Represented By: Clinton Derek Russell
Represented By: R. Stratton Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 514, Transport Workers Union of America
Represented By: Caroline Bouscaren Lapish
Represented By: Teague Pryde Paterson
Represented By: Joel L. Wohlgemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transport Workers Union of America
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Richard Steven Edelman
Represented By: James John Proszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?