Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., et al v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., and Volterra Semiconductor LLC
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc., Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation, Calum Macrae, Luis Razera, Amit Jain, Thomas Truman and Roberto Guerrero
Case Number: 3:2014cv04391
Filed: September 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND ORDER. The Case Management Conference scheduled for December 18, 2015, is taken off calendar. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLETE EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATIONThe parties' joint request to continue the Early Neutral Evaluation deadline is granted. The new deadline to complete Early Neutral Evaluation is September 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 9, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/12/15. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., et al v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxim Integrated Products, Inc.,
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Represented By: Thomas Broad Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volterra Semiconductor LLC
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Represented By: Thomas Broad Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairchild Semiconductor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calum Macrae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Razera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit Jain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Truman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberto Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?