Twitter, Inc. v. Holder et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr., United States Department of Justice, James B. Comey and Federal Bureau of Investigation
Case Number: 3:2014cv04480
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 287 Letter from Lee H. Rubin to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 56 and paragraph 9(a) of the Court's Standing Order. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 21, 2019 Filing 286 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Further Proceedings Following Defendants' Assertion of State Secrets (Joint) filed by Twitter, Inc., United States Department of Justice, James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation and William P. Barr . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/22/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION; VACATING APRIL 2, 2019 HEARING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; granting 284 Stipulation. Motion Hearing currently set 258 for April 2, 2019 is VACATED. Parties Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by 3/21/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 284 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Stipulation Regarding Further Proceedings Following Defendants' Assertion of State Secrets filed by Twitter, Inc., Federal Bureau of Investigations, William P. Barr and James B. Comey. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 3/19/2019) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2019 Filing 283 REPLY (re 258 MOTION Challenging Defendants' Privilege Designations ) (In Support) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 16, 2019 Filing 282 NOTICE by William P. Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice Notice of Lodging of Classified Declaration of Michael C. McGarrity for Ex Parte, In Camera Review (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 3/16/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 281 MOTION that the Court Discharge the Order to Show Cause and Deny Plaintiffs Request for Access to the Classified Steinbach Declaration, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss in Light of the Attorney Generals Assertion of the State Secrets Privilege , MOTION to Dismiss filed by William P. Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 3/29/2019. Replies due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Declaration of the Attorney General of the United States, # 2 Exhibit B, Declaration of the Acting Executive Assistant Director of the FBI, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Proposed Order Alternative Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 280 STATUS REPORT by William P. Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 279 ERRATA re 278 Opposition/Response to Motion, by William P. Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 278 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 258 MOTION Challenging Defendants' Privilege Designations ) filed byWilliam P. Barr, James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Loretta Lynch, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice, Mathew Whitaker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Cecilia O. Bessee, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Findlay, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Julia A. Heiman)(Healy, Christopher) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 277 STATUS REPORT by William P. Barr, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 276 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Eric David Miller (Miller, Eric) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 274 Administrative Motion for Extension of Time for Briefing re: Challenge to Privilege Designation. Responses due by 3/1/2019. Replies due by 3/18/2019. The Hearing date shall remain set for 4/2/2019 at 2:00 PM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 274 Unopposed ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to re Motion Challenging Privilege Designation filed by William P. Barr, James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Loretta Lynch, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice, Mathew Whitaker. Responses due by 2/25/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Healy, Christopher) (Filed on 2/20/2019) Modified on 2/21/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 273 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 271 Stipulation to set Schedule for Resolution of State Secrets Issue. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 271 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set a Schedule for Resolution of State Secrets Issue filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Mathew Whitaker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 2/12/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 258 MOTION Challenging Defendants' Privilege Designations : Responses due by 2/25/2019. Replies due by 3/14/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 268 Stipulation Regarding Twitter's Pending Privilege Challenge Motion and other Outstanding Deadlines. Government's bi-weekly discovery Status Report filed by 2/15/2019. Government produce remaining logs on 3/22/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 269 Reply Submitted in Support of re 264 Response to Order to Show Cause filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Mathew Whitaker. (Related document(s) 264 ) (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 2/1/2019) Modified on 2/4/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2019 Filing 268 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Twitter's Pending Privilege Challenge Motion and Other Outstanding Deadlines filed by Twitter, Inc., Mathew Whitaker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 2/1/2019) Modified on 2/4/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER VACATING STAY 262 , DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/29/2019. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 266 NOTICE to the Court of Restoration of Appropriations by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Mathew Whitaker (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 1/28/2019) Modified on 1/29/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2019 Filing 265 OPPOSITION re 264 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Related document(s) 264 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/25/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2019 Filing 264 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Disclosure of Declaration Submitted In Camera by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Mathew Whitaker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 1/18/2019) Modified on 1/20/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2019 Filing 263 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE TUESDAY, FEBRUARY 5, 2019 AT 2:00 PM MOTION HEARING, DKT. NO. 258. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STAY IN LIGHT OF LAPSE OF APPROPRIATIONS 259 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISCLOSURE OF DECLARATION SUBMITTED IN CAMERA Government Response due by 1/18/2019. Plaintiff opposition by 1/25/2019. Reply by 2/1/19. (See Dkt 250 .) Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/2/2019. (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 28, 2018 Filing 260 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION for a Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker. Responses due by 1/9/2019. Replies due by 1/16/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 12/26/2018) Modified on 12/27/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION Challenging Defendants' Privilege Designations filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Replies due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, # 2 Declaration of Lee H. Rubin in Support, # 3 Exhibit A to Rubin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Rubin Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Rubin Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Rubin Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E to Rubin Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F to Rubin Declaration (Lodged Under Seal), # 9 Exhibit G to Rubin Declaration (Lodged Under Seal), # 10 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits F and G of the Rubin Declaration in Support of Twitter's Privilege Challenge Motion filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lee H. Rubin in Support, # 2 Exhibit F (Lodged Under Seal), # 3 Exhibit G (Lodged Under Seal), # 4 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 256 RESPONSE to the Courts November 26, 2018 Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 NOTICE to counsel Christopher Healy. Please update your personal profile on ECF as the court's record shows a different address from what is shown on the document Re: 255 Notice of Appearance filed by Loretta Lynch, James B. Comey, Matthew G. Whitaker, Eric H. Holder, Jr., United States Department of Justice, Jefferson Sessions, Federal Bureau of Investigation (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Robert Healy on behalf of all Defendants (Healy, Christopher) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 254 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO SET DISCOVERY SCHEDULE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 252 Stipulation. Defendants shall produce their remaining logs for classified documents by February 15, 2019.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 252 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Discovery Schedule filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker, Twitter Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 12/10/2018) Modified on 12/11/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2018 Filing 251 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-26-2018 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 245 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019. (Related documents(s) 245 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 250 Twitter's Notice Of Request And Request That Its Counsel Receive Access to Classified Steinbach Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Of Lee Rubin In Support)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/5/2018) Modified on 12/6/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2018 Filing 249 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/26/2018 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers . (Booth, Samantha) (Filed on 12/3/2018) Modified on 12/4/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2018 Filing 248 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 245 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/26/2018 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 247 CORRECTED Minute Entry : [corrected to reflect on the minute sheet that the date that the case management conference was held was Monday, 11/26/2018] for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/26/2018.Total Time in Court: 37 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff Motion re bellweather documents concerning privileges filed by 12/21/2018. Responses due by 1/11/2019. Replies due by 1/22/2019. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/26/2018. Request for affidavit filed by 12/5/18. Government response filed by 12/17/18.Total Time in Court: 37 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/26/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 244 FOURTH UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, Matthew G. Whitaker, Twitter. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 11/19/2018) Modified on 11/20/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/20/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2018 Filing 243 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 240 Administrative Motion for Extension Nun Pro Tunc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 241 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 9, 2018 AT 9:01 AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 240 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for an Extension of 1 Hour and 56 Minutes to Complete the Production of DOJs Privilege Log filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 11/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 239 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 237 Administrative Motion to Extend Time. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 237 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time for DOJ to Complete Production of its Privilege Log for Materials from its Unclassified Systems filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 236 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 233 Stipulation regarding Discovery. Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2018. Case Management Conference set 11/26/2018 at 2:00pm.*The Monday, 11/5/2018 Case Management Conference date is vacated.*(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: DISCOVERY PRODUCTION AND PRIVILEGE ISSUES re 232 Status Report filed by United States Department of Justice, Jefferson Sessions, Federal Bureau of Investigation. Compliance hearing set for 10/12/2018 is CONTINUED to Friday, 11/9/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Status report filed by 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/10/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 233 Joint Stipulation Regarding Discovery filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice, Twitter, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 10/5/2018) Modified on 10/9/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2018 Filing 232 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 228 Administrative Motion to Extend Time; Continuing Compliance Hearing. Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for Monday, 11/26/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Status Report re compliance hearing filed by 10/5/2018. Compliance hearing set for 9/28/2018 is CONTINUED to 10/12/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 230 Supplement to Defendants' September 21, 2018 Status Report by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 9/25/2018) Modified on 9/26/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2018 Filing 229 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 228 Third ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 9/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 227 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing set for 9/14/2018 is CONTINUED to Friday, 9/28/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Statement filed by 9/21/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 226 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY AND MEET AND CONFER ON PRIVILEGE ISSUES re 224 Status Report filed by United States Department of Justice, Jefferson Sessions, Federal Bureau of Investigation. Compliance hearing is set for Friday, 9/14/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Updated Status Report by defendants filed by 9/7/2018. Joint statement by parties on status of meet and confer efforts filed by 9/7/2018. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/28/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 224 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 222 Administrative Motion to Extend Time, Nunc Pro Tunc, for Defendants to Submit their August 10, 2018 Status Report. Compliance Hearing set for 8/31/2018 at 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Status Report due by 8/24/2018. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 222 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time, Nunc Pro Tunc, for Defendants to Submit their August 10, 2018 Status Report Unopposed filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 8/17/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Status Report), # 2 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 219 Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plainitff's First Set of Discovery Requests; and setting Compliance re Meet and Confer. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2018. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2018 is CONTINUED to Monday, 11/5/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 6, 2018 Filing 220 Statement of Non-Opposition re 219 Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests Unopposed filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Related document(s) 219 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 219 Second ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests Unopposed filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 8/7/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 218 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing set for 8/3/2018 is CONTINUED to Friday 8/17/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Status Report due by 8/10/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 217 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 216 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Status Report due by 7/27/2018. Compliance hearing set for 7/20/2018 is CONTINUED to Friday 8/3/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 13, 2018 Filing 215 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 214 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Status Report due by 7/13/2018. Compliance hearing set for 7/6/2018 is CONTINUED to Friday 7/20/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
July 2, 2018 REMINDER: Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials YGR immediately after the case number.In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:14-cv-04480-YGR. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 213 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Heiman, Julia) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 212 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Friday, June 22, 2018 compliance hearing is CONTINUED to Friday, July 6, 2018 at 9:01 am. Updated Status Report to be filed by 6/29/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 211 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 210 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The Friday, June 8, 2018 at 9:01 AM Compliance Hearing is CONTINUED to Friday, June 22, 2018 at 9:01 AM. Updated Status Report filed by 6/15/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 209 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 208 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING.The Friday, May 25, 2018 at 9:01 AM Compliance Hearing is CONTINUED to Friday, June 8, 2018 at 9:01 AM. Updated Status Report filed by 6/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 18, 2018 Filing 207 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 206 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 9, 2018, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 199 Transcript Order, 198 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2018. (Related document(s) 199 , 198 ) (rhm) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 205 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The Compliance hearing set for 5/11/2018 is COTINUED to Friday, 5/25/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Updated Status Report filed by 5/18/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 204 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 203 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. The Compliance hearing set for 4/27/2018 is CONTINUED to Friday, 5/11/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 195 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 201 STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 197 Stipulation regarding Discovery. Further Case Management Conference is set 9/24/18 at 2:00pm. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 199 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/09/2018 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 4/18/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4-9-18 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Twitter, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 197 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice, Twitter Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 4/13/2018) Modified on 4/16/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2018 Filing 195 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Errata Addressing Defendants' March 26, 2018 Submission filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Corrected Exhibit 2, # 4 Corrected Exhibit 3)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 196 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2018. Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2018.Further Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Compliance hearing set for 4/27/2018 09:01 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Report filed by 4/20/18. Total Time in Court: 53 minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 194 THIRD UPDATED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice, Twitter Inc. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 4/2/2018) Modified on 4/3/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2018 Filing 193 RESPONSE to re 191 Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 3/26/2018) Modified on 3/27/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2018 Filing 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Sample of Responsive Materials Submitted in Response to the Courts March 8, 2018 Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Julia A. Berman), # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted Version of Document Sought to Be Filed Under Seal), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted Version of the Document Sought to Be Filed Under Seal))(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 3/26/2018) Modified on 3/27/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2018 Filing 191 Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 189 Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Response to Discovery Requests.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 190 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 189 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs First Set of Discovery Requests ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 189 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs First Set of Discovery Requests filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson Sessions, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 3/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 12, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing re 188 Order, Further Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART TWITTER'S REQUEST TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY; SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 167 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Loretta Lynch, Twitter, Inc., Federal Bureau of Investigation.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/12/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 6, 2018 Filing 187 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2018.Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Court Reporter: NOT REPORTED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2018)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 180 Motion for Reconsideration. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/19/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 10, 2017 Filing 184 REPLY (re 180 MOTION for Reconsideration re 172 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byFederal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
September 26, 2017 Filing 183 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 180 MOTION for Reconsideration re 172 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 9/26/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 182 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 14, 2017, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 181 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2017. (Related document(s) 181 ) (rhm) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 181 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/14/17 before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Twitter, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 ***See dkt. # 176 . Set/Reset Deadlines as to 180 MOTION for Reconsideration. Responses due by 9/26/2017. Replies due by 10/10/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 180 MOTION for Reconsideration re 172 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
August 28, 2017 Filing 179 NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Investigation, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, United States Department of Justice Notice of Filing of Declaration of EAD Ghattas (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of EAD Ghattas)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 178 AMENDED Exhibit A to Joint Letter Brief Filed February 17, 2017 by Twitter, Inc.. . (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/25/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Eric Joseph Soskin (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 8/24/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 176 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2017. Discovery Hearing held on 8/14/2017.Total Time in Court 43 minutes. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2017)
August 8, 2017 Filing 175 NOTICE by United States Department of Justice of Filing of Declaration of Carl Ghattas (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carl Ghattas)(Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 174 UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Statement Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by United States Department of Justice, Twitter Inc. (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 8/7/2017) Modified on 8/8/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for Monday, 8/14/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Updated Case Management Statement and Joint Supplemental Statement re discovery dispute filed by 8/7/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/6/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 124 Twitter's Motion for Order Directing Defendants to Expedite Security Clearance; denying without prejudice 145 Motion for Summary Judgment. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 171 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2017, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 169 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2017. (Related document(s) 169 ) (rhm) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting re 168 Proposed Order filed by James B. Comey, Twitter, Inc., United States Department of Justice, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/27/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017) Modified on 3/28/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2017 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/14/17 before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Twitter, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 168 Proposed Protective Order by Twitter, Inc., James B. Comey, et al. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 3/10/2017) Modified on 3/13/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2017 Filing 167 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Twitter, Inc., Loretta Lynch, et al. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 2/17/2017) Modified on 2/21/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2017 Filing 166 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 2/14/2017 re 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Twitter, Inc., 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Loretta Lynch, James B. Comey, United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. Total Time in Court 1:22. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 165 NOTICE by Twitter, Inc. of Status of Discovery Dispute; Declaration of Lee H. Rubin in Support (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 164 NOTICE by Twitter, Inc. of Recent Decision Pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(D)(2) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 161 Administrative Motion to Extend Time. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 162 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 161 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Nunc Pro Tunc Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Submit their Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 10, 2017 Filing 161 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Nunc Pro Tunc Administrative Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Submit their Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 1/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 10, 2017 Filing 160 REPLY (re 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 159 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing on Motion for Order Directing Defendants to Initiate an Expedited Security Clearance Process to 2/14/2017. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers; now set for same time and date as Motion for Summary Judgment 145 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)</I (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting 157 Stipulated Request to Extend Deadline for Reply and Continue Hearing. Reply due 1/10/17. Motion Hearing CONTINUED to 2/14/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline for Reply in Support of Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment and to Continue the Hearing Currently Set for January 24, 2017, filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice, Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 1/4/2017) Modified on 1/5/2017 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2017 Filing 156 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Time of Motion Hearing on Tuesday January 24, 2017 to 1:00 PM. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel, 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2017 will be held at 01:00 PM (instead of at 2:00 PM ) in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 28, 2016 Filing 155 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Re: ECF No. 153 (Motion for Protective Order) (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
December 22, 2016 Filing 154 Declaration of Eric Soskin in Support re 153 MOTION for Protective Order filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 153 ) (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 12/22/2016) Modified on 12/23/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2016 Filing 153 MOTION for Protective Order and [Proposed] Protective Order filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 1/5/2017. Replies due by 1/12/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 12/22/2016) Modified on 12/23/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2016 Filing 152 Declaration of Lee H. Rubin in Support of 150 Opposition/Response to Motion in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 150 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 151 Request for Judicial Notice re 150 Opposition/Response to Motion in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit D, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit D, Part 3, # 7 Exhibit D, Part 4, # 8 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 150 ) (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 19, 2016 Filing 150 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
December 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel, 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 12/19/2016. Replies due by 1/5/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 148 Stipulation re Extension of Briefing Dates and Continuing Hearings. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 8, 2016 Filing 148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Deadlines For Opposition To And Reply In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 147 ERRATA re 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 146 *******Filed in error. Document filed in wrong case STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 11/23/2016) Modified on 11/23/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2016 Filing 145 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 12/13/2016. Replies due by 12/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 144 NOTICE by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice of Lodging of Classified Declaration of Michael Steinbach for In Camera, Ex Parte Review (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 143 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING THE NOVEMBER 22, 2016 MOTION HEARING TO JANUARY 17, 2017. The Motion set 11/22/2016, Dkt. no. 124 is CONTINUED to 1/17/2017 at 2:00pm for hearing along with Government's Motion for Summary Judgment to be set for hearing same date and time. See Minutes Dkt. No. 134. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Defendants file Motion for Summary Judgment by 11/22/16. Responses due by 12/13/2016. Replies due by 12/27/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 141 Administrative Motion Extension of Time. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 141 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 11/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 140 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a 2-Day Extension of Time for Defendants to Submit their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 11/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/24/2016 before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice, for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 138 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 10/24/16, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:20 - 3:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 135 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (Related documents(s) 135 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Joseph Soskin as attorney for Defendants (Soskin, Eric) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 136 REPLY (re 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 28, 2016 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/24/16 before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Twitter, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 134 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/24/2016. Government shall file Motion for Summary Judgment by 11/15/2016. Responses due by 12/6/2016. Replies due by 12/20/2016. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.FTR Time 2:20pm-3:01pm. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2016)
October 21, 2016 Filing 133 RESPONSE (re 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel ) filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
October 18, 2016 Filing 132 Updated Joint Case Management Statement filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice, Twitter Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julia Berman Regarding October 17, 2016 Technical Failure, Submitted Pursuant to Local Rule 5-1(e)(5))(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/18/2016) Modified on 10/19/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel. Responses due by 10/21/2016. Replies due by 11/2/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 129 Administrative Motion for Three Day Extension. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 15, 2016 Filing 130 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice re 129 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a 3-Day Extension of Time to Respond to the Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Directing Defendants to Initiate an Expedited Security Clearance Process for Plaintiffs Counsel Notice of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to Defendants' Administrative Motion (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/15/2016) Modified on 10/17/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2016 Filing 129 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for a 3-Day Extension of Time to Respond to the Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Directing Defendants to Initiate an Expedited Security Clearance Process for Plaintiffs Counsel filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 10/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 5, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel. Responses due by 10/18/2016. Replies due by 10/28/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 127 Stipulation. Hearing currently set for 11/8/16 is CONTINUED to 11/22/16 at 9:00AM. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER requesting to extend the deadlines for the response to and reply in support of Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Directing Defendants to Initiate and Expedited Security Clearance Process for Plaintiffs Counsel filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice, Twitter Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 10/3/2016) Modified on 10/4/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing re 126 Order on Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/24/2016 02:00 PM. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 125 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference to October 24, 2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)
September 23, 2016 Filing 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER continue the case management conference currently scheduled for October 5, 2016 filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta Lynch, United States Department of Justice, Twitter Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 9/23/2016) Modified on 9/26/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2016 Filing 124 MOTION For An Order Directing Defendants To Initiate An Expedited Security Clearance Process For Plaintiff's Counsel (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 123) filed by Twitter, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 10/6/2016. Replies due by 10/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration by Andrew John Pincus, # 2 Declaration by Lee H. Rubin, # 3 Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2016) Modified on 9/22/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2016 Filing 123 *******FILED IN ERROR. RE-FILED AT DOCUMENT # 124 ******* ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for an Order Directing Defendants to Initiate an Expedited Security Clearance Process for Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Twitter, Inc.. Responses due by 9/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew John Pincus, # 2 Declaration of Lee H. Rubin, # 3 Proposed Order)(Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 9/21/2016) Modified on 9/22/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2016 Filing 122 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE TO WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 5, 2016. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2016 is CONTINUED to specially set date of WEDNESDAY, 10/5/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
August 23, 2016 Filing 121 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/26/2016. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 10/3/2016 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 120 ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 7/5/2016) Modified on 7/6/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER DENYING GOVERNMENT'S REQUEST FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 115 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 118 RESPONSE (re 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 114 Amended Complaint ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 117 Letter from Andrew J. Pincus, for Twitter, Inc. Responding to the Government's June 13, 2016 letter requesting a pre-filing conference. (Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 116 Letter from Defendants pursuant to Paragraph 9(a) of the Courts Standing Order for Civil Cases . (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 114 Amended Complaint filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 114 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 2201 and 2202 against All Defendants. Filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
March 30, 2016 Filing 112 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 14, 2016, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 110 Transcript Order, 111 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/28/2016. (Related document(s) 110 , 111 ) (rhm) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 17, 2016 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 15, 2016 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Twitter, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Snell, James) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 109 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 3/14/2016 re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Loretta E. Lynch, James B. Comey, United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation.Total Time in Court 1:08. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/14/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 108 Clerk's Notice re Proposed Video Recording of 3/14/2016 Proceeding. (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 107 Clerk's Notification of Request for Video Recording re 3/14/2016 hearing. Parties are to submit the attached form via email only to cameras@cand.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. Pacific on March 11, 2016. (Attachments: # 1 Party Response to Request for Video Recording) (zml, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 106 CLERK'S NOTICE MOVING MOTION HEARING.The Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. no. 94] previously set for Tuesday, March 15, 2016 is ADVANCED to MONDAY, March 14, 2016 at 2:30pm. The 3/15/16 hearing date is VACATED. Motion Hearing is set for 3/14/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for Monday, 3/14/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 103 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew J. Pincus representing Plaintiff Twitter, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 2, 2016 Filing 104 REPLY (re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
March 2, 2016 Filing 103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Pincus ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10258174.) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Pincus, Andrew) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 102 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Twitter, Inc.. (Rubin, Lee) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 101 Brief for Media and Writers Amici filed byBuzzFeed, Inc., First Look Media, Inc., Guardian News & Media, National Public Radio, Inc., PEN American Center, WP Company LLC dba: The Washington Post. (Karanjia, Peter) (Filed on 2/24/2016) Modified on 2/25/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 98 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Media and Writers AMICI and for 3-day Extension of Time for Government's Reply. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 96 Motion for Leave to File Brief.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff and for 3-day Extension of Time for Government's Reply filed by BuzzFeed, Inc., First Look Media, Inc., Guardian News & Media, National Public Radio, Inc., PEN American Center, WP Company LLC dba: The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Brief for Media and Writers Amici, # 2 Proposed Order)(Karanjia, Peter) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 97 RESPONSE (re 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint ) filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Snell, James) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 96 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by A Medium Corporation, Automattic Inc., CREDO Mobile, Inc., CloudFlare, Inc., Mapbox, Inc., Reddit, Inc., Wickr Foundation, Wikimedia Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE of Change of Law Practice Name by A Medium Corporation, Automattic Inc., CREDO Mobile, Inc., CloudFlare, Inc., Wikimedia Foundation, Reddit, Inc., Mapbox, Inc., Wickr Foundation (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/5/2016) Modified on 2/8/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 2/5/2016. Replies due by 2/26/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATED REQUEST TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Set/Reset Deadlines as to Defendants' Anticipated Motion to Dismiss: Responses due by 2/5/2016. Replies due by 2/26/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/15/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting to Set a Briefing Schedule filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael A. Sussmann, # 2 Proposed Order)(Snell, James) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Gonzalez Rogers granting 90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply 88 Amended Complaint Response to Amended Complaint due by 1/15/2016. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 88 Amended Complaint filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 11/19/2015) Modified on 11/20/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2015 Filing 89 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 20, 2015 AT 9:01AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 88 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief 28 U.S.C. §§ 2201 and 2202 against All Defendants. Filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Snell, James) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
October 21, 2015 Filing 87 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 13, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 86 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2016. (Related document(s) 86 ) (rhm) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Twitter, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Snell, James) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT AND, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION, ORDERING FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT IN LIGHT OF RECENT LEGISLATION by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ; denying 28 Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 13, 2015 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 10/13/2015 re 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by James B. Comey, Eric H. Holder, Jr., United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. Court Reporter Name Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney Michael Sussman. Defendant Attorney Steven Bressler. Attachment MINUTES.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2015)
September 28, 2015 Filing 83 Supplemental Brief in Response re 81 Order on Stipulation filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified on 9/29/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2015 Filing 82 Response to Court's Four Questions on Effect of Recent Legislation filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Sussmann, Michael) (Filed on 9/28/2015) Modified on 9/29/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2015 is CONTINUED to 10/13/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 80 Stipulation/Request to Continue Hearing re: Effect of USA Freedom Act; Directing the Filing of Supplemental Briefing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continuing Hearing on Effect of Recent Legislation filed by Twitter, Inc., Loretta E. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael A. Sussmann, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sussmann, Michael) (Filed on 9/10/2015) Modified on 9/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2015 Filing 79 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING.Hearing re Supplemental Briefing [Order at Dkt. No. 73 ] is set for Tuesday, 9/22/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 78 NOTICE by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice of Recent Authority (Attachments: # 1 Recent Order of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit)(Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 7, 2015 Filing 77 Defendants' Reply Addressing Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief Regarding the USA FREEDOM Act filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 75 ) (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 8/7/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2015 Filing 76 Reply Supplemental Brief on Effect of Recent Legislation re 74 Supplemental Brief, filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Sussmann, Michael) (Filed on 8/7/2015) Modified on 8/10/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2015 Filing 75 Opening Supplemental Brief on Effect of Recent Legislation re 69 Order filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 69 ) (Sussmann, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2015) Modified on 7/20/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2015 Filing 74 Supplemental Brief Regarding the USA FREEDOM Act of 2015 re 69 Order filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice. (Related document(s) 69 ) (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 7/17/2015) Modified on 7/20/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 72 Stipulation Setting Revised Briefing Schedule. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set a Revised Briefing Schedule filed by Twitter, Inc., Loretta E. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Snell, James) (Filed on 6/23/2015) Modified on 6/24/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Amanda L. Andrade representing Plaintiff Twitter Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 16, 2015 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Amanda L. Andrade ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9605206.) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Andrade, Amanda) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DIRECTING FURTHER BRIEFING RE: EFFECT OF RECENT LEGISLATION. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE by Twitter, Inc. Regarding Enactment of USA Freedom Act (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Snell, James) (Filed on 6/9/2015)
June 3, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice Regarding Enactment of the USA FREEDOM Act (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit The USA FREEDOM Act of 2015)(Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Plaintiff's "Claims Tracking Table" by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copy of Plaintiff's "Claims Tracking Table", # 2 Exhibit Notice Regarding Classified Exhibit 2)(Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 18, 2015 Filing 64 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 5, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 63 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2015. (Related documents(s) 63 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Twitter, Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Snell, James) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
May 5, 2015 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 5/5/2015 re 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by James B. Comey, Eric H. Holder, Jr., United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation Court Reporter Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Eric Miller. Defendant Attorney Steven Bressler. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS;, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2015 is CONTINUED to 5/5/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/30/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 27, 2015 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Request to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Twitter, Inc.., Eric H. Holder, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Sussmann, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2015) Modified on 3/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2015 Filing 59 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2015 is CONTINUED to Tuesday, 4/14/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2015)
March 10, 2015 Filing 58 NOTICE of Errata re: Amicus Curiae Brief of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press 37 -1 by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press (Attachments: # 1 Errata Corrected Brief Amicus Curiae of the Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 3/10/2015) Modified on 3/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2015 Filing 57 REPLY (re 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) ) filed byJames B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Peter Karanjia representing Amicus parties: Buzz Feed Inc.; First Look Media Inc.; Guardian News & Media; National Public Radio, Inc.; PEN American Center; WP Company LLC dba the Washington Post. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 37 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 42 Motion for Leave to File; granting 46 Motion for Leave to File; granting 49 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 52 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The briefs submitted with the motions and requests are DEEMED FILED as of February 17, 2015, and no additional filing is necessary. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING 41 Stipulation for Proposed Amici Corps. 1 & 2 to Proceed Under Pseudonym (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Townsend KatieLynn (KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 52 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation. Responses due by 3/3/2015. Replies due by 3/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz for Amicus Curiae Freedom of the Press Foundation (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9294676.) filed by BuzzFeed, Inc., First Look Media, Inc., Guardian News & Media, National Public Radio, Inc., PEN American Center, WP Company LLC dba: The Washington Post. (Adler, Deborah) (Filed on 2/17/2015) Modified on 2/18/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by BuzzFeed, Inc., First Look Media, Inc., Guardian News & Media, National Public Radio, Inc., PEN American Center, WP Company LLC dba: The Washington Post. Responses due by 3/3/2015. Replies due by 3/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Brief for Media and Writers Amici, # 2 Proposed Order)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE by BuzzFeed, Inc., First Look Media, Inc., Guardian News & Media, National Public Radio, Inc., PEN American Center, WP Company LLC dba: The Washington Post RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT FOR MEDIA AND WRITERS AMICI (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Clare Hofmann (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief filed by CloudFlare, Inc., CREDO Mobile, Inc., A Medium Corporation, Wickr, Inc., Wikimedia Foundation, Automattic Inc., Sonic.net, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amici Curiae Brief, # 2 Declaration of Marcia Hofmann, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Karanjia (Karanjia, Peter) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A. Adler (Adler, Deborah) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Burke (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae filed by Corporations 1 & 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Amici Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for [Proposed] Amici Corps. 1 & 2 to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by Corporations 1 & 2. (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt Bradford Opsahl (Opsahl, Kurt) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gellis Crocker (Crocker, Andrew) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by David A Greene (Greene, David) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 17, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press. Responses due by 3/3/2015. Replies due by 3/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(KatieLynn, Townsend) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
February 13, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial). 2/17/15 for amicus briefs, if any;Replies due by 3/4/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 35 Stipulation Setting Revised Briefing Schedule (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 12, 2015 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set a Revised Briefing Schedule filed by Twitter, Inc., Eric H. Holder, Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Snell, James) (Filed on 2/12/2015) Modified on 2/12/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2015 Filing 34 RESPONSE (re 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) ) Opposition to Partial Motion to Dismiss filed byTwitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snell, James) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 33 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 26, 2015, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 30 Transcript Order, 32 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2015. (Related document(s) 30 , 32 ) (rhm) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 30, 2015 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Twitter, Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Snell, James) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 26, 2015 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/26/2015.Court Reporter : Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney James Snell and Michael Sussmann. Defendant Attorney Steven Bressler and Julia Berman. Attachment Minutes.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2015) Modified on 1/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2015 Filing 29 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, Twitter. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 1/20/2015) Modified on 1/21/2015 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 2/6/2015. Replies due by 2/20/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
January 5, 2015 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Snell, James) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 5, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to File Motion to Dismiss Complaint by 1/9/15;Responses due by 2/6/2015. Replies due by 2/20/2015. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 24 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting to Set a Briefing Schedule filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice, Twitter Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Berman, Julia) (Filed on 12/3/2014) Modified on 12/4/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2014 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice., Twitter Inc (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 12/3/2014) Modified on 12/4/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2014 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Alexandra Berman (Berman, Julia) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
November 17, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE Regarding Classified Document by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Unclassified, Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Proposed "Transparency Report", # 2 Exhibit 2. October 8, 2014 Letter from Steven Bressler to Michael Sussmann)(Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 11/17/2014) Modified on 11/18/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2014 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2015 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
November 6, 2014 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter, Inc. re 14 Summons Reissued, 15 Summons Reissued, 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Service on Eric Holder, Attorney General of the United States, # 2 Exhibit B - Service on United States Department of Justice, # 3 Exhibit C - Service on James Comey, Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 4 Exhibit D - Service on Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 5 Exhibit E - Service on Deputy Attorney General, James M. Cole, # 6 Exhibit F - Service on United States Attorney for the Northern District of California)(Miller, Eric) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/20/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice.. (Bressler, Steven) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 15 Summons Reissued as to James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 9, 2014 Filing 14 Summons Reissued as to Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 13 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/8/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Filing 12 *posted in error - please see doc. 15 * Summons Issued as to James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 10/9/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Filing 11 *posted in error - please see doc. 14 * Summons Issued as to Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 10/9/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Hayley Berlin (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Michael Sussmann (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2014) Modified on 1/30/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Snell (Snell, James) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Miller, Eric) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Miller, Eric) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 4 MOTION of Hayley L. Berlin for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8977283) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Berlin, Hayley) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION of Michael A. Susmann for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8977180) filed by Twitter, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Sussmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/7/2014) Modified on 10/8/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2014 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Twitter, Inc. and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Miller, Eric) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James B. Comey, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Eric H. Holder, Jr, United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8977026.). Filed by Twitter, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Eric) (Filed on 10/7/2014) Modified on 10/8/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twitter, Inc. v. Holder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Hayley Lara Berlin
Represented By: Eric David Miller
Represented By: James G. Snell
Represented By: Michael A Sussmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Steven Yale Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Steven Yale Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Comey
Represented By: Steven Yale Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Steven Yale Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?