Patel v. Nike Retail Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Payal Patel
Defendant: Nike Retail Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv04781
Filed: October 27, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Final Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call: A Final Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call is scheduled for 12/21/2018 at 01:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson.Counsel shall call the following conference call number: 1-888-684-8852/Access Code: 2925506If counsel have any questions please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, at 415-522-4708 or email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge: Settlement Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 a.m., in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order re Settlement Conference)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call held on 11/27/2018.FTR Time: Not ReportedTotal Time: 22 minutesPlaintiff's Attorney: Piya Mukherjee, Esq.Defendant's Attorney: David Rosenberg, Esq. Proceedings: Minutes of Pre-Settlement Conference Telephonic Call. Both Counsel appeared by telephone. The following schedule was proposed: Informal Discovery if necessary, both sides to cooperate should something arise; Settlement Conference Dates proposed: January 8 or 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall confer with their clients and contact the Courtroom Deputy. Final Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call: 12/21/2018 @ 1:30 p.m., counsel shall call the following number: 1-888-684-8852/Passcode: 2925506; Exchange of Settlement Conference Statements: 12/20/2018, copy by e-mail to Courtroom Deputy; Plaintiff's Settlement Demand: 12/13/2018, copy by e-mail to Courtroom Deputy; Defendant's Response: 12/20/2018, copy by e-mail to Courtroom Deputy; Memorandum of Understanding by Plaintiff: 12/13/2018; Defendant's Comments due: 12/20/2018. Copy by e-mail to Courtroom Deputy.Courtroom Deputy's Contact Info: email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov; phone: 415-522-4708 (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/27/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 132 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call: This case has been referred for Settlement Conference to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. A Pre-Settlement Conference Telephone Call is scheduled for 11/27/2018 at 01:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel shall be prepared to speak about the status of this case and to schedule a Settlement Conference date. Counsel shall call the following conference call number: 1-888-684-8852/Access Code: 2925506 If counsel have any questions please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Rose Maher, at 415-522-4708 or email: Rose_Maher@cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 16, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Further Case Management Conference held telephonically on 11/15/2018. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded.Plaintiff Attorney: Ruchira Mukherjee - Telephonic. Defendant Attorney: Jon Meer - Telephonic. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2018) Modified on 11/15/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2018 Filing 129 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 128 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rivapalacio, Victoria) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 4, 2018 Filing 127 CLERK'S NOTICE The Case Management Conference set for November 15, 2018 will be held at 11:00 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Call at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 126 Proposed Order and Plaintiff's Request for Counsel to Participate in Case Management Conference by Telephone by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 125 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for October 25, 2018 is continued to November 15, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by November 8, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 124 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 122 Clerk's Notice, filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE by Payal Patel of Withdrawal of Appearance of Molly A. DeSario (Bhowmik, Aparajit) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 122 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2018. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 10/18/2018 has been continued to 10/25/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION TO STRIKE AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/14/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 120 Supplemental Brief re 118 Case Management Conference - Further,,, filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Michael Afar ISO Defendant Nike's Supplemental Reply Brief ISO Renewed Motion to Strike Representative PAGA Claims or, Alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Related document(s) 118 ) (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 119 Supplemental Brief re 118 Case Management Conference - Further,,, Opposition to Defendant's Second Renewed Motion to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action filed byPayal Patel. (Related document(s) 118 ) (DeSario, Molly) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/19/2018. As discussed at the Case Management Conference, plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief of no more than 15 pages regarding defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike (Dkt. No. 99) by 8/2/2018. Defendant shall file a response of no more than 10 pages by 8/9/2018. After the parties have submitted their filings, a decision will be issued without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b).Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Molly DeSario. Defendant Attorney: Jon Meer, Michael Afar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 116 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -Plaintiff's filed by Payal Patel. (Rivapalacio, Victoria) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #113 Stipulation regarding the number of aggrieved employees for PAGA Claims. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael Afar Withdrawing Sheryl L. Skibbe As Counsel of Record (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Number of "Aggrieved Employees" For PAGA Claims filed by Payal Patel. (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 1, 2018 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.Case Management Statement due by 7/12/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 111 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion /PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 110 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #108 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motion Hearing previously set for 5/3/2018 continued to 5/10/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Payal Patel re #108 MOTION to Amend/Correct /PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF (Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 108 MOTION to Amend/Correct /PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Payal Patel. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 4/6/2018. Replies due by 4/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration In Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration In Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Order)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #106 Determination of Number of "Aggrieved Employees" for PAGA Claims. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/7/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Determination of Number of "Aggrieved Employees" for PAGA Claims filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 105 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/28/2017, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, rhondaaquilina@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #103 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2018. (Related documents(s) #103 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 12, 2017 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/12/2017. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2017. Further Case Management Conference (By Phone) set for 11/9/2017 11:00 AM.Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo. Plaintiff Attorney: Molly De Sario. Defendant Attorney: Sheryl Skibbe (by phone). Attachment: Civil Minutes. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2017)
September 29, 2017 Filing 103 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/28/17 before Judge Richard Seeborg by Nike Retail Services, Inc., for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2017 re #99 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint or, Alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Representative PAGA Action. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court: 45 minutes. Court Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina.Plaintiff Attorney: Molly DeSario. Defendant Attorney: Jon Meer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 101 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #99 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint or, Alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Representative PAGA Action ) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Afar ISO Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO its Renewed Motion to Strike any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint or, Alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Afar, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 100 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #99 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint or, Alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Representative PAGA Action ) filed byPayal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Piya Mukherjee in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion to Strike any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint or, Alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
August 24, 2017 Filing 99 RENEWED MOTION to Strike any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint or, Alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings as to the Representative PAGA Action filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 9/7/2017. Replies due by 9/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Renewed Motion to Strike, #2 Declaration In Support of Renewed Motion to Strike, #3 Proposed Order Granting Renewed Motion, #4 Request for Judicial Notice)(Elson, Orly) (Filed on 8/24/2017) Modified on 8/24/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2017 Filing 98 Declaration of Orly Z. Elson in Support of #97 Notice (Other) Defendant's Notice of Compliance With Discovery Order filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Elson, Orly) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE by Nike Retail Services, Inc. OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY ORDER (Elson, Orly) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/10/17 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero by Nike Retail Services, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 3/10/2017 re #91 Telephonic Status re: MOTION for Sanctions and Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Court's September 30, 2016 Order filed by Payal Patel. Motion is denied as moot.FTR Time 9:39-9:49. Plaintiff Attorney Piya Mukherjee (via phone). Defendant Attorney Michael Afar (via phone). Attachment Minute Order.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/10/2017) Transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. Modified on 4/28/2017 (notewarelS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2017 Filing 94 REPLY (re #91 MOTION for Sanctions and Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Court's September 30, 2016 Order ) filed byPayal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 7, 2017 Filing 93 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION for Sanctions and Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Court's September 30, 2016 Order ) (Preliminary Response) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 7, 2017 Filing 92 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC STATUS as to #91 MOTION for Sanctions and Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Court's September 30, 2016 Order. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel shall make telephonic arrangements through CourtCall at 866-582-6878. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2017)
March 3, 2017 Filing 91 MOTION for Sanctions and Motion to Compel Defendant's Compliance with Court's September 30, 2016 Order filed by Payal Patel. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 3/17/2017. Replies due by 3/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Piya Mukherjee, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE by Payal Patel of Disassociation of Counsel (Bhowmik, Aparajit) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE OR, ALTERNATIVELY, FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 3, 2016 Filing 88 REPLY (re #80 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint, or, Alternatively MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #80 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint, or, Alternatively MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion Hearing previously set for 11/18/2016 Continued to 12/15/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 86 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #80 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint, or, Alternatively MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion Hearing previously set for 11/17/2016 Continued to 11/18/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 26, 2016 Filing 85 RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint, or, Alternatively MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) filed byPayal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bhowmik, Aparajit) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND GRANTING REQUEST FOR LIMITED STAY OF THAT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 83 REPLY (re #81 Ex Parte Application re 78 Discovery Hearing,,, to Stay Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(e) ) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 14, 2016 Filing 82 RESPONSE (re #81 Ex Parte Application re 78 Discovery Hearing,,, to Stay Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(e) ) filed byPayal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bhowmik, Aparajit) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 81 Ex Parte Application re 78 Discovery Hearing,,, to Stay Magistrate Judge's Discovery Order, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(e) filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of P's & A's in Support, #2 Declaration of Michael Afar in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION to Strike Any Representative PAGA Action Allegations in the Complaint, or, Alternatively, MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/27/2016. Replies due by 11/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Michael Afar in Support, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Afar, #4 Proposed Order)(Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) re 78 Discovery Hearing,,, filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 10/27/2016. Replies due by 11/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing held on 9/30/2016. For all of the putative class members in connection with the TAGA claim, produce 1) all of their salary during various periods of time; 2) work weeks, which weeks they worked and the number of days they worked during each of those weeks as well as the total number of days; 3) All of the recap emails from the putative class members to their direct supervising head coaches during the class period. Parties are to produce documentation 30 days from today. Total Time in Court 25 minutes. Court Reporter: FTR: 10:13 - 10:38. Plaintiff Attorney Molly DeSario. Defendant Attorney Michael Afar. This is a text only Minute Entry (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2016) Modified on 10/3/2016 (afmS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE by Nike Retail Services, Inc. of WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Casey J.T. McCoy) (McCoy, Casey) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 9, 2016 Filing 76 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Discovery Hearing re: PAGA Discovery #75 set for 9/30/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
August 29, 2016 Filing 75 Discovery Letter Briefre: PAGA Discovery filed by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Victoria Rivapalacio, #2 Declaration of Michael Afar)(DeSario, Molly) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
April 4, 2016 Filing 74 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 24, 2016, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #72 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2016. (Related documents(s) #72 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING #41 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 72 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/24/2016 before Hon. Richard Seeborg by Nike Retail Services, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 24, 2016 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Richard Seeborg: Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2016 re #41 MOTION to Certify Class . Matter taken under submission.Total Time in Court 1 hour. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Aparajit Bhowmik, Elliot Gonzalez. Defendant Attorney: Jon Meer, Michael Afar. This is a text only Minute Entry (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 70 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE by Payal Patel re #41 MOTION to Certify Class of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 68 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTIONS HEARING DATE. RE: #64 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Reply Memorandum Re Motion for Class Certification, RE: #65 Ex Parte Application Re #64 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Reply Memorandum Re Motion for Class Certification . Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE (re #65 Ex Parte Application re #64 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Reply Memorandum Re Motion for Class Ceertification ) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 66 RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Reply Memorandum Re Motion for Class Ceertification ) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 65 Ex Parte Application re #64 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Reply Memorandum Re Motion for Class Ceertification filed by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Elliot Gonzalez In Support of Plaintiff Payal Patel's Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time for the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion Seeking Court Approval to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Her Reply Memorandum re Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibits A and B to Declaration of D. Elliot Gonzalez, #3 [Proposed] Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Gonzalez, David) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Reply Memorandum Re Motion for Class Ceertification filed by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Romina Keshishyan In Support of Plaintiff Payal Patel's Motion Seeking Court Approval to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Her Reply Memorandum re Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibits A through C to Declaration of Romina Keshishyan, #3 [Proposed] Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Gonzalez, David) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
February 26, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Afar (Afar, Michael) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 62 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiff's Evidence In Support of Her Reply Memorandum Re Motion for Class Certification by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Maya Harel)(Harel, Maya) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Class Certification Motion Hearing Date. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 8, 2016 Reset Motion Hearing as to #41 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Class Certification Motion Hearing Date filed by Payal Patel. (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 59 REPLY (re #41 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byPayal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Reply to Motion for Class Certification, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Evidence in Support of Reply Memorandum, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Class Certification Reply Deadline and Hearing Date. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/20/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 20, 2016 Reset Motion Hearing as to #41 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Class Certification Reply Deadline and Hearing Date filed by Payal Patel. (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 8, 2016 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Motion Hearing held on 1/8/2016 re #52 MOTION to Compel filed by Payal Patel. Discovery issue has been resolved. Court Reporter Name Joann Bryce. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2016)
December 8, 2015 Filing 55 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF. Motion Hearing re: #52 Joint Discovery Letter Brief set for 1/8/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION REPLY DEADLINE AND HEARING DATE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2016 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015) Modified on 12/4/2015 (cl, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2015 Filing 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Class Certification Reply Deadline and Hearing Date filed by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rivapalacio, Victoria) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 52 Letter from Parties re: Joint Discovery Dispute Correspondence to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 12/8/2015 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2015 Filing 51 RESPONSE (re #41 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Separate Summary Statement in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #2 Appendix of Evidence Part 1 of 3, #3 Appendix of Evidence Part 2 of 3, #4 Appendix of Evidence Part 3 of 3)(Harel, Maya) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO FILE JOINT DISCOVRY LETTER by December 1, 2015. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nike Retail Services, Inc. re #48 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Joint Discovery Report (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Filing 48 Letter from Defendant to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero Re Joint Discovery Report . (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 47 Letter from Plaintiff to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero Regarding Defendant's Non-Compliance and Failure to Participate in Joint Discovery Dispute Letter Process . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Piya Mukherjee, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend class certification opposition and reply deadlines. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 19, 2015 Reset Motion Hearing [#41] MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Class Certification Opposition and Reply Deadlines filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin Aiwazian (Aiwazian, Edwin) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE by Payal Patel of Errata to Declaration of Edwin Aiwazian in Support of Motion for Class Certification [Doc. No. 41-8] (Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 42 Declaration in Support of #41 MOTION to Certify Class filed byPayal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ramos, #2 Declaration of Cherry)(Related document(s) #41 ) (Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 41 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Payal Patel. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/6/2015. Replies due by 11/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Bhowmik Part 1, EXHIBITS 1-6, *** #3 Declaration of Bhowmik, Part 2, EXHIBITS 7-8, #4 Declaration of Bhowmik, Part 3, EXHIBITS 9-10, #5 Declaration of Bhowmik, Part 4, EXHIBITS 11, PGS. NRS002845- 002900, #6 Declaration EXHIBIT 11, PGS. NRS002901-2987, #7 Declaration of Bhowmik, Part 6, EXHIBITS 12-17 DOCUMENTS LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENTS TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #8 Declaration of Aiwazian, #9 Declaration of Patel, #10 Declaration of Cornwell, #11 Declaration of Dakin, #12 Declaration of Flores, #13 Declaration of Whye, #14 Declaration of Wilson, #15 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman) (Filed on 9/25/2015) Modified on 10/15/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2015 Filing 40 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/21/2015, before Judge Richard Seeborg. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number 415-264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #39 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2015. (Related documents(s) #39 ) (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
June 3, 2015 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nike Retail Services, Inc. for Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina. (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
June 3, 2015 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Discovery Hearing, lead trial counsel meet and confer, re: Joint Discovery Letter #33 held on 6/3/2015. Counsel met in the jury room to work out the discovery issues. Parties shall e-file a joint letter with the Court advising that all outstanding discovery issues have been resolved.FTR Time Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Piya Mukherjee. Defendant Attorney Sheryl Skibbe. This is a text only Minute Entry (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/3/2015)
May 28, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER Discovery Hearing (lead trial counsel, in person, meet and confer) re: #33 set for 6/3/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/28/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Denying #24 Motion for Summary Judgment. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2015)
May 21, 2015 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Richard Seeborg: MATTER TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION. Motion Hearing held on 5/21/2015 re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc. Court Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2015)
May 20, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/19/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 33 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Number One filed by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 32 Request for Judicial Notice re #30 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant's Request for Judicial Noice in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) #30 ) (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 31 Declaration of Casey J.T. McCoy in Support of #30 Reply to Opposition/Response in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Casey J.T. McCoy In Support of Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Casey J.T. McCoy In Support of Defendant's Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment)(Related document(s) #30 ) (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
May 7, 2015 Filing 30 REPLY (re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Meer, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
April 16, 2015 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Plaintiff Payal Patel in Opposition to #28 Stipulation and Order,, Terminate Motions,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, filed byPayal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik with Supporting Exhibits, #2 Memorandum in Opposition, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #28 ) (Bhowmik, Aparajit) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CONTINUE HEARING DATE. Plaintiff's Opposition due by 4/16/2015; Defendant's Reply 5/7/2015. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/5/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Continue Hearing Date filed by Payal Patel. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
February 25, 2015 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Protective Order Re Confidentiality of Documents & Information filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 2/25/2015)
February 19, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/2/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 3/5/2015. Replies due by 3/12/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Casey J.T. McCoy in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(McCoy, Casey) (Filed on 2/19/2015) Modified on 4/16/2015 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/5/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
February 5, 2015 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/5/2015.Court Reporter: Not Reported. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE The Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2015 will be held at 11 AM. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at (866) 582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference to arrange their participation. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice.(rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 19 Proposed Order and Request for Counsel to Participate in Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone by Payal Patel. (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Nike Retail Services, Inc. filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
January 15, 2015 Filing 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
November 21, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruchira Piya Mukherjee (Mukherjee, Ruchira) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/21/14. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nike Retail Services, Inc... (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 19, 2014 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
October 29, 2014 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nike Retail Services, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration in Support, #8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Declaration in Support,, #6 Statement, #5 Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Declaration in Support (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 28, 2014 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 27, 2014 Answer to Removed Complaint (See Doc No. #2 -Exhibit C) by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/28/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2014 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Nike Retail Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nike, Inc., Corporate Parent Nike USA, Inc. for Nike Retail Services, Inc.. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 4 Declaration of Evan S. Reynolds in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 3 Declaration of Mara Harrington in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byNike Retail Services, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 Filing 2 Declaration of Maya Harel in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A ***Complaint from the Alameda County Superior Court***, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C ***Answer to the Complaint***, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Harel, Maya) (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/28/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Civil Action to United States District Court; No Process from Superior Court, County of Alameda. Their case number is HG13704610. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-9025933). Filed by Nike Retail Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Harel, Maya). ***Complaint from Alameda County Superior Court is attach to Docket No. 2 Exhibit A*** (Filed on 10/27/2014) Modified on 10/28/2014 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Nike Retail Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nike Retail Services, Inc.
Represented By: Orly Zelta Elson
Represented By: Sheryl Lyn Skibbe
Represented By: Michael Afar
Represented By: Jonathan Douglas Meer
Represented By: Maya Harel
Represented By: Casey Jean Teele McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payal Patel
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Represented By: Kyle Roald Nordrehaug
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Ruchira Piya Mukherjee
Represented By: David Elliot Gonzalez
Represented By: Molly Ann DeSario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?