Romack v. Bitcasa, Inc
Plaintiff: Shawn Romack
Defendant: Bitcasa, Inc
Case Number: 3:2014cv05005
Filed: November 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RE STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. re 41 STIPULATION; 37 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 4/22/2015 at noon. Reply due by 4/29/2015 at noon. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 2, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 32 STIPULATION. Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2015 at noon. Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 29, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTION(DKT. NO. 15) by Hon. William Alsup re 15 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 13, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romack v. Bitcasa, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitcasa, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Romack
Represented By: Jordan S Elias
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?