Garnica v. Hometeam Pest Defense, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Garnica
Defendant: Hometeam Pest Defense, Inc. and Rollins, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv05243
Filed: November 26, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 6/8/2017. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 42 Motion to Dismiss (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 29 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 27 Stipulation re Scheduling of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss and Initial Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 23 Scheduling Request. Deadline to file amended complaint is 3/4/2015. Deadline to respond to amended complaint is 3/25/2015.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order as Modified by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 21 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Scarborough.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Vince Chhabria. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/15/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garnica v. Hometeam Pest Defense, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Garnica
Represented By: Gayle Meryl Blatt
Represented By: David S. Casey, Jr.
Represented By: Jason Evans
Represented By: Don Howarth
Represented By: Patricia Kay Oliver
Represented By: R. Rex Parris
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Rankin
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Suzelle Moss Smith
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hometeam Pest Defense, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: T. Robert Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollins, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Sandrock
Represented By: T. Robert Scarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?