Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. v. Burwell
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Case Number: 3:2014cv05255
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2015 Filing 54 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying #43 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Granting #46 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 20, 2015 Filing 52 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2016. Case Management Conference reset from 12/15/2015 to 1/14/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Conference reset from 12/3/2015 to 12/15/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
September 21, 2015 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 12/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE resetting Case Management Conference from 8/6/15 to 10/15/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 48 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 47 REPLY (re #43 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #46 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment ) in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McCallum, Joanna) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
June 26, 2015 Filing 46 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's #43 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Responses due by 7/17/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 6/26/2015) Modified on 6/29/2015 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/22/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadlines for Defendant's Opposition Brief and Plaintiff's Reply Brief and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McCallum, Joanna) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Responses due by 6/19/2015. Replies due by 7/6/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment)(McCallum, Joanna) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Briefing on Summary Judgment Motion by Two Days Until May 22, 2015 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/19/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Briefing on Summary Judgment Motion by Two Days Until May 22, 2015 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McCallum, Joanna) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2015. Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
May 12, 2015 Filing 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 5/12/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference To May 21, 2015 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/4/15. All counsel must appear in person.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #34 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
May 1, 2015 Filing 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference To May 21, 2015 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (McCallum, Joanna) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint bySylvia Mathews Burwell. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 22, 2015 Filing 34 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal / Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 1 of 8), #2 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 2 of 8), #3 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 3 of 8), #4 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 4 of 8), #5 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 5 of 8), #6 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 6 of 8), #7 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 7 of 8), #8 Unredacted Sealed Administrative Record (Part 8 of 8))(Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
April 3, 2015 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 4/3/2015)
March 24, 2015 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #30 Stipulation to reset CMC to 5/14/15 at 9:30 am. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
March 19, 2015 Filing 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 3/19/2015)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #28 Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/5/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015)
March 4, 2015 Filing 28 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Sylvia Mathews Burwell. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/18/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/26/2015. Case Management Conference set for 4/2/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/18/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. /Proof of Service (McCallum, Joanna) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
February 3, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Peter Michael Bryce (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2015)
January 29, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Lauren Allen (Allen, Joanna) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Carri Maas (Maas, Carri) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 28, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy B. Briggs (Briggs, Amy) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/27/15. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 27, 2015 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 23, 2015 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sylvia Mathews Burwell.. (Wang, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
December 31, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Sobol McCallum (McCallum, Joanna) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 31, 2014 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc... (Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/17/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 17, 2014 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2014)
December 3, 2014 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. re #1 Complaint, #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #7 Summons Issued as to USA, #8 Order of Recusal, #4 Statement, #9 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/3/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on December 3, 2014. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2014)
December 2, 2014 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Prime Healthcare Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Chino Valley Medical Center for Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities -- Amended (Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/2/2014. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sylvia Mathews Burwell, U.S. Attorney. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2015. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/1/2014) Modified on 12/1/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2014 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
December 1, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sylvia Mathews Burwell ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9108450.). Filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pimstone, Gregory) (Filed on 12/1/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. v. Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Represented By: Jennifer S Wang
Represented By: Peter Michael Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Amy B. Briggs
Represented By: Gregory Neil Pimstone
Represented By: Carri Maas
Represented By: Joanna Lauren Allen
Represented By: Joanna Sobol McCallum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?