DSS Technology Management, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.

Plaintiff: DSS Technology Management, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Mediator: David Folsom
Miscellaneous: Richard Egan
Case Number: 3:2014cv05330
Filed: December 4, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 175 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr..(This order denies the 157 Motion to Strike as moot). Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2019 and Further Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018) Modified on 12/6/2018 to remove duplicate order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 169 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 168 Motion to Substitute Attorney Permitting Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Marc Christopher Belloli; Margaret Elizabeth Day; Ian N. Feinberg; David L. Alberti and Jeremiah Aaron Armstrong terminated.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order 167 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 166 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kula, Kenneth. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 156 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 155 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Pomeroy.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 152 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Bukovcan, Niknaz.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 130 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/28/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order 122 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 99 Motion to Stay. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order 116 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 114 Stipulation selecting Private ADR (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order 104 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 103 Stipulation to Extend Time for DSS Technology Management, Inc. to Respond to Apple, Inc.'s 99 Motion to Stay Case Pending Completion of IPR Proceedings. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order 102 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 101 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time for DSS Technology Management, Inc. to Respond to Apple, Inc.'s 99 Motion to Stay Case Pending Completion of IPR Proceedings. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order 95 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 94 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order 91 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/9/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DSS Technology Management, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSS Technology Management, Inc.
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Timothy J.H. Craddock
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Mark Davin Perantie
Represented By: Michael David Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Alberti
Represented By: Jeremiah A Armstrong
Represented By: Marc Belloli
Represented By: Nickolas Bohl
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Ian N. Feinberg
Represented By: Vinay K Malik
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Yakov Zolotorev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: David Folsom
Represented By: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Richard Egan
Represented By: Richard D. Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?