Canty et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Canty and Betsy Canty
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv05407
Filed: December 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. Signed 6/4/2024 by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 34 Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of John H. Velyvis, M.D ; denying 35 Defendants' Motion to Partially Exclude Certain Opinions of Albert H. Burstein, Ph.D and denying in part and requiring briefing in part Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 36 . Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment due 6/18/2024. Reply, if any, due 6/28/2024. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2024)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-201) MDL 2244: Transferring case to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of Texas. Signed by The Judge Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 02/06/15. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 17 STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/26/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT.Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/16/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canty et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Canty
Represented By: William Eric Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betsy Canty
Represented By: William Eric Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?