In re Lidoderm Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health and Welfare Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 178 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, Steven Roller, Fraternal Order of Police, Miami Lodge 20, Insurance Trust Fund, NECA-IBEW Welfare Trust Fund, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Pirelli Armstrong Retiree Medical Benefits Trust, City of Providence, Rhode Island, Roofers Local 96 Health and Welfare Fund, Greater Metropolitan Hotel Employers-Employees Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Cement Masons Health & Welfare Fund, Painters District Council No.30 Health & Welfare Fund, PHILADELPHIA FEDERATION OF TEACHERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF FIRE FIGHTERS LOCAL 22 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 115 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, IRENE KAMPANIS, Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R, Allied Services Division Welfare Fund, TWIN CITY IRON WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, Cesar Castillo, Inc., American Sales Company, LLC, Government Employees Health Association, Inc, Iron Workers District Council of New England Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund, End-Payor Plaintiffs', Walgreen, Co, The Kroger Co., Safeway Inc., HEB Grocery Company LP, ALBERTSONS LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., All Plaintiffs, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., The State of California, State of California, State of Alabama, State of Arkansas, State of Delaware, District of Columbia, State of Florida, State of Idaho, State of Illinois, State of Indiana, State of Iowa, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Louisiana, State of Maryland, State of Minnesota, State of Mississippi, State of Oklahoma, State of North Dakota, State of Ohio, State of Rhode Island, State of Washington, State of Wisconsin, Commonwealth of Virginia and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs
Defendant: Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Prime Therapeutics LLC, Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd. and Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: All Parties, Express Scripts, Inc., Caremark, LLC, Federal Trade Commission, Absent Class Members, OptiSource, LLC and OptumRx, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014md02521
Filed: April 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER APPROVING RG/2 CLAIMS ADMINISTRATION LLC'S REVISED MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF RESIDUAL SETTLEMENT FUND. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 2/2/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1097 AMENDED DECLARATION Regarding Re-Distribution to the Class re #1090 MOTION for Distribution of Residual Settlement Fund filed by Tina Chiango, RG/2 Claims Administration LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cover Letter)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2022)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1095 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Morgan L. Petkovich. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1095 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application For Admission Of Morgan Petkovich Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16720487.) filed by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate)(Petkovich, Morgan) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER GRANTING #1090 MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2021)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1093 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2021 will begin at 10:00 AM. This proceeding will be held via Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photog raphing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #htt ps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 ORDER re #1091 Notice by Arnold & Porter to Withdraw as counsel for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/2/2021. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1091 NOTICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc Notice of Request and Request for Leave to Withdraw as Co-Counsel for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1090 MOTION for Distribution of Residual Settlement Fund filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/15/2021. Replies due by 11/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (Proposed Order))(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER GRANTING END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR CY PRES DISTRIBUTION OF UNCASHED SETTLEMENT FUNDS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1088 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2021)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1088 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds for Cy Pres Distribution of Uncashed Settlement Funds filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Responses due by 5/27/2021. Replies due by 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk, #2 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Dena) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1087 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' Second Post-Distribution Accounting (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER GRANTING END-PAYOR PLAINTIFFS' #1085 SECOND REQUEST FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISBURSE SETTLEMENT FUNDS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1085 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds Second Request filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Responses due by 5/6/2020. Replies due by 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1084 STATUS REPORT regarding August 12, 2019 letter from Jason Bradley by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1083 Statement regarding August 12, 2019 Letter from Jason Bradley (ECF 1082) by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1082 Letter dated 08/12/19; re Claim from Jason Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)PER CHAMBERS
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1080 Administrative Motion to relate cases. Case No. 3:19cv4157 is found to be related. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1080 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1079 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' Post-Distribution Accounting (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENTINJUNCTION AND MONETARY RELIEF. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/07/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1073 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1074 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1075 STATUS REPORT Regarding Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Post-Distribution Accounting by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1074 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Responses due by 5/28/2019. Replies due by 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Redacted), #3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1073 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B (Redacted) to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Request for Authorization to Disburse Settlement Funds, #4 Exhibit B (Under Seal) to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Request for Authorization to Disburse Settlement Funds)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
April 2, 2019 Filing 1072 NOTICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Watson Laboratories, Inc. Of Withdrawal of Marc N. Bernstein and Will B. Fitton as Counsel of Record (Bernstein, Marc) (Filed on 4/2/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1071 STATUS REPORT regarding End-Payor Settlement Distribution by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Markham Sherwood)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1070 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Devona Lynn Wells (Wells, Devona) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1069 STATUS REPORT regarding End-Payor Settlement Distribution by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part #1062 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Good cause has been shown to seal the wholesale figures in Exhibit 1 to the Declaration. Therefore, Dkt. No. 1062-6 may remain under seal. However, no justification has been shown to merit sealing of the motion itself. Therefore the Clerk shall UNSEAL Dkt. No. 1062-4. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (wholc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 Order by Judge William H. Orrick denying #1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The fact that Cardinal Health has an assignment clause with this retailer, in and of itself, does not merit sealing under any standard. The fact that Cardinal Health has assignment clauses with a number of other retailers has already been publicly disclosed throughout a number of filings in this case. The Clerk shall UNSEAL Dkt. No. 1064-3. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER. (wholc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 ORDER APPROVING DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS' #1063 MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF NET SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1063 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1065 Declaration in Support of #1063 MOTION for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund (redacted) Supplemental Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1063 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1064 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Seal Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund and Portions of Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Motion filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Filed Under Seal)(Sorensen, David) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 1063 MOTION for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund (redacted) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/13/2019. Replies due by 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (redacted), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Proposed Order))(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 1062 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund and Portions of Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Distribution of Net Settlement Fund, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER WITHDRAWING OBJECTION AND SUBPOENA by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1060 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1060 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER withdrawing Objection and Subpoena filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1059 NOTICE by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 132 Health and Welfare Fund of Change of Firm Name (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1058 Notice (Other) filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs' Firm did not identify the parties (SPECIFICALLY) that they represent in this MDL case. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1058 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' of Change of Firm Name (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1057 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/20/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/20/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER [AS MODIFIED] GRANTING END-PAYOR CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/20/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/20/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1053 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of #1023 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1023 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1052 Letter from Sean Tepe IN RESPONSE TO DOCKET ITEM 1044. (Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 16, 2018 Filing 1051 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/12/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 9/16/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1050 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/12/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Government Employees Health Association, Inc, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1049 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 12, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1048 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 12, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co, Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1047 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 12, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1046 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 12, 2018, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1041 in 3:14-md-02521-WHO) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2018. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1045 NOTICE by International Union of Operating Engineers Local 49 Health and Welfare Fund of Withdrawal of Appearance of Kristen G. Marttila (Marttila, Kristen) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO CONDUCT LIMITED DISCOVERY OF OBJECTOR PAMELA SWEENEY ON EXPEDITED BASIS [AS MODIFIED] by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1038 Motion for Discovery. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1042 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' of Filing Amended [Proposed] Order Granting End-Payor Class Counsels Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting End-Payor Class Counsels Motion for an Award of Attorneys Fees, Expenses, and Service Awards)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1041 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/12/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1044 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER Amending #1040 Minutes of Motion Hearing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1040 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2018 re #1029 MOTION for Settlement filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs, #1026 MOTION for Settlement filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, #1030 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs, #1033 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by GEHA, #1038 MOTION for Discovery, #1023 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. All motions will be granted; written orders to follow. Total Time in Court: 28 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1039 NOTICE by Government Employees Health Association, Inc Appearance of Gerald Lawrence (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1038 MOTION for Discovery Expedited from Objector Pamela Sweeney filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Responses due by 9/20/2018. Replies due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1037 Letter regarding erroneously objecting to the settlement from Patricia Honorehfleary. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ddkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1036 REPLY (re #1029 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Plan of Allocation and Authorization to pay Notice and Administrative Expenses, #1030 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards ) filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Joint) of Dena C. Sharp, Renae D. Steiner, and Sharon K. Robertson, #2 Declaration of Carla A. Peak on implementation of End-Payor Class Settlement Notice Plan, #3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1035 OBJECTIONS TO SETTLEMENT; By Pam Sweeney. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)Per Chambers
August 20, 2018 Filing 1034 OBJECTIONS TO SETTLEMENT; by Patricia Honore Fleary. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)Per Chambers
July 31, 2018 Filing 1033 MOTION for Attorney Fees Separately Represented End-Payors' Supplemental Motion for Reimbursement of Out of Pocket Litigation Expenses filed by Government Employees Health Association, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/14/2018. Replies due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration)(Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1032 Declaration of Class Counsel (Compendium) in Support of #1030 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Related document(s) #1030 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1031 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, Renae D. Steiner, and Sharon K. Robertson in Support of #1029 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Plan of Allocation and Authorization to pay Notice and Administrative Expenses, #1030 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Related document(s) #1029 , #1030 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1030 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2018 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/21/2018. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1029 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval and Plan of Allocation and Authorization to pay Notice and Administrative Expenses filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2018 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/14/2018. Replies due by 8/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1028 Declaration of Tina Chiango in Support of #1026 MOTION for Settlement - Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement with All Defendants Regarding Notice to the Class filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1026 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1027 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of #1026 MOTION for Settlement - Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement with All Defendants filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #1026 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1026 MOTION for Settlement - Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Proposed Settlement with All Defendants filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/3/2018. Replies due by 8/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1025 Declaration of Joseph E. Brennan in Support of #1023 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #1023 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1024 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of #1023 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs filed byDirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kohn Declaration, #2 Declaration Gerstein Declaration, #3 Declaration Sobol Declaration, #4 Declaration Sorensen Declaration, #5 Declaration Kelly Declaration, #6 Declaration Tamoshunas Declaration, #7 Declaration Raphael Declaration, #8 Declaration Chorush Declaration, #9 Declaration Radice Declaration, #10 Declaration Nussbaum Declaration, #11 Declaration Eisler Declaration, #12 Exhibit All Firms' Combined App'x A, #13 Exhibit Time and Expense Reporting Guidelines)(Related document(s) #1023 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 1023 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Costs filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/25/2018. Replies due by 7/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Hernandez Decl., #2 Declaration Coakley Decl.)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1022 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Allied Services Division Welfare Fund. Responses due by 6/19/2018. Replies due by 6/26/2018. (Dugan, James) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 5, 2018 Filing 1021 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER #1022 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Allied Services Division Welfare Fund. Responses due by 6/19/2018. Replies due by 6/26/2018. (Dugan, James) (Filed on 6/5/2018) Modified on 6/5/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2018 Filing 1020 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER #1022 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Allied Services Division Welfare Fund. Responses due by 6/19/2018. Replies due by 6/26/2018. (Dugan, James) (Filed on 6/5/2018) Modified on 6/5/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: Terminate Motions,, Add and Terminate Attorneys, re [1020 ] Motion; #1021 Motion (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 5, 2018 Filing 1019 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-24-18, before Judge William Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #985 Transcript Order - Future Trial with Daily Transcripts ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2018. (Related documents(s) #985 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2018)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS, APPROVAL OF FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE, ANDSETTING SCHEDULE FOR FINAL APPROVAL HEARING by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1017 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. re #1009 Motion Hearing, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Unopposed Notice of Filing of Amended Settlement Notice Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Direct Purchaser Class Action Settlement Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Class Members Concerning Purchases of Brand and Generic Lidoderm and Preliminary Estimated Recovery, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Amended Order Granting Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlements and Final Approval Hearing)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENTS, APPROVING NOTICE AND CLAIMS PLAN, AND APPROVING PLAN OF ALLOCATION by Judge William H. Orrick. Fairness Hearing set for 9/12/2018 02:00 PM. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 1015 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 24, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 1014 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' re #1005 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval (Unopposed) Amended Settlement Documents (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 1013 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/24/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd., for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1012 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/24/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1011 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/24/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 1010 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/24/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Hennings, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Filing 1009 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2018 re #1004 , #1005 Motions for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Both plaintiff groups shall submit revised proposed Preliminary Approval orders and revised Notice/Claim forms for the Courts review prior to the Court granting preliminary approval. Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1008 CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing reset for 4/24/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 1007 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ; Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Substitute a Corrected Sealed Document filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David S. Nalven in support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Substitute a Corrected Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Substitute a Corrected Sealed Document, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Watson Settlement Agreement Attachment A, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Watson Settlement Agreement Attachment A)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 ORDER MODIFYING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #1001 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1005 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval (Unopposed) filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval, #2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #5 Declaration of Carla A. Peak in Support of Settlement Notice Plan, #6 Declaration of Dr. Hal J. Singer, #7 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1004 MOTION for Settlement ; Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for (1) Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants, (2) Approval of Form of Notice, and (3) A Schedule Leading to a Final Approval Hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/3/2018. Replies due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David S. Nalven in Support of Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for (1) Preliminary Approval of Settlement with all Defendants, (2) Approval of Form of Notice, and (3) a Schedule Leading to a Final Approval Hearing, #2 Exhibit Teikoku Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Watson Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Endo Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit [Proposed] Plan of Allocation for the Direct Purchaser Class, #6 Exhibit Leitzinger Declaration, #7 Exhibit Joint Class Notice, #8 Exhibit Teikoku Escrow Agreement, #9 Exhibit Watson Escrow Agreement, #10 Exhibit Endo Escrow Agreement, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1003 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Appendix A (Redacted) to Endo Settlement Agreement, #4 Appendix A (Unredacted) to Endo Settlement Agreement, #5 Appendix A (Redacted) to Teikoku Settlement Agreement, #6 Appendix A (Unredacted) to Teikoku Settlement Agreement, #7 Appendix A (Redacted) to Watson Settlement Agreement, #8 Appendix A (Unredacted) to Watson Settlement Agreement)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 1002 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Endo Settlement Agreement - Attachment A, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Endo Settlement Agreement - Attachment A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Watson Settlement Agreement - Attachment A, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Watson Settlement Agreement - Attachment A)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 1001 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Deadline for Filing of Preliminary Approval Motions filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 ORDER MODIFYING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #999 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 999 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #997 Order on Stipulation filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 5, 2018 Filing 998 NOTICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Defendants' Notice of Submission of Redacted Materials Pursuant to Court's Order of February 20, 2018 (ECF 994) (Attachments: #1 ECF 770-3, #2 ECF 771-7, #3 ECF 772-2, #4 ECF 774-2, #5 ECF 775, #6 ECF 776-4, #7 ECF 776-8, #8 ECF 776-18, #9 ECF 776-20, #10 ECF 776-21, #11 ECF 776-28, #12 ECF 778-5, #13 ECF 780-2, #14 ECF 782-3, #15 ECF 782-4, #16 ECF 793-2, #17 ECF 793-7, #18 ECF 793-10, #19 ECF 793-11, #20 ECF 801-7, #21 ECF 807-4, #22 ECF 811, #23 ECF 812, #24 ECF 812-4, #25 ECF 812-10, #26 ECF 812-20, #27 ECF 813-2, #28 ECF 813-6, #29 ECF 814-4, #30 ECF 816-7, #31 ECF 816-10, #32 ECF 817-3, #33 ECF 818-23, #34 ECF 819-13, #35 ECF 819-14, #36 ECF 819-25, #37 ECF 819-27, #38 ECF 837, #39 ECF 840-3, #40 ECF 849-4, #41 ECF 849-7, #42 ECF 849-14, #43 ECF 850-9, #44 ECF 904, #45 ECF 904-12, #46 ECF 904-27, #47 ECF 904-33, #48 ECF 920-17, #49 ECF 925-13, #50 ECF 925-21, #51 ECF 925-32, #52 ECF 925-43)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 997 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATES AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick granting #996 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 996 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Trial Dates and Setting Schedule for Filing of Preliminary Approval Motions filed by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 995 NOTICE of Change of Address by Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr (Blanchfield, Garrett) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 994 ORDER GRANTING IN PART REMAINING #680 , #690 , #692 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 993 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBIT NUMBERING by Judge William H. Orrick granting #989 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 992 Declaration of Monika Isia Jasiewicz in Support of #991 Opposition/Response to Motion for Leave to Permit a Substitute Corporate Representative for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. at Trial filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #991 ) (Hubbard, Heidi) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 991 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #981 MOTION for Leave to Permit a Substitute Corporate Representative for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. at Trial ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hubbard, Heidi) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 15, 2018 Filing 990 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #974 MOTION to Substitute Party Ahold U.S.A., Inc. for American Sales Company, LLC ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hubbard, Heidi) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 989 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Exhibit Numbering filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 988 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference as to All Plaintiffs and Defendant ENDO held on 2/13/2018. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Thomas Sobol, Bruce Gerstein, Doug Wilson, Peter Kohn - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs; Gerald Lawrence - GEHA; Dena Sharp, Joseph Saveri, Dan Girard - End-Payor Plaintiffs Attorney for Defendant: George Gordon, James Conlan - ENDO Defendant(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 987 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Baumgarten, Elise) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 986 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by All Plaintiffs. (Hennings, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 985 *** DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR (SEE DOCKET #986) *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by All Plaintiffs. (Hennings, Kimberly) (Filed on 2/12/2018) Modified on 2/12/2018 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 984 ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting #982 Motion to Expedite. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 983 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of #982 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Their Motion for Leave to Permit a Substitute Corporate Representative for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. at Trial, #981 MOTION for Leave to Permit a Substitute Corporate Representative for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. at Trial filed byAmerican Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Related document(s) #982 , #981 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 982 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Their Motion for Leave to Permit a Substitute Corporate Representative for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. at Trial filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 9, 2018 Filing 981 MOTION for Leave to Permit a Substitute Corporate Representative for Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. at Trial filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Responses due by 2/23/2018. Replies due by 3/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
February 8, 2018 Filing 980 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/29/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/8/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 979 ORDER granting #975 Motion to Expedite deadlines as to #974 MOTION to Substitute Party. Responses due by 2/15/2018. Replies due by 2/20/2018. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/07/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER FOLLOWING JANUARY 29, 2018 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - #948 MOTION for Reconsideration re #900 Order DENIED. Trial issues and motions in limine settled. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/07/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 Filing 977 STATUS REPORT re Settlement Discussions by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 976 Declaration of David S. Nalven in Support of #974 MOTION to Substitute Party Ahold U.S.A., Inc. for American Sales Company, LLC, #975 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed byAmerican Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Related document(s) #974 , #975 ) (Nalven, David) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 975 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 974 MOTION to Substitute Party Ahold U.S.A., Inc. for American Sales Company, LLC filed by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 2/15/2018. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Set additional days of Jury Trial for 2/27/2018, 2/28/2018, 3/5/2018, 3/6/2018, 3/7/2018, 3/8/2018, 3/12/2018, 3/13/2018, 3/14/2018 and 3/15/2018, all at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 3, 2018 Filing 973 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/29/18, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #964 Transcript Order, #967 Transcript Order, #965 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2018. (Related documents(s) #964 , #967 , #965 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 2/3/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 972 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #971 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Yeager. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Filing 971 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Christopher A. Yeager ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12081099.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Yeager, Christopher) (Filed on 2/2/2018) Modified on 2/5/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2018 Filing 970 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference as to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, End-Payor Plaintiff class, Government Employees Health Association, and the related opt outs, and Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals is set for 2/13/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/2/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 969 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #968 Stipulation. Ottavio Gallotto, in his capacity as personal representative for Letizia Gallotto's estate, is substituted as a party to this action and appointed as a class representative in place of Letizia Gallotto. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 968 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Substitution of Plaintiff Letizia Gallotto filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 967 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 29, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 966 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #963 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Devona L. Wells. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 965 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 29, 2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 964 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/29/2018 before Judge William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/31/2018)
January 31, 2018 Filing 963 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12070375.) filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wells, Devona) (Filed on 1/31/2018) Modified on 2/1/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2018 Filing 962 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Pretrial Conference held on 1/29/2018. A written order will follow as to motion for reconsideration and motions in limine. Total Time in Court: 2 hours, 4 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/29/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 961 Statement (Amended) Noting the Death of Plaintiff Letizia Gallotto by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 960 NOTICE by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Daniel P. Thiel (Thiel, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 959 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference as to End-Payer Plaintiffs; GEHA, Opt-Outs & Watson Defendants Held on 1/25/2018.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Saveri, Renae Steiner, Daniel Girard, Dena Connolly Sharp - End-Payer Plaintiffs; Gerald Lawrence - GEHA & Opt-Outs. Defendant Attorney: Karen Hoffman Lent, Steven Sunshine - Watson Dfts. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 958 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference as to Retailer Plaintiffs and Watson Defendant held on 1/24/2018.FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: Barry Refsin - CVS & Rite Aid; Scott Perwin - Walgreens, et al. (known as Retailer Plaintiffs) Attorney for Defendant: Karen Hoffman Lent, Steven Sunshine(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 957 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #948 MOTION for Reconsideration re #900 Order by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Actavis plc Regarding Proof Necessary to Establish Causation filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Responses due by 1/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elise M. Baumgarten, #2 Exhibit A to Baumgarten Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 956 NOTICE by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #929 Pretrial Conference Statement, Defendants' Deposition Designations and Plaintiffs' Objections (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 955 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re #929 Pretrial Conference Statement, Plaintiffs' Deposition and Discovery Response Designations and Defendants Objections (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 954 Letter from Heidi K. Hubbard Regarding Jan. 29 Pretrial Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hubbard, Heidi) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 Filing 953 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Abraham Braun (Braun, Robert) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 952 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference as to Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Watson Defendantsheld on 1/17/2018.FTR Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Thomas Sobol, Andrew Kelly, Bruce Gerstein, Doug Wilson, Peter Kohn - Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Defendant Attorney: Karen Hoffman, Steven Sunshine - Watson Defendants. Attachment: Minute Order. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 951 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly M Hennings (Hennings, Kimberly) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 950 RESPONSE to re #944 Order on Pending Motions to Seal (Dkt. 944) - Renewed Request to Seal Summary Judgment, Daubert, and Motion in Limine Materials by All Defendants by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Joint Sealing Chart, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sal Grausso, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of John Boyle, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Jobina Jones-McDonnell, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Hiro Sakamoto)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 15, 2018 Filing 949 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #948 MOTION for Reconsideration re #900 Order by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Actavis plc Regarding Proof Necessary to Establish Causation ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/15/2018)
January 8, 2018 Filing 948 MOTION for Reconsideration re #900 Order by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. and Actavis plc Regarding Proof Necessary to Establish Causation filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1 to Asimow Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Asimow Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Asimow Declaration)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
January 4, 2018 Filing 947 Statement Noting the Death of Plaintiff Letizia Gallotto by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 946 Order Regarding Opt-Outs by Judge William H. Orrick re #893 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 27, 2017 Filing 945 NOTICE AND Order Setting Further Settlement Conferences before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference for Direct Purchaser Plaintiff class and the Watson Defendants set for 1/17/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Further Settlement Conference for Retailer Plaintiffs parties and the Watson Defendants set for 1/24/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Further Settlement Conference as to End-Payor Plaintiff, class, and the Government Employees Health Associations, and the related op outs, and the Watson Defendants set for 1/25/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/22/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 943 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #939 Transcript Order, #938 Transcript Order, #942 Transcript Order, #940 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 1/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2018. (Related documents(s) #939 , #938 , #942 , #940 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 942 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/18/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 941 PROPOSED ORDER by End-Payor Plaintiffs' re #893 MOTION for Order Concerning Opt-Out Requets of filing (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/21/2017) Modified on 12/22/2017 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2017 Filing 940 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/18/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 939 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 18, 2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 938 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on December 18, 2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Government Employees Health Association, Inc, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF RETAILER CLAIMS AS TO TEIKOKU PHARMA USA AND TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. by Judge William H. Orrick granting #931 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Filing 936 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Pretrial Conference held on 12/18/2017. Total Time in Court: 38 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 935 NOTICE by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. NOTICE OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI IN WYETH LLC V. RITE AID CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 934 ORDER RE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/14/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 933 NOTICE by All Parties re #929 Pretrial Conference Statement, Jury Instructions and Verdict Slips (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8 - Joint Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit 9 - Defendants Statement Regarding Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit 10 - Teikoku's Alternative Jury Instruction, #4 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiffs Verdict Forms, #5 Exhibit 12 - Defendants Statement on Plaintiffs Verdict Form, #6 Exhibit 13 - Defendants Verdict Forms, #7 Exhibit 14 - Teikoku's Proposed Alternative Verdict Form)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 932 Letter from Peter Kohn on behalf of All Parties Regarding Dec. 18 Pretrial Conference. (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 931 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF RETAILER CLAIMS AS TO TEIKOKU PHARMA USA AND TEIKOKU SEIYAKU CO. filed by ALBERTSONS LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company LP, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 8, 2017 Filing 930 NOTICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Withdrawal of Steven G. Reade as Counsel of Record (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 929 Pretrial Conference Statement by All Parties . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Facts, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Trial Witnesses, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiffs Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit 5 - Joint Proposed Jury Questionnaire, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Voir Dire Questions, #7 Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Proposed Questions for Voir Dire Examination of the Jury)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER TO CONTINUE NEGOTIATIONS AND TO RESERVE DATES IN THIS MATTER. Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/6/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
December 6, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #928 Order,, Set Hearings, Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)Corrects error that these dates were erroneously set before Judge Orrick.
December 4, 2017 Filing 927 NOTICE of Change of Address by Monica L. Kiley (Kiley, Monica) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
December 1, 2017 Filing 926 RESPONSE to Order on Pending Motions (11/03/17, Dkt. #900 ) and Order to File Under Seal (11/06/17, Dkt. #903 ) - Joint Request for Continued Sealing by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Joint Sealing Chart, #2 Superseding Declaration of Jones-McDonnell in Support of Endo's Requests to Seal)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/1/2017) Modified on 12/4/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2017 Filing 925 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #903 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine - Exhibit 1 by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24, #23 Exhibit 25, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27, #26 Exhibit 28, #27 Exhibit 32, #28 Exhibit 33, #29 Exhibit 34, #30 Exhibit 35, #31 Exhibit 36, #32 Exhibit 37, #33 Exhibit 38, #34 Exhibit 39, #35 Exhibit 40, #36 Exhibit 41, #37 Exhibit 42, #38 Exhibit 43, #39 Exhibit 44, #40 Exhibit 45, #41 Exhibit 46, #42 Exhibit 47, #43 Exhibit 48, #44 Exhibit 49, #45 Exhibit 50, #46 Exhibit 51, #47 Exhibit 52, #48 Exhibit 53, #49 Exhibit 54, #50 Exhibit 55, #51 Exhibit 56, #52 Exhibit 57, #53 Exhibit 58, #54 Exhibit 59, #55 Exhibit 60, #56 Exhibit 61, #57 Exhibit 62, #58 Exhibit 63)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 924 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of #923 Document E-Filed Under Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 30, #4 Exhibit 31)(Related document(s) #923 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 923 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #903 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine (Dkt. 904) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 922 REPLY (re #893 MOTION for Order Concerning Opt-Out Requets ) filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 921 Brief re #904 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,, Teikoku's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Nos. V and VII.B filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joseph A. Meckes)(Related document(s) #904 ) (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 20, 2017 Filing 920 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #903 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motions In Limine [ECF No. 905] by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2A, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 5A, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 919 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 13, 2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 17, 2017 Filing 918 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 11/17/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 916 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #913 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2018. (Related documents(s) #913 ) (zinnlr62S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 915 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 914 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/13/2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 16, 2017 Filing 913 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on Novmeber 13, 2017 before Judge William H. Orrick by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Lydia Zinn. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 917 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 11/14/2017. Judge Spero to hold a telephonic conference with each party's counsel at the beginning of December to plan the next Settlement Conference. FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 912 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2017. Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Total Time in Court: 27 minutes. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 911 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #893 MOTION for Order Concerning Opt-Out Requets ) Absent Class Members' Response to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Concerning Opt-Out Requests filed byAbsent Class Members. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 910 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #893 MOTION for Order Concerning Opt-Out Requets ) - Defendants' Response to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Order Concerning Opt-Out Requests filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 909 ORDER DENYING re #907 Letter filed by ALBERTSONS LLC, Walgreen Co, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., HEB Grocery Company LP, The Kroger Co., Safeway Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., to excuse client attendance requirement at the settlement conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/13/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 13, 2017 Filing 908 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2017 at 3:00 p.m. will be conducted in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
November 10, 2017 Filing 907 Letter from Scott E. Perwin on behalf of Retailer Plaintiffs to Mag. Judge Spero re Settlement Conference . (Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 11/10/2017)
November 8, 2017 Filing 906 Letter from Allen Ruby . (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 11/8/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 905 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #903 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motions in Limine by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 904 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #903 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/6/2017. ( #902 Order re-posted to create proper ECF authorization; counsel should link their sealed filings to this document.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 902 Order re: Administrative Motions to Seal in Connection with Summary Judgment and In Limine Briefing by Judge William H. Orrick granting #901 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 6, 2017 Filing 901 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Administrative Motions to Seal in Connection with Summary Judgment and In Limine Briefing filed by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 900 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/3/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 899 ORDER GRANTING re #896 Letter filed by Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc., Drogueria Bentances, Inc, End-Payor Plaintiffs', American Sales Company, LLC to excuse individual class representatives from attending the settlement conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/2/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 Filing 898 AMENDED DECLARATION OF JOBINA JONES-MCDONNELL IN SUPPORT OF ENDO'S REQUEST TO SEAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MATERIALS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 AND ORDER (DKT. #766 ); by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Amendment to #860 Declaration in Support, of Endo's Request to Seal Summary Judgment and Daubert Materials Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 and Order (Dkt. 766). (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2017 Filing 897 AMENDED DANIEL B. ASIMOW DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MATERIALS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5; by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Amendment to #859 Declaration in Support, of Administrative Motion to Seal Summary Judgment and Daubert Materials Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2017 Filing 896 Letter from End-Payor Plaintiffs and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs to Chief Magistrate Judge Spero regarding Settlement Conference. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/1/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 895 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF RETAILER CLAIMS AS TO ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. by Judge William H. Orrick granting #894 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 Filing 894 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF RETAILER CLAIMS AS TO ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. filed by ALBERTSONS LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company LP, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 893 MOTION for Order Concerning Opt-Out Requets filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2017 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/13/2017. Replies due by 11/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #2 Exhibit 1-44 to the Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #3 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson, #4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson, #5 Declaration (Supplemental) of Julie Swanson, #6 Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 892 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Trial Structure Brief filed by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration David S. Elkins, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 6 (Redacted))(Elkins, David) (Filed on 10/30/2017) Modified on 10/31/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2017 Filing 891 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Excerpts of Documents in Support of Trial Structure Briefing filed by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rafael Langer-Osuna, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 2 (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 4 (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), #13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Filing 890 RESPONSE to re #888 Case Management Statement, Defendants' Trial Structure Proposal by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 20, 2017 Filing 889 Plaintiffs' Trial Structure Brief); filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/20/2017) Modified on 10/23/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2017 Filing 888 DEFENDANTS' TRIAL STRUCTURE PROPOSAL AND SUPPORTING BRIEF;/i> filed by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Elkins, David) (Filed on 10/20/2017) Modified on 10/23/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings as per #877 Minute Order for Motion Hearing - Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 1/16/2018 08:30 AM and Jury Selection set for 1/16/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 887 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #885 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Ulrike Schaede, Ph.D. re #811 Document E-Filed Under Seal, ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 4, 2017 Filing 886 CLERK'S NOTICE RE TIME CHANGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Settlement Conference re-set for 11/14/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 885 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Ulrike Schaede, Ph.D. re #811 Document E-Filed Under Seal, filed by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. Responses due by 10/6/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna, #4 Proposed Order)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 Set Hearing - Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 884 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 11/14/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/22/17. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 20, 2017 Filing 883 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 15, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/20/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 882 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/15/17, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #875 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2017. (Related documents(s) #875 ) (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT - referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for settlement conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/19/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 880 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/15/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 879 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/15/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 878 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/15/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Government Employees Health Association, Inc, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 19, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 876 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/15/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 875 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/15/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 874 Declaration of Garrett M. Heenan On Behalf of Designating Party OptumRX In Support of Administrative Motion To File Under Seal filed byOptumRx, Inc.. (Welch, Patricia) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 873 NOTICE by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R of Withdrawal of Scott H. Levy as Counsel of Record (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 877 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 9/15/2017. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 2 hourse, 42 minutes. Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/15/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 872 Declaration of Carla Peak regarding Distribution of Notice to the End-Payor Class filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 871 Declaration of Non-Party Prime Therapeutics LLC in Support of #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byPrime Therapeutics LLC. (Related document(s) #766 ) (Hellfeld, Samuel) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 870 Declaration of Non-Party Express Scripts, Inc. in Support of #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byExpress Scripts, Inc.. (Related document(s) #766 ) (Lawless, Lisa) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 869 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Call-In Number For September 15, 2017 Hearing. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER RE SEPTEMBER 15, 2017 HEARING. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/13/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 12, 2017 Filing 867 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Ruby (Ruby, Allen) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 866 Declaration of Robert H. Griffith in Support of #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byCaremark, LLC. (Related document(s) #766 ) (Wu, Jason) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 865 Letter from Karen Hoffman Lent regarding September 15, 2017 hearing. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 864 Proposed Order re #862 Declaration in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 863 Declaration of BRIAN P. SAVAGE in Support of #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #766 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 862 Declaration of Hiro Sakamoto in Support of #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Related document(s) #766 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 861 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #766 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/6/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 860 Declaration of Jobina Jones-McDonnell in Support of Endo's Request to Seal Summary Judgment and Daubert Materials Pursuant to Local Rule #79 -5 and Order (Dkt. #766 ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2017) Modified on 9/7/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2017 Filing 859 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Summary Judgment and Daubert Materials Pursuant to Local Rule #79 -5 filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2017) Modified on 9/7/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 858 NOTICE of Change of Address by David S. Elkins; Notice of Change of Address (Elkins, David) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 857 NOTICE by Drogueria Bentances, Inc of Withdrawal of Emma Perry as Counsel of Record (Perry, Emma) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 856 EXHIBITS re #854 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Exhibit 49 to the Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All Plaintiffs' Claims filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #854 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 855 EXHIBITS re #854 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit 48 to the Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All Plaintiffs' Claims filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #854 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 854 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on All Plaintiffs' Claims (ECF No. 786) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All Plaintiffs' Claims, #2 Exhibit 40, #3 Exhibit 41, #4 Exhibit 42, #5 Exhibit 43, #6 Exhibit 44, #7 Exhibit 45, #8 Exhibit 46, #9 Exhibit 47)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 853 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF MR. LUIS MOLINA by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 852 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF DR. KEITH LEFFLER by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 851 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF DR. KENNETH MILLER by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean Tepe, #2 Exhibit L)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 850 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CAUSATION by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Exhibit T, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Exhibit V, #5 Exhibit W, #6 Exhibit X, #7 Exhibit Y, #8 Exhibit Z, #9 Exhibit AA, #10 Exhibit BB, #11 Exhibit CC, #12 Exhibit DD)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 849 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 775) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 775), #2 Exhibit GG, #3 Exhibit HH, #4 Exhibit II, #5 Exhibit JJ, #6 Exhibit KK, #7 Exhibit LL, #8 Exhibit MM, #9 Exhibit NN, #10 Exhibit OO, #11 Exhibit PP, #12 Exhibit QQ, #13 Exhibit RR, #14 Exhibit SS)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 848 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dr. Gregory Bell (ECF No. 778) by All Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 847 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Mr. Harsha Murthy (ECF No. 773) by All Plaintiffs. (Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 846 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Reply Brief in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dennis Carlton (ECF No. 774) by All Plaintiffs. (Silverman, Noah) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 845 EXHIBITS re #844 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit 8 to the Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Martin Adelman and Kishore Shah filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #844 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 844 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Martin Adelman and Kishore Shah (ECF No. 780) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Martin Adelman and Kishore Shah, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 9)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 843 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Michael Moffitt (ECF No. 771) by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 842 EXHIBITS re #840 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit 9 to the Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of David T. Read filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #840 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 841 EXHIBITS re #840 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit 8 to the Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of David T. Read filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #840 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 840 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of David T. Read (ECF No. 779) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of David T. Read, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 839 EXHIBITS re #838 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit 8 to the Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Einer Elhauge filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #838 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 838 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Einer Elhauge (ECF No. 783) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Einer Elhauge, #2 Exhibit 7)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 837 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Ulrike Schaede, Ph.D. (ECF No. 772) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 836 EXHIBITS re #835 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit H to the Second Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Peter J. Hardigan filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #835 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 835 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Exclude Opinions of Peter J. Hardigan (ECF No 785) by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Second) of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Peter J. Hardigan, #2 Exhibit G)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 834 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Robert Navarro (ECF No. 770) by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson)(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 Filing 833 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Mr. John F. Fritz (ECF No. 769) by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 22, 2017 Filing 832 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Government Employees Health Association, Inc re #831 Notice (Other) Proof of Service (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 22, 2017 Filing 831 NOTICE by Government Employees Health Association, Inc Notice of Change of Firm Name (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 830 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 828 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR A SET-ASIDE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #742 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 11, 2017 Filing 827 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by All Plaintiffs, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 826 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 825 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 824 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 8, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 822 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/8/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Government Employees Health Association, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 8, 2017 Filing 821 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 8/8/2017. Argument of counsel heard as to motion for set aside; written order to follow. Motion Hearing reset for 9/15/2017 02:00 PM and Pretrial Conference reset for 11/17/2017 02:00 PM. FTR Time 3:30-4:27. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2017) Modified on 8/9/2017: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2017 Filing 820 DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER #803 Letter dated 8/3/17; from Peter D. St. Phillip, Jr., re In re Lidoderm Antitrust LItig., ("GEHA"). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)PER CHAMBERS Modified on 8/8/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2017 Filing 819 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF 786) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 818 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinion of David T. Read by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Nalven, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 817 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Martin Adelman and Kishore Shah (ECF No. 780) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Miranda Jones in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Martin Adelman and Kishore Shah, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 816 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Kenneth Miller, Ph.D. (ECF No. 793) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Kenneth Miller, Ph.D. (ECF No. 793), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 815 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Luis Molina (ECF No. 777) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Mr. Luis Molina (ECF No. 777), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 814 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Causation (ECF No. 794) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew W. Kelly in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Causation (ECF No. 794), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 813 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dr. Gregory Bell by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dr. Gregory Bell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 812 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 811 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Ulrike Schaede, Ph.D. by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 810 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Professor Einer Elhauge (ECF No. 783) by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, End-Payor Plaintiffs', Government Employees Health Association, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D (Part 1 of 3), #6 Exhibit D (Part 2 of 3), #7 Exhibit D (Part 3 of 3))(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 809 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXCLUDE IN PART EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MR. HARSHA MURTHY by Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 808 EXHIBITS re #807 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dennis Carlton filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #807 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 807 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dennis Carlton by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dennis Carlton, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 806 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Opinions of Michael Moffitt by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Opinions of Michael Moffitt, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 805 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Robert Navarro by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 804 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinions of John F. Fritz by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 803 Letter regarding GEHA. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 802 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Dr. Keith Leffler by ALBERTSONS LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company LP, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Barry Refsin in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Keith Leffler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Refsin, Barry) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 Filing 801 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion Exclude Opinions of Peter Hardigan by ALBERTSONS LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company LP, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric L. Bloom in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Peter Hardigan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Bloom, Eric) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 4, 2017 Filing 800 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 27, 2017 Filing 799 REDACTION to #717 Opposition/Response to Motion, #795 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports REDACTED per Court Order by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc, ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 26, 2017 Filing 798 Brief re #795 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #795 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 26, 2017 Filing 797 Brief re #795 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. D, #2 Exhibit Ex. F, #3 Exhibit Ex. G, #4 Exhibit Ex. H)(Related document(s) #795 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 19, 2017 Filing 796 REPLY (re #742 MOTION for Entry of a Set-Aside Order ) filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL by Judge William H. Orrick regarding #697 Motion to Compel, #696 Motion to File Under Seal, #716 Motion to File Under Seal, and #726 Motion to File Under Seal. Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall e-file newly redacted versions of these documents consistent with this Order, redacting only the information allowed by this Order. The Clerk is ORDERED to unseal: Dkt. Nos. 696-7 (Exhibit E), 696-11 (Exhibit I), 716-7 (Exhibit C), 716-9 (Exhibit E), 726-6 (Exhibit K), and 726-7 (Exhibit L). (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 794 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON CAUSATION by Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 793 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF DR. KENNETH MILLER by Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 14, 2017 Filing 792 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 6, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 10, 2017 Filing 791 CLERK'S NOTICE - The Court having reviewed the parties' Status Conference Statement, determines that there appears to be no need for the monthly Telephonic Status Conference. The Tuesday July 11, 2017 Conference is VACATED. The pending order on the motion to compel and related motions to seal should issue this week. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 10, 2017 Hearing as to any Daubert or Rule 56 motions set for 9/15/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 9, 2017 Filing 790 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 3:29 p.m.-4:01 p.m. held on 5/2/2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce Shainline, telephone number (510)828-9404; E-mail: info@brycereporting.com. Tape Number: FTR 3:29 p.m.-4:01 p.m.. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #759 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017. (Related documents(s) #759 ) (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 7/9/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 789 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 788 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #742 MOTION for Entry of a Set-Aside Order ) - Defendants' Opposition to End-Payor Class Counsel's Motion for Entry of a Set-Aside Order filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 787 EXHIBITS re #786 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,, Exhibits 4, 6, 7, 9-15, 21-23, 27 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All Plaintiffs' Claims filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 12, #8 Exhibit 13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 22, #13 Exhibit 23, #14 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) #786 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 786 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All Plaintiffs' Claims by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on All Plaintiffs' Claims, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 24, #13 Exhibit 25, #14 Exhibit 26, #15 Exhibit 28, #16 Exhibit 29, #17 Exhibit 30, #18 Exhibit 31, #19 Exhibit 32, #20 Exhibit 33, #21 Exhibit 34, #22 Exhibit 35, #23 Exhibit 36, #24 Exhibit 37, #25 Exhibit 38, #26 Exhibit 39, #27 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 785 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Peter J. Hardigan by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Peter J. Hardigan, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 784 EXHIBITS re #783 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Einer Elhauge filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #783 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 783 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Einer Elhauge by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Einer Elhauge, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 782 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Keith Leffler and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Keith Leffler, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 781 EXHIBITS re #780 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Martin Adelman and Kishore Shah filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #780 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 780 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Martin Adelman and Kishore Shah by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Adelman and Shah, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 779 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of David T. Read by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of David T. Read, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 778 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dr. Gregory Bell by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dr. Gregory Bell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 777 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. Luis Molina and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF KAREN HOFFMAN LENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS OF MR. LUIS MOLINA, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D Part 1 of 2, #6 Exhibit D Part 2 of 2, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 776 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Appendix A)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 775 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 774 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dennis Carlton by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Noah Silverman in Support of Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Dennis Carlton, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Silverman, Noah) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 773 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Mr. Harsha Murthy by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Mr. Harsha Murthy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 772 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Ulrike Schaede, Ph.D. by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of Ulrike Schaede, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 771 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Michael Moffitt by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in support of Motion to Exclude in Part Expert Testimony of Michael Moffitt, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 770 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Robert Navarro by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Robert Navarro, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 769 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #766 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Exclude Testimony of Mr. John F. Fritz by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Mr. John F. Fritz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 768 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC, Drogueria Bentances, Inc, Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc. of Declaration of Michael Rosenbaum of Berdon Claims Administration LLC Regarding Receipt of Requests for Exclusion From the Direct Purchaser Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Order Allowing Additional Pages by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #765 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2017)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER Granting #764 Stipulation to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/27/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 27, 2017 Filing 765 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Additional Pages for Briefing Related to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motion filed by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Elkins, David) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 Filing 764 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING filed by Anda, Inc. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #761 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 21, 2017 Filing 762 NOTICE of Appearance by David Scott Scalia (Scalia, David) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 761 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE CORRECTION OF DOCKET #760 filed by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 760 PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #761 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULE filed by Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 6/20/2017) Modified on 6/21/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2017 Filing 759 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 2, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 758 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 6, 2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #749 Transcript Order, #748 Transcript Order, #750 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2017. (Related documents(s) #749 , #748 , #750 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER APPROVING AMENDED END-PAYOR LONG-FORM NOTICE re #755 Notice. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/16/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER of USCA Respondents' motion to file the "Response of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs to Defendants' Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Certifying Direct Purchaser Class " under seal is granted. The motions to maintain the "Response of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs to Defendants' Petition for Permission to Appeal from Order Certifying Direct Purchaser Class" under seal are denied as unnecessary. Petitioner's motions for leave to file replies in 17-80034; in 17-80035 in support of the petitions for permission to appeal are granted. The court, in its discretion, denies the petitions for permission to appeal the district court's February 21, 2017 order granting class action certification; as to #675 USCA Case Number 17-80034 re #450 Order, #676 USCA Case Number 17-80035 re #484 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 755 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' Unopposed Request for Approval of Amended Long-Form Notice (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 754 ORDER granting #753 STIPULATION Amending Briefing Schedule for End-Payor Plaintiffs' Set-Aside Order as to #742 MOTION for Entry of a Set-Aside Order.Response due by 7/7/2017. Reply due by 7/19/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2017 03:30 PM (via telephone to coincide with monthly telephonic status conference). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/14/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 753 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Briefing Schedule for End-Payor Plaintiffs' Set-Aside Order filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Z. Watts)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 14, 2017 Set additional monthly telephonic status conferences for 8/8/2017 03:30 PM, 9/5/2017 03:30 PM, and 10/3/2017 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 752 CLERK'S NOTICE - Motion Hearing re: #742 MOTION for Entry of a Set-Aside Order advanced to 7/11/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (To be conducted telephonically and coincide with monthly status conference.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 751 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE PLAN AND AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF NOTICE TO THE END-PAYOR CLASS by Hon. William H. Orrick re #741 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 750 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 749 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 13, 2017 Filing 748 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 747 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' of Amended Summary Notices and Defendants' Non-Opposition to End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Authorize Distribution of Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 746 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2017 re #697 MOTION to Compel. FTR Time 3:28-3:48. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/13/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2017 Filing 745 NOTICE of Change of Address by Todd Anthony Seaver (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 6, 2017 Filing 744 NOTICE by Greater Metropolitan Hotel Employers-Employees Health and Welfare Fund, Minnesota Cement Masons Health & Welfare Fund, Roofers Local 96 Health and Welfare Fund - Notice of Withdrawal of David Woodward as Counsel of Record (Woodward, David) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 743 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 2, 2017 Filing 742 MOTION for Entry of a Set-Aside Order filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/16/2017. Replies due by 6/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadline as to #697 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2017 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 741 MOTION to Authorize Distribution of Notice to the End-Payor Class filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/13/2017. Replies due by 6/20/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 740 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #739 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 739 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Government Employees Health Association, Inc. (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 738 Brief re #737 Brief, Plaintiffs' Response to Teikoku's Report Concerning Compliance With This Court's May 2 Order filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #737 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 737 Brief re #734 Telephone Conference,, Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Teikoku's Report on Compliance with the Court's May 3, 2017 Order) filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Related document(s) #734 ) (Elkins, David) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 736 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen Smith Lawrence (Lawrence, Maureen) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
May 3, 2017 Filing 735 NOTICE of Appearance by Emma Westbrook Perry (Perry, Emma) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 3, 2017 Reset hearing as to #697 MOTION to Compel - Motion Hearing reset for 6/6/2017 03:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick to coincide with telephonic status conference. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 2, 2017 Filing 734 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic status conference and Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2017. Court grants the #678 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice, with specified revisions. Motion hearing regarding #697 Motion to Compel is consolidated with telephonic conference set for June 6, 2017 at 3:30 p.m. FTR Time 3:29-4:01. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2017) Modified on 6/20/2017: Matter transcribed by Kelly Shainline. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2017 Filing 733 Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna in Support of #726 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits J-N And Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expe filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #726 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 732 NOTICE of Appearance by Soumitra Deka (Deka, Soumitra) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Filing 731 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plaintiffs' #726 Administrative Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits J-N to the Declaration of Peter Kohn In Support Thereof, ECF No. 726 filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/1/2017) Modified on 5/2/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #729 Notice of Change of Address filed by Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation Please Specify Which Plaintiffs are Affected by this Notice of Change of Address (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 730 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 729 NOTICE of Change of Address by Monica L. Kiley (Kiley, Monica) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 728 Letter from Plaintiffs, Endo & Teikoku concerning document production. (Arnold, Gregory) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 727 REPLY (re #697 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kohn Decl. In Support of Reply Brief In Further Support of Mot. to Compel, #2 Exhibit Ex. J (under seal), #3 Exhibit Ex. K (under seal), #4 Exhibit Ex. L (under seal), #5 Exhibit Ex. M (under seal), #6 Exhibit Ex. N (under seal), #7 Exhibit Ex. O)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 726 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits J-N And Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief In Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kohn Decl. in Support of Mot. to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Mot. to Seal Exs. J-N, #3 Exhibit Redacted Reply Br. ISO Mot. to Compel, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Reply Br. ISO Mot. to Compel, #5 Exhibit Ex. J, #6 Exhibit Ex. K, #7 Exhibit Ex. L, #8 Exhibit Ex. M, #9 Exhibit Ex. N)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 4/27/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 725 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03-28-2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #721 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 723 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing re #678 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class and to Appoint the Notice Administrator. The hearing is reset for 5/2/2017 03:30 PM, to coincide with the regularly scheduled status conference. It is expected that all counsel will appear telephonically. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 722 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/28/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 721 MOTION to Appear by Telephone DEFENDANT WATSONS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR KAREN HOFFMAN LENT TO ATTEND THE APRIL 26, 2017 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO APPROVE THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE TO THE DIRECT PURCHASER CLASS AND TO APPOINT THE NOTICE ADMINISTRATOR BY TELEPHONE filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 25, 2017 Filing 720 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 28, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, for Court Reporter Victoria Valine. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 719 Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna in Support of #716 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Opposition ot Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits A-E to the Declaration of Karen Lent filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #716 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 718 Declaration of Daniel B.Asimow in Support of #717 Opposition/Response to Motion, #716 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Opposition ot Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits A-E to the Declaration of Karen Lent filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion To Seal)(Related document(s) #717 , #716 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 20, 2017 Filing 717 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #697 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports ) filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Exhibits A-E Slipsheets)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 20, 2017 Filing 716 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Opposition ot Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibits A-E to the Declaration of Karen Lent filed by Actavis Plc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition, #4 Unredacted Opposition, #5 Unredacted Exhibit A, #6 Unredacted Exhibit B, #7 Unredacted Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Exhibit D, #9 Unredacted Exhibit E)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 715 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Ron Wilson (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilson, Douglas) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 714 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #707 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Monika B. Jasiewicz. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #706 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Heidi K. Hubbard. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #705 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin M. Greenblum. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 711 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #704 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Stanley E. Fisher. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 710 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #703 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Elise M. Baumgarten. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 14, 2017 Filing 709 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03-28-2017, before Judge Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Valine, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (66 in 3:17-cv-00312-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/5/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2017. (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2017)
April 13, 2017 Filing 708 ERRATA re #601 Declaration in Support, - Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Errata to Declaration of Ryan Watts in Support of Endo's Motion to Seal Briefing Related to Class Certification by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 11, 2017 Filing 707 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11304493.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Jasiewicz, Monika) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Modified on 4/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 706 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11304487.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hubbard, Heidi) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Modified on 4/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 705 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11304482.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Greenblum, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Modified on 4/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 704 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11304480.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Fisher, Stanley) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Modified on 4/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 703 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11304476.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Baumgarten, Elise) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Modified on 4/12/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 702 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J Hamilton (Hamilton, Eric) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 701 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of #696 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #696 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 700 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 699 Declaration of Joseph A. Meckes in Support of #696 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed byTeikoku Seiyaku Co. (Related document(s) #696 ) (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 7, 2017 Filing 698 REPLY (re #678 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class and to Appoint the Notice Administrator ) filed byAmerican Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 697 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 4/20/2017. Replies due by 4/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion to Compel, #2 Declaration Kohn Decl. re: Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit Ex. A, #4 Exhibit Ex. B (sealed), #5 Exhibit Ex. C, #6 Exhibit Ex. D (sealed), #7 Exhibit Ex. E (sealed), #8 Exhibit Ex. F (sealed), #9 Exhibit Ex. G (sealed), #10 Exhibit Ex. H (sealed), #11 Exhibit Ex. I (sealed))(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
April 6, 2017 Filing 696 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Information Whose Privilege Protections Were Waived by Defendants' Expert Reports filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kohn Decl. ISO Mot. to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Motion to Compel, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Mot. to Compel, #5 Exhibit Ex. B, #6 Exhibit Ex. D, #7 Exhibit Ex. E, #8 Exhibit Ex. F, #9 Exhibit Ex. G, #10 Exhibit Ex. H, #11 Exhibit Ex. I)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
March 31, 2017 Filing 695 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #678 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class and to Appoint the Notice Administrator ) Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Approve Form and Manner of Notice filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
March 28, 2017 Filing 694 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/28/2017. The Court will issue a short order granting the motion to stay in Case No. 3:17cv312. The State of California will stipulate with Allergan to a similar stay of Case No. 3:17cv562. Counsel are directed to meet and confer within the next 24 hours concerning the documents that must be produced prior to the depositions of Mr. Patel and Mr. Edwards. The Court suggests that these depositions occur by April 7 and that the rebuttal expert reports be delayed until April 21, 2017, but the parties should work out the schedule consistently with the document production issues. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2017 at 2:00 p.m. Status Report due by 4/28/2017. FTR Time 3:33-4:04. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2017) Modified on 6/15/2017: Matter transcribed by Victoria Valine. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2017 Filing 693 REPLY (re #681 MOTION to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Redacted) of Andrew Kelly, #2 Errata 1 (Redacted))(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 27, 2017 Filing 692 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike, #4 (Under Seal) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike, #5 Declaration (Redacted) of Andrew Kelly, #6 Declaration (Under Seal) of Andrew Kelly, #7 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 1 (Under Seal))(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 691 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #681 MOTION to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses ) filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe, #2 Ex. A - slipsheet, #3 Ex. B - slipsheet, #4 Ex. C, #5 Ex. D, #6 Ex. E, #7 Ex. F, #8 Ex. G, #9 Ex. H - slipsheet, #10 Ex. I, #11 Ex. J, #12 Ex K - slipsheet)(Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 690 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit K, #7 Redacted Version of Opposition, #8 Unredacted Version of Opposition)(Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 689 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #681 MOTION to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses ) - Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc. and Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.'s Joinder to Watson's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 688 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick denying #686 Stipulation. For this discrete motion, there is no need to depart from the Local Rules governing administrative motions to file under seal. This is a text only order; there is no image associated with this docket entry. (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 686 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO SEAL IN CONNECTION WITH PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE (DKT. 681) filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 23, 2017 Filing 685 NOTICE by ALBERTSONS LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company LP, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co of Filing Requests for Exclusions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #682 Motion to Expedite. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 683 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #682 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses ) BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPEDITE filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe)(Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 17, 2017 Filing 682 MOTION to Expedite Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #2 Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 17, 2017 Filing 681 MOTION to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/31/2017. Replies due by 4/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (Redacted) of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E (Redacted), #7 Exhibit F (Redacted), #8 Exhibit G (Redacted), #9 Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 17, 2017 Filing 680 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Late Produced Documents and Declarations of Undisclosed Fact Witnesses filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, #4 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, #5 Declaration (Redacted) Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, #6 Declaration (Unredacted) Declaration of Renae D. Steiner in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, #7 Exhibit E (Redacted), #8 Exhibit E (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit F (Redacted, #10 Exhibit F (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit G (Redacted, #12 Exhibit G (Unredacted)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER of USCA Petitioners have not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Accordingly, the petition is denied. DENIED (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 17, 2017 Filing 678 MOTION to Approve the Form and Manner of Notice to the Direct Purchaser Class and to Appoint the Notice Administrator filed by American Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 3/31/2017. Replies due by 4/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 677 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. Notice of Name Change (Kiley, Monica) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 676 USCA Case Number 17-80035 for #484 USCA Order. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 675 USCA Case Number 17-80034 for #450 USCA Order. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 6, 2017 Filing 674 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/21/2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 6, 2017 Filing 673 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 21, 2017 before Hon. William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 672 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 21, 2017, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (53 in 3:17-cv-00312-WHO) Transcript Order, (55 in 3:17-cv-00312-WHO) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2017. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 671 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 2/21/2017. Further Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2017 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. FTR Time 3:32-4:10. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/21/2017) Modified on 2/27/2017: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DENYING #553 , #555 , #588 DAUBERT MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 669 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 668 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #665 Motion to Relate Case No. 3:17cv562-WHA. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 667 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #665 MOTION to Relate Case ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 666 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #665 MOTION to Relate Case ) - FTC's Statement of Support for the State of California's Administrative Motion filed byFederal Trade Commission. (Albert, Bradley) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 665 MOTION to Relate Case filed by State of California. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Pham Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Pham, Pamela) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 664 CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephone Conference continued to 2/21/2017 03:30 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 30, 2017 Filing 663 RELATED CASE ORDER by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #656 Administrative Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 662 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #656 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) - Endo's Statement of Support for Federal Trade Commission's Administrative Motion filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 661 Order Amending Schedule by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #659 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 660 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #656 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 25, 2017 Filing 659 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
January 24, 2017 Filing 658 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission re #656 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related CORRECTION OF DOCKET #657 (Albert, Bradley) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
January 23, 2017 Filing 657 SEE DOCKET NUMBER #658 FOR CORRECTION CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Trade Commission (Albert, Bradley) (Filed on 1/23/2017) Modified on 1/25/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2017 Filing 656 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Federal Trade Commission. Responses due by 1/27/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Albert, Bradley) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Order Regarding Stay of Production of Certain Documents by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #653 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 11, 2017 Filing 654 NOTICE by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R of Withdrawal of J. Douglas Richards as Counsel of Record (Richards, J.) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 10, 2017 Filing 653 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay of Production of Certain Documents by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 652 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Patrick Maben Hammon and WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY JAMES SCHAEFER (Hammon, Patrick) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 6, 2017 Filing 651 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jayne Arnold Goldstein and Firm Affiliation (Goldstein, Jayne) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER RE EXPERT DEPOSITIONS re #647 Letter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/04/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
January 3, 2017 Filing 649 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #524 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
January 3, 2017 Filing 648 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING PHONE CONFERENCE - The Court has determined that a phone conference is not necessary to resolve the issues presented in the parties' #647 letter. A written order will issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 30, 2016 Filing 647 Letter from All Parties re Expert Depositions. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 30, 2016 Filing 646 NOTICE by ALBERTSONS LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., HEB Grocery Company LP, Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co (Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 645 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 21, 2016 Filing 644 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-29-2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #628 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2017. (Related documents(s) #628 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 6, 2016 Filing 643 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Bloom, Eric) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Order Regarding Stay of Production of Certain Documents by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #641 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 5, 2016 Filing 641 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay of Production of Certain Documents by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 640 Order Amending Schedule by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #626 Stipulation.Pretrial Conference continued to 11/6/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial continued to 12/4/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 2, 2016 Filing 639 Proposed Order re #635 Declaration in Support of Endo's Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of ECF No. 624-1 and ECF No. 625-1 by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Watts, Ryan) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 638 Proposed Order re #625 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Granting Actavis's Administrative Motion to Seal Defendants' Notice of Errata to the September 2, 2016 Expert Report of Gregory K. Leonard by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 637 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of #625 Document E-Filed Under Seal, filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #625 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 636 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal (Second Supplemental) filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #521 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 635 Declaration of Ryan Z. Watts in Support of Endo's Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of ECF No. #624 -1 and ECF No. #625 -1 filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Watts, Ryan) (Filed on 12/1/2016) Modified on 12/2/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2016 Filing 634 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 633 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 29, 2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
December 1, 2016 Filing 632 NOTICE by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R Notice of Withdrawal of Meghan Boone As Counsel of Record (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
November 30, 2016 Filing 631 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 29, 2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 Filing 630 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Government Employees Health Association, Inc, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 Filing 629 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on November 29, 2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 30, 2016 Filing 628 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/29/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 627 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 11/29/2016 re motion for class certification and Daubert motions. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court 2 hours, 52 minutes. Court Reporter Name Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/29/2016)
November 29, 2016 Filing 626 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Schedule filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Stipulation)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 25, 2016 Filing 625 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Errata by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 September 2, 2016 Expert Report of Gregory K Leonard (ECF No. 563-2))(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 11/25/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 624 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - Defendants' Notice of Errata by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 September 2, 2016 Expert Report of James Hughes (ECF No. 550-34), #2 November 9, 2016 Declaration of James Hughes (ECF No. 610-8))(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 623 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #524 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 622 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Errata to the October 20, 2016 Reply Report of Hal J. Singer, Ph.D. (ECF No. 589))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #620 Stipulation Regarding Filing of Sur-Reply Declaration. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 18, 2016 Filing 620 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #619 Document E-Filed Under Seal filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Stipulation)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 18, 2016 Filing 619 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Sur-Reply Declaration of Hal J. Singer, Ph.D. by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 18, 2016 Filing 618 NOTICE by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. DEFENDANT ACTAVIS, INC.S STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 617 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal (Supplemental) filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #521 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 616 Declaration of Non-Party Prime Therapeutics Supplemental Declaration of Non-Party Prime Therapeutics LLC in Support of Stipulated Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. 521) Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(D) filed byPrime Therapeutics LLC. (Hellfeld, Samuel) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 615 Declaration in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Supplemental Declaration of Garrett Heenan on Behalf of Designating Party OptumRx filed byOptumRx, Inc.. (Related document(s) #521 ) (Welch, Patricia) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 614 Declaration of Ryan Z. Watts in Support of Endo Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Hal J. Singer and Declaration of Jim Hughes Responding to New Analysis and Opinions in Dr. Hal Singer's October 20, 2016 Reply Expert Report and October 17, 2016 Daubert Declaration filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watts, Ryan) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 613 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal DECLARATION OF KAREN HOFFMAN LENT IN SUPPORT OF ACTAVIS'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE OPINION OF DR. HAL SINGER (DKT. 610) filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #521 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 11, 2016 Filing 612 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - Motion hearings scheduled for November 29, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. will be conducted in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor (to allow for use of electronic evidence presentation system. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 11, 2016 Set Hearings: Telephone Conferences set for 1/3/2017 03:30 PM, 2/7/2017 03:30 PM, 3/7/2017 03:30 PM, 4/4/2017 03:30 PM, 5/2/2017 03:30 PM, 6/6/2017 03:30 PM, and 7/11/2017 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 610 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinion of Dr. Hal Singer by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Z. Watts, #2 Exhibit 1 to Watts Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Watts Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Watts Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Watts Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Watts Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Watts Declaration, #8 Declaration of Jim Hughes)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 609 REPLY (re #588 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Mr. John F. Fritz ) filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 608 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal - Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. W. Paul DeBree by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Z. Watts, #2 Exhibit 1 to Watts Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Watts Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Watts Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Watts Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Watts Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Watts Declaration)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 607 Declaration of Mark A. Cunningham in Support of Stipulated Administrative Motions to Seal (ECF No. #521 ) Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(D) filed byOptiSource, LLC. (Cunningham, Mark) (Filed on 11/9/2016) Modified on 11/14/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2016 Filing 611 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic status conference conducted on 11/8/2016. FTR Time 4:00-4:06. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 606 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #521 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 605 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #521 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 604 Declaration in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of David Nalven in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Portions of the Parties' Submission in Connection with Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Sales Company, LLC, Cesar Castillo, Inc., DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Related document(s) #521 ) (Nalven, David) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 603 Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #521 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 602 Declaration of Non-Party OptumRx, Inc. in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byOptumRx, Inc.. (Related document(s) #521 ) (Welch, Patricia) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 601 Declaration of Ryan Z. Watts in Support of Endo Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Briefing Related to Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, and Daubert Motions in Connection Therewith filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Watts, Ryan) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 600 Declaration of Caremark, LLC in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byCaremark, LLC. (Related document(s) #521 ) (Griffith, Robert) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 599 Declaration of Non-Party Prime Therapeutics in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byPrime Therapeutics LLC. (Related document(s) #521 ) (Hellfeld, Samuel) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 598 Declaration of Non-Party Express Scripts in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byExpress Scripts, Inc.. (Related document(s) #521 ) (Lawless, Lisa) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 597 Declaration of Non-Party Prime Therapeutics LLC in Support of #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal filed byPrime Therapeutics LLC, Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Related document(s) #521 ) (Hellfeld, Samuel) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 596 Declaration of Mark Cunningham in Support of Stipulated Administrative Motions to Seal (ECF No. #521 Order) Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(D) filed byOptiSource, LLC. (Cunningham, Mark) (Filed on 11/7/2016) Modified on 11/7/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2016 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #597 Declaration in Support filed by Prime Therapeutics LLC Attorney Samuel Ryan Hellfeld and the Law Firm Information must be included on the pleading for Court Reference. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 3, 2016 Filing 595 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 1, 2016 CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/8/2016 at 04:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Parties should file a brief joint statement regarding issues to be taken up by noon on Friday, November 4, 2016. (This is a text only entry; there is no document associated with this notice.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 31, 2016 Filing 594 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinion of Mr. John F. Fritz by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
October 27, 2016 Filing 593 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica Maria Ornelas (Ornelas, Angelica) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 592 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of #591 Document E-Filed Under Seal,, Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 53, #2 Exhibit 79, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #591 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 591 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification by American Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rebuttal Declaration of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, #2 Declaration Peter Kohn, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 54-70, #5 Exhibit 71-78, #6 Exhibit 80-87, #7 Appendix B)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 24, 2016 Filing 590 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 20, 2016 Filing 589 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Reply Report of Hal J. Singer, Ph.D. by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 588 MOTION to Exclude Opinion of Mr. John F. Fritz filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2016 10:00 AM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/31/2016. Replies due by 11/9/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 587 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinion of Mr. John F. Fritz by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Opinion of Mr. John F. Fritz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 586 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. W. Paul DeBree (Dkt. 555) by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Mr. W. Paul DeBree, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 585 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal End-Payor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Hal Singer (Dkt. 552) by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner iso End-Payor Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Opinions of Dr. Hal Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Declaration of Hal J. Singer, PH.D.)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #576 Stipulation, as modified. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER RE ELECTIONS, PROFFER, AND COMMON INTEREST PRIVILEGE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/11/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 6, 2016 Filing 581 NOTICE by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co re #544 Response ( Non Motion ), #536 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Notice of Filing Evidence Requested at October 4, 2016 Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Noriyuki Shimoda, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Michael Speitz)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
October 4, 2016 Filing 582 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 10/4/2016. Motion hearing set for 11/29/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick.Pretrial Conference reset for 10/16/2017 02:00 PM and Jury Trial reset for 11/13/2017 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. FTR Time 3:38-4:09. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/4/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 580 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #578 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 579 Letter from Federal Trade Commission. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
October 3, 2016 Filing 578 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 577 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 29, 2016 Filing 576 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Schedule (Civil Local Rule 6.2, 7.12) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
September 21, 2016 Filing 575 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 30, 2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #565 Transcript Order, #572 Transcript Order, #566 Transcript Order, #574 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2016. (Related documents(s) #565 , #572 , #566 , #574 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 574 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/30/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 573 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULING OF DAUBERT MOTIONS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #571 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 19, 2016 Filing 572 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/30/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
September 16, 2016 Filing 571 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Scheduling of Daubert Motions filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson)(Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 15, 2016 Filing 570 RESPONSE to re #536 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, DEFENDANTS ACTAVIS, INC.S, WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.S AND ALLERGAN PLCS ELECTION PURSUANT TO THE COURTS AUGUST 9, 2016 ORDER CONCERNING SUBJECTIVE BELIEFS by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 9/15/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 569 NOTICE by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co re #544 Response ( Non Motion ), Teikoku's Reply in Support of Teikoku's Proffer Concerning Subjective Belief 6 (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 14, 2016 Filing 568 Response re #543 Notice (Other), Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Reply in Support of Endo's Election Pursuant to the Court's August 9, 2016 Order Concerning Subjective Beliefs byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 567 Declaration of Hiro Sakamoto in Support of #562 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Response to Teikokus Proffer Concerning Subjective View 6 filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Related document(s) #562 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 566 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/30/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 12, 2016 Filing 565 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/30/16 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 7, 2016 Filing 564 REDACTION to #544 Response; -Plaintiffs' Response to Teikoku's Proffer Concerning Subjective View 6 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A through C Filed Under Seal)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 7, 2016 Filing 563 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 7, 2016 Filing 562 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Response to Teikokus Proffer Concerning Subjective View 6 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren C. Ravkind, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Response, #4 Unredacted Version of Response)(Neill, Anna) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 7, 2016 Filing 561 RESPONSE to re #543 Notice, re #536 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under SealOrder on Motion for Discovery; -Plaintiffs' Response to Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Election Pursuant to the Court's August 9, 2016 Order (ECF No. 536) Concerning Subjective Beliefs filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 559 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Written Notice to Designating Party Prime Therapeutics, LLC Providing Information Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) Regarding Class Certification Material (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 558 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Written Notice to Designating Party Optum Rx, Inc. Providing Information Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) Regarding Class Certification Material (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 557 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Written Notice to Designating Party Express Scripts, Inc. Providing Information Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) Regarding Class Certification Material (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 6, 2016 Filing 556 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Written Notice to Designating Party Caremark LLC Providing Information Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5(e) Regarding Class Certification Material (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 555 MOTION Exclude Opinion of Mr. W. Paul DeBree filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/16/2016. Replies due by 9/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 554 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinion of Mr. W. Paul DeBree, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 553 MOTION Exclude Opinion of Dr. Hal Singer filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 9/16/2016. Replies due by 9/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 552 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Opinion of Dr. Hal Singer, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 551 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sean M. Tepe, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 2, 2016 Filing 550 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Opposition to End Payor Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Expert Report of John F. Fritz, #34 Expert Report of James W. Hughes, #35 Expert Report of Robert Navarro)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 30, 2016 Filing 560 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 8/30/2016. FTR Time 3:30-4:21. Plaintiff Attorneys David S. Nalven, Peter Kohn, Sharon K. Robertson, Renae D. Steiner, Noelle Ruggiero, and Eric L. Bloom. Defendant Attorneys Joseph Meckes, Daniel B. Asimow, Steven Reade, Ryan Watts, Karen Hoffman Lent, and Lauren Raskin. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2016) Modified on 9/13/2016: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (notewarelS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2016 Filing 549 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Robertson, Sharon) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 22, 2016 Filing 548 Brief --- Plaintiffs' Brief Concerning No Common Interest Protection For Endo's Notes of Settlement Discussions With Watson filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER GRANTING ACTAVIS INC.'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO MAKE AN ELECTION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR PRECLUSION (D.I. 536) by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #542 Motion for Extension of Time to File. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Motion Hearing as to #526 MOTION to Certify Class continued to 11/16/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/19/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 17, 2016 Filing 545 Brief re #536 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Discoverability of Notes Concerning Negotiation of the Reverse Payment Agreement (Redacted) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory T. Arnold in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Discoverability of Notes Concerning Negotiation of the Reverse Payment Agreement, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E (Redacted), #7 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #536 ) (Nalven, David) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 16, 2016 Filing 544 RESPONSE to re #536 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Election and Proffer by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 16, 2016 Filing 543 NOTICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Election Pursuant to the Court's August 9, 2016 #536 Order Concerning Subjective Beliefs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/16/2016) Modified on 8/17/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2016 Filing 542 MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO MAKE AN ELECTION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURTS ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR PRECLUSION (D.I. #536 ) filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Brian P. Savage, #2 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/15/2016) Modified on 8/16/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2016 Filing 541 EXHIBITS - Revised Redacted Exhibit 4 in Response to August 9, 2016 Order (Dkt. No. #536 ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/15/2016) Modified on 8/16/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2016 Filing 540 Brief [Supplementary] Regarding Discoverability of Attorney Work Product and Request for Clarification of the August 9, 2016 #536 Order filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/15/2016) Modified on 8/16/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2016 Filing 539 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Schedule filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 11, 2016 Filing 538 Brief re #536 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Renewed Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial (Redacted) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J (redacted))(Related document(s) #536 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 11, 2016 Filing 537 Brief re #536 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Discovery,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (Redacted) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D (redacted), #2 Exhibit F (redacted))(Related document(s) #536 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR PRODUCTION OR PRECLUSION AND PRODUCTION OF ATTORNEY NOTES by Judge William H. Orrick re #462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #463 Motion for Discovery, #472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #473 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #476 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and #491 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Case Management Conference set for August 9, 2016 is continued until August 30, 2016; any joint status report or dispute regarding discovery shall be filed by August 26, 2016. The Case Management Conference set for September 6, 2016 is VACATED. The normal Case Management Schedule will resume for the October 4, 2016 Conference. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 9, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing - Case Management Conference continued to 8/30/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
August 5, 2016 Filing 535 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
July 12, 2016 Filing 534 NOTICE of Change In Counsel filed by Rosemary Farrales Luzon for Plaintiff UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS LOCAL 1776 & PARTICIPATING EMPLOYERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 8, 2016 Filing 533 Brief re #530 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re #487 ; -Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum Served on Optisource LLC (Redacted) filed byAmerican Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #530 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
July 7, 2016 Filing 532 NOTICE by TWIN CITY IRON WORKERS HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND Notice of Withdrawal of Christian M. Sande (Caldes, William) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 7, 2016 Filing 531 NOTICE of Change of Address by David S. Elkins Notice of Change of Address (Elkins, David) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick re #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, and #499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 529 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING Telephone Conference set for July 5, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 30, 2016 Filing 528 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 21, 2016 Filing 527 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING held on 06/07/2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly L. Polvi, telephone number 503.779.7406. Tape Number: FTR 3:35 P.M. to 5:55 P.M.. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (518 in 3:14-md-02521-WHO) Transcript Order, (515 in 3:14-md-02521-WHO) Transcript Order, (513 in 3:14-md-02521-WHO) Transcript Order, (516 in 3:14-md-02521-WHO) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016. (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 526 MOTION to Certify Class filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2016 03:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/19/2016. Replies due by 10/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3-12 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15-37 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 38 (Part 1 of 4), #9 Exhibit 38 (Part 2 of 4), #10 Exhibit 38 (Part 3 of 4), #11 Exhibit 38 (Part 4 of 4), #12 Exhibit 39-69 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 70, #14 Exhibit 71, #15 Exhibit 72, #16 Report of Hal J. Singer, PH.D (Redacted), #17 Declaration of W. Paul DeBree (Redacted), #18 Declaration of Steven Schaper (Redacted), #19 Declaration of Non-Party Express Scripts, Inc. (Redacted), #20 Declaration of Non-Party Prime Therapeutics LLC (Redacted), #21 Proposed Order Granting End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Redacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/17/2016) Modified on 10/5/2016 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2016 Filing 525 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 3-10 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 11-12 and 15-20 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #3 Exhibit 21-26 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #4 Exhibit 27-31 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #5 Exhibit 32-34 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #6 Exhibit 35-37 and 39-44 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #7 Exhibit 45-47 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #8 Exhibit 48-50 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #9 Exhibit 51-52 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #10 Exhibit 53-69 to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 524 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Report of Hal J. Singer, PH.D, #2 Declaration of W. Paul DeBree, #3 Declaration of Steven Schaper, #4 Declaration of Non-Party Express Scripts, Inc., #5 Declaration of Non-Party Prime Therapeutics LLC, #6 Proposed Order Granting End-Payor Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/17/2016) (Additional attachment added on 6/28/2016: #7 Exhibit to Dkt. 524-2, CV of W. Paul DeBree,) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2016 Filing 523 Declaration in Support of #522 Document E-Filed Under Seal,,,,, [Public] Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Direct Purchaser Class Plaintffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byAmerican Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 20 - Part 1, #4 Exhibit 20 - Part 2, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Proposed Order Granting Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #7 Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Plan, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service of Documents Submitted Under Seal)(Related document(s) #522 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 17, 2016 Filing 522 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #521 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by American Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey J. Leitzinger, #2 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 24, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29, #29 Exhibit 30, #30 Exhibit 31, #31 Exhibit 32, #32 Exhibit 33, #33 Exhibit 34, #34 Exhibit 35, #35 Exhibit 37, #36 Exhibit 38, #37 Exhibit 39, #38 Exhibit 40, #39 Exhibit 41, #40 Exhibit 42, #41 Exhibit 43, #42 Exhibit 44, #43 Exhibit 45, #44 Exhibit 46, #45 Exhibit 47, #46 Exhibit 48, #47 Exhibit 49, #48 Exhibit 50, #49 Exhibit 51, #50 Appendix A)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER Granting #519 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/16/2016. (Counsel should link to this order when making the referenced under seal filings.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #519 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 519 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Administrative Motions to Seal in Connection with Class Certification Briefing and Page Limits for Class Certification Briefing filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 14, 2016 Filing 518 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 7, 2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Actavis Plc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 14, 2016 Filing 517 Letter Brief re #512 Letter Brief, Response to Endo's Subjective Beliefs Chart filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #512 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 516 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/07/13 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 515 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/07/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
June 12, 2016 Filing 514 NOTICE by Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ACTAVIS DEFENDANTS' DEMONSTRTIVE USED AT JUNE 7TH HEARING FILED IN RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO FILE BY CHAMBERS (Attachments: #1 Demonstrative)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 6/12/2016)
June 10, 2016 Filing 513 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/07/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 9, 2016 Filing 512 Letter Brief re #475 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Supplemental Chart in Connection with Endo's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Production or Preclusion filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Chart)(Related document(s) #475 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 9, 2016 Filing 511 Letter Brief re #463 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT Response to Actavis supplemental submission at June 7, 2016 Status Hearing filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Related document(s) #463 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 7, 2016 Filing 510 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2016. Based upon the Court's tentative ruling, Optisource and Watson have reached an agreement that resolves Watson's motion to compel the subpoena for production. Rebuttal to or similar summaries as the chart submitted at the hearing by Activis may be submitted by any other parties no later than the end of the day on Thursday, June 9, 2016. After the deposition of a Price Waterhouse Cooper, the parties should meet and confer if further questions concerning the development of the memo remain. Arguments taken under submission; a final written order will follow concerning the subjective belief and Manogue notes disputes. FTR Time 3:35-5:55. Plaintiff Attorneys Dena Sharp, David S. Nalven, and Peter Kohn. Defendant Attorneys Joseph Meckes, Rafael Langer-Osuna, Daniel B. Asimow, Steven Reade, Ryn Watts, Karen Hoffman Lent, Sean M. Tepe, Lauren Raskin, Eric L. Bloom, and Peter St. Phillip. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/7/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 509 Tentative Rulings for June 7, 2016 Hearing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 508 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of #499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ACTAVIS DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC AND EXHIBITS A THROUGH D TO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIE F filed byRochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Related document(s) #499 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 507 Declaration of Mark A. Cunningham in Support of Actavis Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal Portions Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5 filed byOptiSource, LLC. (Cunningham, Mark) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 506 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ACTAVIS DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC AND EXHIBITS A-D, R, and S TO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed byRochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Revised version of ECF No. 466-6, Exhibit B (redacted))(Related document(s) #466 ) (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR MATERIALS PRODUCED BY THE NATIONAL WHOLESALERS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/06/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 504 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 3, 2016 Filing 503 Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
June 2, 2016 Filing 502 Proposed Order Supplemental Protective Order for Materials Produced by the National Wholesalers by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
June 1, 2016 Filing 501 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe in Support of #500 Reply to Opposition/Response, IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC filed byANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #500 ) (Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 Filing 500 REPLY (re #467 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC ) filed byANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D slipsheets, #2 Exhibit E)(Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
June 1, 2016 Filing 499 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ACTAVIS DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC AND EXHIBITS A THROUGH D TO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY BRIEF filed by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sean M. Tepe, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Reply, #4 UNREDACTED Reply, #5 SEALED Exhibit A, #6 SEALED Exhibit B, #7 SEALED Exhbit C, #8 SEALED Exhibit D)(Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 498 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe in Support of #487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum Served on Optisource LLC filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #487 ) (Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 497 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. #487 ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/31/2016) Modified on 6/1/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2016 Filing 496 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of #491 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3, 4, and 5 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Discoverability of Attorney Work Product filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #491 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 495 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. 490) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 31, 2016 Filing 494 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #497 . *** Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. 487) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/31/2016) Modified on 6/1/2016 (fff, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2016 Filing 493 Declaration in Support of #490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Related document(s) #490 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 492 Brief re #479 Brief,, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Discoverability of Attorney Work Product filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1 to Asimow Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Asimow Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Asimow Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Asimow Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Asimow Declaration, #7 Declaration of Caroline B. Manogue)(Related document(s) #479 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 491 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3, 4, and 5 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Discoverability of Attorney Work Product filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 25, 2016 Filing 490 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Sealed] Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Renewed Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial, #4 [Redacted] Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Renewed Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial, #5 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Further Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L, #9 Exhibit M, #10 Exhibit N)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 25, 2016 Filing 489 RESPONSE (re #467 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC ) filed byOptiSource, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #483 Motion to Consolidate Reply Briefing. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 487 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Enforce Subpoenas Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum Served on Optisource LLC filed by American Sales Company, LLC, DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC., Rochester Drug Co-Operative, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Sealed] Response to Motion to Enforce Subpoenas, #4 [Redacted] Response to Motion to Enforce Subpoenas, #5 Declaration Kohn Declaration ISO Response to Enforce Subpoenas, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 486 Letter from Thomas M. Sobol to Honorable William H. Orrick in Response to Endo's Letter of May 19, 2016 . (Nalven, David) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 485 Letter from Daniel B. Asimow to Hon. William H. Orrick in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter of May 20, 2016. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER of USCA Petitioners' April 7, 2016 Motion to File Document Under Seal for In Camera and Ex Parte Review is granted. Petitioners have not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Accordingly, the petition is denied. DENIED; as to #450 USCA Order (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 24, 2016 Filing 483 MOTION (Unopposed) to Consolidate May 25 Reply Briefing filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/7/2016. Replies due by 6/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 482 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of #478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS A THROUGH F OF THE DECLARATION OF GREG ARNOLD AND PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM ON DISCOVERABILITY OF NOTES CONCERNING NEGOTIATION OF THE REVERSE PAYMENT AGREEMENT filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #478 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
May 23, 2016 Filing 481 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. #478 ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/23/2016) Modified on 5/24/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2016 Filing 480 Letter from Daniel B. Asimow to Hon. William H. Orrick re May 2, 2016 Civil Minutes and Order (Dkt #459 ). (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/23/2016) Modified on 5/24/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2016 Filing 479 Brief on Discoverability of Notes Concerning Negotiation of the Reverse Payment Agreement filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Greg Arnold in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Discoverability of Notes Concerning Negotiation of the Reverse Payment Agreement, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 19, 2016 Filing 478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS A THROUGH F OF THE DECLARATION OF GREG ARNOLD AND PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM ON DISCOVERABILITY OF NOTES CONCERNING NEGOTIATION OF THE REVERSE PAYMENT AGREEMENT filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Greg Arnold in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Version of Memorandum on Discoverability, #4 UNREDACTED Version of Memorandum on Discoverability, #5 Exhibit A (Redacted), #6 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit B (Redacted), #8 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit C (Redacted), #10 Exhibit C (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit D (Redacted), #12 Exhibit D (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit E (Redacted), #14 Exhibit E (Unredacted), #15 Exhibit F (Redacted), #16 Exhibit F (Unredacted))(Nalven, David) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 477 RESPONSE (re #463 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT ) ACTAVIS, INC.S (F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.) OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AND TRIAL filed byANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Lent, #2 Ex. A, #3 Ex. B (Redacted), #4 Ex. C)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 476 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Lent, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Version of Exhibit B, #4 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit B)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 475 RESPONSE (re #463 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT ) - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 474 RESPONSE (re #463 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT ) filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Meckes, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 473 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of a Document filed by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 1)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Filing 472 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial and Exhibits 1, 6, And 10 to the Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Endo's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Production, #4 Unredacted Version of Endo's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Production, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Asimow Decl ISO Opposition to Renewed Motion for Production, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6 to Asimow Decl ISO Opposition to Renewed Motion for Production, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Asimow Decl ISO Opposition to Renewed Motion for Production)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 18, 2016 Upcoming monthly telephone conferences set: Telephone Conference set for 6/7/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Telephone Conference set for 7/5/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Telephone Conference set for 8/9/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Telephone Conference set for 10/4/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 471 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Participation in monthly status conference and motion hearing set for June 7, 2016 at 3:30 p.m. Counsel are free to elect whether to attend personally (in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor) or via conference call as is the custom. Counsel who will appear by phone should set up the call with a conferencing service and circulate the dial in and password information. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 17, 2016 Filing 470 Letter from Plaintiffs to Hon. William H. Orrick in Response to Letter from Defendants re Upcoming 06-07-16 Case Management Conference (Dkt. #469 ). (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/17/2016) Modified on 5/18/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2016 Filing 469 Letter from Defendants to Hon. William H. Orrick re Upcoming 06-07-16 Case Management Conference. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 12, 2016 Filing 468 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING hearing as to #467 MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing reset for 6/7/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016)
May 11, 2016 Filing 467 MOTION to Compel MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC filed by ANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/25/2016. Replies due by 6/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe, #2 Exhibits A-D Slipsheets, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M, #12 Exhibit N, #13 Exhibit O, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Exhibit Q, #16 Exhibits R-S, #17 Proposed Order)(Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 11, 2016 Filing 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ACTAVIS DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM AND AD TESTIFICANDUM SERVED ON OPTISOURCE LLC AND EXHIBITS A-D, R, and S TO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION filed by Actavis Plc., Anda, Inc, Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sean M. Tepe, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Version of Motion to Enforce, #4 UNREDACTED Version of Motion to Enforce, #5 UNREDACTED Exhibit A, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit B, #7 UNREDACTED Exhibit C, #8 UNREDACTED Exhibit D, #9 UNREDACTED Exhibit R, #10 UNREDACTED Exhibit S)(Tepe, Sean) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
May 9, 2016 Filing 465 Declaration of Hiro Sakamoto in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal [D.I. #462 ] filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 5/9/2016) Modified on 5/10/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2016 Filing 464 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of "Plaintiffs' #462 Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibits D Through I to the Declaration of Peter Kohn and Portions of Plantiffs' Renewed Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial" filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2016) Modified on 5/10/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2016 Filing 463 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/18/2016. Replies due by 5/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Production or Preclusion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order)(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 4, 2016 Filing 462 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal EXHIBITS D THROUGH I OF THE DECLARATION OF PETER KOHN AND PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS RENEWED MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR PRECLUSION OF EVIDENCE AT SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Peter Kohn in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Preclusion and Memorandum (pt. 1), #4 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Preclusion and Memorandum (pt. 2), #5 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Preclusion and Memorandum, #6 Exhibit D (Redacted), #7 Exhibit D (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit E (Redacted), #9 Exhibit E (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit F (Redacted), #11 Exhibit F (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit G (Redacted), #13 Exhibit G (Unredacted), #14 Exhibit H (Redacted), #15 Exhibit H (Unredacted), #16 Exhibit I (Redacted), #17 Exhibit I (Unredacted))(Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 461 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #458 Stipulation Amending Schedule. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER REGARDING PRODUCTION OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS OF ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC. by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #455 Stipulation. If the parties wish to further identify the Withheld Documents they may submit an amended stipulation and order to do so. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 3, 2016 Filing 458 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Schedule filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Stipulation)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 459 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/2/2016. FTR Time 3:31-3:57. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER RE DISMISSAL OF DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF CESAR CASTILLO, INC. by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #454 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER RE #451 PRIVILEGE DISPUTE by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 455 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production of Certain Documents of Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 454 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re dismissal of Direct Purchaser Plaintiff Cesar Castillo, Inc. filed by Cesar Castillo, Inc.. (Demuth, Bradley) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 29, 2016 Filing 453 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER re #451 Discovery Letter Brief. Defendant Endo shall submit Document P_ENDO-LID-AT0022459 to chambers for in camera review by 12:00 p.m. Monday, May 2, 2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/29/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 28, 2016 Filing 451 Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER of USCA The emergency motion for a stay pending review of this petition for a writ of mandamus is denied. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER ON #445 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #447 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 19, 2016 Filing 447 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production Of Certain Morgan Stanley Documents filed by Government Employees Health Association, Inc. (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE WITH RETAILER PLAINTIFFS re #444 Letter. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/18/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 445 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's April 5, 2016 Order Concerning Production of a January 20, 2011 Email filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 444 Letter from Defendants and Retailer Plaintiffs Regarding Dispute re Wholesaler Contracts. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick granting #430 and #442 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 442 Declaration of Sharon K. Robertson in Support of Endo Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Administrative #430 Motion to Seal filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 (Redacted) April 1, 2016 Joint Discovery Dispute Letter, #2 (Under Seal) April 1, 2016 Joint Discovery Dispute Letter)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/12/2016) Modified on 4/14/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2016 Filing 441 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/05/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by American Sales Company, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 440 Transcript of FTR recoring of Proceedings held on 4/5/2016, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #436 Transcript Order, #439 Transcript Order, #438 Transcript Order, #437 Transcript Order ) Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2016. (Related documents(s) #436 , #439 , #438 , #437 ) (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 7, 2016 Filing 439 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 5, 2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 7, 2016 Filing 438 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/05/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 7, 2016 Filing 437 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/5/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick by End-Payor Plaintiffs', for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 7, 2016 Filing 436 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Hon. William H. Orrick by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 435 Minute Entry and Order regarding discovery issues - Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/5/2016 before Hon. William H. Orrick. FTR Time 3:32-4:45. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 434 Brief re #432 Order, WATSON'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS AT ISSUE IN JOINT DISPUTE LETTER (MDL DKT. NO. 427) filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent, #2 Exhibit A to Lent Declaration, #3 Declaration of David A. Buchen)(Related document(s) #432 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 433 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER REQUIRING IN CAMERA SUBMISSION re #431 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Actavis shall submit the six documents in question for in camera review no later than 10:00 am Tuesday April 5, 2016. If necessary, Actavis may file in the public docket a brief of no more than three pages further explaining the basis for the withholding, along with supporting declarations, by 10:00 am Tuesday April 5, 2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/01/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 431 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
April 1, 2016 Filing 430 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery DIspute Letter (Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 1 to Joint Discovery Dispute Letter (Exh. A), #5 Exhibit 2 to Joint Discovery Dispute Letter (Exh. A))(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Will Barnett Fitton (Fitton, Will) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 31, 2016 Filing 428 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc N. Bernstein (Bernstein, Marc) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 28, 2016 Filing 427 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 28, 2016 Filing 426 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing monthly Telephone Conference from 5/3/2016 to 5/2/2016 03:30 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 425 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants Actavis, Inc.'s (f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis, PLC's Answer to CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Complaint and Dmand for Jury Trial byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sunshine, Steven) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 424 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand - Defendant Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc.'s and Defendant Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.'s Answer to CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Complaint byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 21, 2016 Filing 423 Endo's ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial of CVS Pharmacy, Inc/ byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 422 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anna Theresa Neill Scott E. Perwin and Lauren C. Ravkind (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #415 STIPULATION REGARDING PRODUCTION OF INFORMATION IN RESPONSE TO DPP'S FOURTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 420 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #418 Stipulation Regarding Production of Information. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #417 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of End-Payor Plaintiff Irene Kampanis. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 16, 2016 Filing 418 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Teikoku on Certain Patent Issues filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
March 14, 2016 Filing 417 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal of End-Payor Plaintiff Irene Kampanis filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 416 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/01/16, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 3:30 p.m. - 4:43 p.m. = 73 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #411 Transcript Order, #407 Transcript Order, #408 Transcript Order, #410 Transcript Order, #412 Transcript Order, #409 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2016. (Related documents(s) #411 , #407 , #408 , #410 , #412 , #409 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 10, 2016 Filing 415 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production of Information in Response to DPP's Fourth Set of Interrogatories filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/10/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 414 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Levy (Levy, Scott) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DISPUTE REGARDING CITIZEN PETITION DOCUMENTS by Judge William H. Orrick denying #375 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; settling #377 Discovery Letter Brief; granting #389 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and granting #391 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Endo and Teikoku must provide the improperly withheld or clawed-back documents and communications to plaintiffs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 412 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Actavis Plc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bloom, Eric) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Filing 409 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Sales Company, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 407 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by End-Payor Plaintiffs' for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 406 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/1/2016 re discovery disputes raised by #398 Discovery Letter Brief, #401 Discovery Letter Brief, and #402 Discovery Letter Brief settled at hearing. No further orders will follow. Request to quash deposition of Mr. Levin contained in #399 Discovery Letter Brief is DENIED. Written orders will follow as to the discovery disputes addressed by #375 and #377 discovery letter briefs. FTR Time 3:30-4:43. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2016) Modified on 3/8/2016 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF BRIAN LORTIE by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #387 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 29, 2016 Filing 404 NOTICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Shannon E. McClure (McClure, Shannon) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 26, 2016 Filing 403 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 26, 2016 Filing 402 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 401 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 25, 2016 Filing 400 NOTICE of Appearance by Karin Elizabeth Garvey as counsel for Iron Workers District Council of New England Welfare Fund (Garvey, Karin) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
February 24, 2016 Filing 399 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 398 Joint Discovery Letter Brief of All Plaintiffs and Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kohn, Peter) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 397 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plantiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal (ECF No. 391) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 22, 2016 Filing 396 Declaration of Ichiro Mori in Support of #391 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply on Request for Production of Documents Concerning Endo's Citizen Petition filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Related document(s) #391 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 395 NOTICE by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co of Withdrawal of Nathan Lane III as Counsel of Record (Elkins, David) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 394 Declaration of Ichiro Mori in Support of #389 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Endo's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co. (Related document(s) #389 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 393 Declaration of Karen Hoffman Lent in Support of #389 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Endo's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Related document(s) #389 ) (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 392 REPLY (re #377 Joint Discovery Letter Brief ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 16, 2016 Filing 391 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply on Request for Production of Documents Concerning Endo's Citizen Petition filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk in Support of Admin Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Reply on Request for Production of Documents, #4 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Reply on Request for Production of Documents, #5 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 3 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 4 (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 390 RESPONSE (re #375 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 12, 2016 Order Concerning Production of a February 2, 2012 Email, or in the Alternative, Motion to Certify the Court's Order for Interlocutory Appeal ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 9 (Redacted), #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 12 (Redacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 389 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Endo's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Endo's Motion for Leave to file Motion for Reconsideration, #4 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Endo's Motion for Leave to file Motion for Reconsideration, #5 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 5 (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 6 (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 7 (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 8 (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit 9 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit 9 (Unredacted), #15 Exhibit 11 (Redacted), #16 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted), #17 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 12 (Unredacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 12, 2016 Filing 388 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of #387 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Deposition of Brian Lortie filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/12/2016) Modified on 2/16/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2016 Filing 387 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Brian Lortie filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/12/2016)
February 9, 2016 Filing 386 RESPONSE (re #377 Joint Discovery Letter Brief ) - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s, Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc.'s, and Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request to Compel Production of Privileged Documents Concerning the Lidoderm Citizen Petition filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caroline Manogue, #2 Declaration of Matthew Peterson, #3 Declaration of Daniel Asimow, #4 Exhibit A to Asimow Declaration)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 385 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 02/02/16, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 3:36 - 4:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #380 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2016. (Related documents(s) #380 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 384 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Sales Company, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 383 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Teikoku Pharma USA, Teikoku Seiyaku Co for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 382 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Actavis Plc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 381 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by End-Payor Plaintiffs' for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 4, 2016 Filing 380 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 2/4/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 379 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/2/2016. Plaintiffs should file a 10-page response to Defendants' #375 Motion for Reconsideration by February 12, 2016. As to the discovery dispute letter brief filed February 1, 2016, plaintiffs should submit the documents at issue for in camera review, including the relevant engagement agreements. Defendant may file a 10-page brief as to the issue in one week; plaintiff may file a 10-page responsive brief in two weeks. FTR Time 3:36-4:01. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2016)
February 2, 2016 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Casamiquela as Counsel for Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Casamiquela, Ryan) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
February 1, 2016 Filing 377 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 29, 2016 Filing 376 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
January 26, 2016 Filing 375 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's January 12, 2016 Order Concerning Production of a February 2, 2012 Email, or in the Alternative, Motion to Certify the Court's Order for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Noriyuki Shimoda)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 21, 2016 Filing 374 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 01/12/16, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 3:30 - 4:02. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #368 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2016. (Related documents(s) #368 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 373 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Bloom, Eric) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Actavis Plc. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 371 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 370 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Sales Company, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 369 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 14, 2016 Filing 368 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by End-Payor Plaintiffs' for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/14/2016)
January 12, 2016 Filing 367 Minute Order for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/12/2016 settling #359 Discovery Letter Brief and #364 Discovery Letter Brief. FTR Time 3:30-4:02. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2016)
January 11, 2016 Filing 366 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by American Sales Company, LLC. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
January 9, 2016 Filing 365 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 1/9/2016)
December 30, 2015 Filing 364 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 12/30/2015)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Telephonic Status Conference continued to 1/12/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/29/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 29, 2015 Filing 361 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Status Conference for One Week filed by American Sales Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Nalven in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Status Conference)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 29, 2015 Set future monthly telephonic status conferences: 2/2/2016 03:30 PM, 3/1/2016 03:30 PM, 4/5/2016 03:30 PM, and 5/3/2016 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
December 21, 2015 Filing 360 Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna in Support of #358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #358 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 359 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 17, 2015 Filing 358 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Grzenczyk, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Joint Discovery Letter Brief, #4 (Unredacted) Joint Discovery Letter Brief)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/17/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER CONCERNING CLAW BACKS Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/9/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting, as modified, #351 STIPULATION Amending Schedule. Discovery cutoff: 4/27/2016. Rule 56 and Daubert Motions to be heard by 7/17/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 10/30/2017 08:30 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/9/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 355 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/8/2015. A written order will follow as to concerns regarding the claw back of privileged documents. FTR Time 3:31-4:16. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 354 NOTICE by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health and Welfare Fund Withdrawal of Elizabeth G. Arthur as Counsel for Plaintiff United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health and Welfare Fund (Arthur, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clarkson Griffith (Griffith, Robert) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 352 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 4, 2015 Filing 351 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Schedule filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER ON MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OR PRECLUSION by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part #278 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 349 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 23, 2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #348 Transcript Order, #336 Transcript Order, #335 Transcript Order, #344 Transcript Order, #332 Transcript Order, #333 Transcript Order, #337 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2016. (Related documents(s) #348 , #336 , #335 , #344 , #332 , #333 , #337 ) (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 348 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Bloom, Eric) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 347 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Paul Thiel for Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. (Thiel, Daniel) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
December 1, 2015 Filing 346 NOTICE by United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health and Welfare Fund of Withdrawal of Karen Leser-Grenon as Counsel for Plaintiff United Food and Commercial Workers Local 1776 & Participating Employers Health and Welfare Fund (Luzon, Rosemary) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 345 Joint Discovery Letter Brief of Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Plaintiffs (Errata - see Dkt #331 ) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/30/2015) Modified on 12/1/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2015 Filing 344 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Government Employees Health Association, Inc for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #320 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 to correct document linkage (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER DENYING #293 MOTION TO DISQUALIFY AND CROSS-MOTION CHALLENGING CLAW BACK by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 337 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 336 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Sales Company, LLC for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 335 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Actavis Plc. for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Lent, Karen) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 333 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 24, 2015 Filing 332 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by End-Payor Plaintiffs' for Court Reporter Belle Ball. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 334 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 11/23/2015 re #278 MOTION for Production or and #293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. Status Report due by 12/4/2015. Telephone Conference rescheduled for 12/8/2015 03:30 PM. Court Reporter Name Belle Ball. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2015)
November 23, 2015 Filing 331 SEE DOCKET NUMBER #345 FOR THE COMPLETE ATTACHMENT OF THIS E-FILING Joint Discovery Letter Brief of Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Plaintiffs filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/23/2015) Modified on 12/1/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2015 Filing 330 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COURTROOM - The hearing as to #278 MOTION for Production and #293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel set for 11/23/2015 at 2:00 p.m. will be conducted in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 329 RESPONSE (re #320 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Redacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 328 Declaration in Support of #320 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #320 ) (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 327 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback filed by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joseph Meckes, #3 Appendix Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Appendix Unredacted Opposition Brief)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 326 REPLY (re #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) [303 - Response] CORRECTION to Docket Nos. #320 -3 and #321 -1 filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #321 Motion to Shorten Time. Teikoku may file an Opposition to the Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback on or before Tuesday November 17, 2015. No other or subsequent reply shall be filed. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 324 RESPONSE (re #321 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback and for Leave to File Reply ) filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph Meckes, #2 Exhibit 1 to Meckes Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Meckes Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 13, 2015 Filing 323 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of #317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A of the Supplemental Declaration of Dena C. Sharp and Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #317 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/13/2015)
November 11, 2015 Filing 322 RESPONSE (re #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) - Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback [Dkt 301-3] filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/11/2015)
November 11, 2015 Filing 321 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback and for Leave to File Reply filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: *** #1 Exhibit 1 DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #2 Declaration Supplemental of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback, #3 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Motion to Shorten Time, #4 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/11/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2015 Filing 320 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, *** #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , #4 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Cross-Motion Challenging Clawback)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/11/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2015 Filing 319 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2015 rescheduled to 02:00 PM. Plaintiffs will file an administrative motion by noon on Wednesday, November 11, 2015 requesting leave to file a reply and to have their cross-motion heard on November 23, 2015. Defendants shall file any opposition to the administrative motion by Friday, November 13, 2015. Endo requests a stay of their obligation to turn over drafts of the SEC letter pursuant to the Court's Order on November 9, 2015. The Court grants a two week stay for Endo to decide whether to file an interlocutory appeal. Court Reporter Name n/a. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 318 REPLY (re #278 MOTION for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 317 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk in Support of Admin Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) - Plaintiffs' Reply in further Support of Motion for Production, #4 (Unredacted) - Plaintiffs' Reply in further Support of Motion for Production, #5 Exhibit A (Redacted) to Supplemental Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #6 Exhibit A (Unredacted) to Supplemental Declaration of Dena C. Sharp)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick re #269 Discovery Letter Brief. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 315 NOTICE by End-Payor Plaintiffs' Change in Dial-in Number for the November 9, 2015 Telephonic Case Management Conference (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 5, 2015 Filing 314 REPLY (re #293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #313 filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/5/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2015: #1 Declaration of N. Shimoda, #2 Declaration of R. Langer-Osuna, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of R. Langer-Osuna) (jmdS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/13/2015 to add attachments (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2015 Filing 313 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER #314 FOR THE CORRECT E-FILING***Document restricted at filer's request. It will be refiled.***REPLY (re #293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of N. Shimoda, #2 Declaration of R. Langer-Osuna, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of R. Langer-Osuna)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/4/2015) Modified on 11/5/2015 (jmdS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/6/2015 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2015 Filing 312 REPLY (re #293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) to Plaintiff Government Employee Health Association's Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
November 4, 2015 Filing 311 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Meckes, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Appendix Redacted Version of Reply Brief, #4 Appendix Unredacted Version of Reply Brief)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 11/4/2015) Modified on 11/5/2015 to restrict Attachment 3 at filer's request to protect document containing vulnerable redactions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2015 Filing 310 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory T Arnold (Arnold, Gregory) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 309 Declaration of Hiro Sakamoto in Support of #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #301 ) (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
November 2, 2015 Filing 308 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #301 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 307 CLERK'S NOTICE - Telephone Conference continued to 11/9/2015 03:00 PM. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Filing 306 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #298 Stipulation Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(3). (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015)
October 29, 2015 Filing 304 EXHIBITS re #301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17 (Unredacted) (Corrected), #2 Exhibit 28 (Unredacted) (Corrected))(Related document(s) #301 ) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 303 RESPONSE (re #293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) filed byAll Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp, #2 Exhibit 1-10, #3 Exhibit 11-15 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 16, #5 Exhibit 17-29 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 30, #7 Exhibit 31-33 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Declaration of Richard Zitrin, #9 Declaration Compendium of Client Declarations, #10 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 302 RESPONSE (re #293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ) filed byGovernment Employees Health Association, Inc. (Seaver, Todd) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 301 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Disqualify, #4 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Disqualify, #5 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition (Redacted), #6 of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 11 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted) Part 1 of 4, #9 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted) Part 2 of 4, #10 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted) Part 3 of 4, #11 Exhibit 11 (Unredacted) Part 4 of 4, #12 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 12 (Unredacted) Part 1 of 2, #14 Exhibit 12 (Unredacted) Part 2 of 2, #15 Exhibit 13 (Redacted), #16 Exhibit 13 (Unredacted), #17 Exhibit 14 (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 14 (Unredacted), #19 Exhibit 15 (Redacted), #20 Exhibit 15 (Unredacted), #21 Exhibit 17 (Redacted), #22 Exhibit 17 (Unredacted), #23 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), #24 Exhibit 18 (Unredacted), #25 Exhibit 19 (Redacted), #26 Exhibit 19 (Unredacted), #27 Exhibit 20 (Redacted), #28 Exhibit 20 (Unredacted), #29 Exhibit 21 (Redacted), #30 Exhibit 21 (Unredacted), #31 Exhibit 22 (Redacted), #32 Exhibit 22 (Unredacted), #33 Exhibit 23 (Redacted), #34 Exhibit 23 (Unredacted), #35 Exhibit 24 (Redacted), #36 Exhibit 24 (Unredacted), #37 Exhibit 25 (Redacted), #38 Exhibit 25 (Unredacted), #39 Exhibit 26 (Redacted), #40 Exhibit 26 (Unredacted), #41 Exhibit 27 (Redacted), #42 Exhibit 27 (Unredacted), #43 Exhibit 28 (Redacted), #44 Exhibit 28 (Unredacted), #45 Exhibit 29 (Redacted), #46 Exhibit 29 (Unredacted), #47 Exhibit 31 (Redacted), #48 Exhibit 31 (Unredacted), #49 Exhibit 32 (Redacted), #50 Exhibit 32 (Unredacted), #51 Exhibit 33 (Redacted), #52 Exhibit 33 (Unredacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #297 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Shannon E. McClure. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 26, 2015 Filing 299 RESPONSE (re #278 MOTION for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 298 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 23, 2015 Filing 297 MOTION & [PORPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (Civil Local Rule 11-3) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9939366.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/23/2015) Modified on 10/26/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2015 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen John McConnell (McConnell, Stephen) (Filed on 10/23/2015)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 STIPULATION AND ORDER Resetting Deadlines as to #278 MOTION for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial. Responses due by 10/26/2015. Replies due by 11/9/2015. Motion Hearing continued to 11/23/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/19/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 16, 2015 Filing 294 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #278 MOTION for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
October 14, 2015 Filing 293 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2015 04:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/28/2015. Replies due by 11/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Joseph A. Meckes, #3 Exhibit A to Meckes Declaration, #4 Declaration of Rafael Langer-Osuna, #5 Declaration of Noriyuki Shimoda, #6 Exhibit A to Shimoda Declaration, #7 Declaration of Robert Johnson)(Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal for the limited purpose of determining plaintiffs' pending motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 9, 2015 Filing 291 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Plaintiffs' #277 Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibits A, F, G, and H to the Declaration of Dena C. Sharp and Portions of Exhibit B and Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2015 Filing 290 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 10/06/15, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 3:33 - 4:53. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #283 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2016. (Related documents(s) #283 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 289 ERRATA re #287 Notice (Other) Certificate of Service by PHILADELPHIA FEDERATION OF TEACHERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND. (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 288 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Government Employees Health Association, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (St. Phillip, Peter) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 287 NOTICE by PHILADELPHIA FEDERATION OF TEACHERS HEALTH & WELFARE FUND of Withdrawal of Counsel (Goldberg, Jacob) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 286 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Sales Company, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 285 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by End-Payor Plaintiffs' for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 283 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Langer-Osuna, Rafael) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Order Directing the Removal of Documents From the Court's Files by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #275 Motion. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to remove the documents filed as ECF Nos. 271-4, 271-12, 271-14, and 271-16 from the Courts files. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 281 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2015. Various discovery matters taken up. A written order will follow. FTR Time 3:30-4:53. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2015)
October 6, 2015 Filing 280 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 279 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - Defendant Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc.'s and Defendant Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.'s Supplemental Case Management Statement filed by Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 278 MOTION for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/19/2015. Replies due by 10/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena C. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Production, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 277 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk in support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial, #4 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial, #5 Exhibit A (Redacted), #6 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit B (Redacted), #8 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit F (Redacted), #10 Exhibit F (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit G (Redacted), #12 Exhibit G (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit H (Redacted), #14 Exhibit H (Unredacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 276 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 275 MOTION (Unopposed) to Remove from the Court's Files ECF Nos. 271-4, 271-12, 271-14, and 271-16 re #271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/19/2015. Replies due by 10/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dena Sharp in Support of Unopposed Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
October 5, 2015 Filing 274 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Administrative to Seal (Dkt. #271 ) and Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial (Dkt. 273) (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/5/2015) Modified on 10/7/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2015 Filing 273 MOTION for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2015 03:00 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/16/2015. Replies due by 10/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Sharp in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 272 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 271 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Production or Alternatively for Preclusion of Evidence at Summary Judgment and Trial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott M. Grzenczyk in Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Production, # 4 (Unredacted) Plaintiffs' Motion for Production, #5 Exhibit A (Redacted), #6 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit B (Redacted), #8 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit F (Redacted), #10 Exhibit F (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit G (Redacted), # 12 Exhibit G (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit H (Redacted), # 14 Exhibit H (Unredacted), #15 Exhibit I (Redacted), # 16 Exhibit I (Unredacted), #17 Exhibit J (Redacted), #18 Exhibit J (Unredacted), #19 Exhibit K (Redacted), #20 Exhibit K (Unredacted))(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW re #269 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Defendant Endo is ordered to deliver to chambers the documents specified in this order by 12:00 p.m. Monday October 5, 2015. The parties may argue this issue at the October 6, 2015 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/02/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
October 1, 2015 Filing 269 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William H. Orrick re #242 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Russell A. Chorush and #246 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Miranda Y. Jones. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #264 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Charles Barrett. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 266 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna M Evans (Evans, Donna) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE by American Sales Company, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Donna M. Evans As Counsel of Record (Evans, Donna) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 25, 2015 Filing 264 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw of Charles Barrett filed by American Sales Company, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/9/2015. Replies due by 10/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barrett, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel B. Asimow Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Notice of Change of Address of Counsel (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 262 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 9/1/2015. Court Reporter Name n/a. The Court directs that the parties concentrate for the next 30 days on review of the privilege logs, identification of disputes, and negotiations to resolve those disputes. Any that cannot be resolved after appropriate meet and confer sessions should be brought to the Court by means of a joint letter. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/1/2015)
August 28, 2015 Filing 261 JOINT TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 8/28/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #257 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Stuart E. Des Roches. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #256 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Andrew W. Kelly. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #255 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Chris Letter. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 257 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-9789853) filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Des Roches, Stuart) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 256 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-9789809) filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Kelly, Andrew) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 255 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-9789619), Filing Fee previously paid on 8/27/2015 filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Letter, Christopher) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 254 ANSWER to #236 Amended Complaint; -Defendants Actavis, Inc.'s (f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis, PLC's Answer to Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.'s Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sunshine, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 253 ANSWER to #235 Second Amended Complaint; -Defendants Actavis, Inc.'s (f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.), Watson Laboratories, Inc.'s and Actavis, PLC's Answer to Walgreen Co. et al.'s Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sunshine, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 252 ANSWER to #236 Amended Complaint - Defendant Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc.'s and Defendant Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Rite Aid Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 251 ANSWER to #235 Second Amended Complaint - Defendant Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc.'s and Defendant Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Walgreen Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 250 ANSWER to #235 Second Amended Complaint (Second) of Walgreen Co. et al. byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 249 ANSWER to #236 Amended Complaint of Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 8/26/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE re #247 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. The parties shall meet and confer by August 19, 2015, to attempt to reach a resolution for a more limited production of the documents identified in the RFPs that is consistent with this Order. If they are unable to reach a resolution by 5:00 p.m. on August 19, 2015, they shall give notice by 10:00 a.m. on August 20 to Ms. Davis, Courtroom Deputy, and provide her with their competing proposals for the scope of the requests. A telephonic hearing will then occur at 2:00 p.m. on August 21, 2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/13/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 247 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Actavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lent, Karen) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
August 6, 2015 Filing 246 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Miranda Y. Jones ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9736820.) filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Jones, Miranda) (Filed on 8/6/2015) Modified on 8/6/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER re #241 STIPULATION Amending Schedule. Fact discovery cutoff: 1/28/2016. Dispositive and Daubert Motions to be heard by 4/19/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 6/26/2017 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/21/2017 08:30 AM, both in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/05/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Order Re: Expert Discovery by Hon. William H. Orrick adopting #239 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2015)
August 4, 2015 Filing 243 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2015. Court Reporter Name: n/a. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2015)
August 4, 2015 Filing 242 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Russell A. Chorush ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9732014.) filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Chorush, Russell) (Filed on 8/4/2015) Modified on 8/5/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2015 Filing 241 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Schedule filed by All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Nalven in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amending Schedule)(Nalven, David) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
August 3, 2015 Set Hearings - Telephone Conferences set for 8/4/2015 03:30 PM, 9/1/2015 03:30 PM, 10/6/2015 03:30 PM, 11/3/2015 03:30 PM, and 12/1/2015 03:30 PM before Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
July 31, 2015 Filing 240 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 239 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Expert Discovery filed by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 238 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 29, 2015 Filing 237 STIPULATION Regarding Timing of Defendants' Responses to the Amended Complaints by Walgreen and Rite Aid Plaintiffs filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 236 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Actavis Plc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed byRite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp.. (Bloom, Eric) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 Filing 235 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Actavis Plc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed bySafeway Inc., Walgreen Co, ALBERTSONS LLC, HEB Grocery Company LP, The Kroger Co.. (Neill, Anna) (Filed on 7/27/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2015 Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by American Sales Company, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Nalven, David) (Filed on 7/23/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 233 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 07/08/15, before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 2:00 - 2:28. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #228 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2015. (Related documents(s) #228 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER RE #227 DISCOVERY LETTER by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick as to #183 Motion to Dismiss. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 14, 2015 Filing 230 NOTICE by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Bloom, Eric) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 14, 2015 Filing 229 NOTICE by ALBERTSONS LLC, HEB Grocery Company LP, Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co of Service of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 14, 2015 Filing 228 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Wood, Emily) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
July 10, 2015 Filing 227 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by End-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D)(Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #225 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Steven G. Reade. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 225 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9666535.) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Reade, Steven) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 Filing 224 NOTICE by Cesar Castillo, Inc. of Nonparty Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena for Prince of Peace Enterprises, Inc., #2 Exhibit Prince of Peace Enterprises, Inc. Subpoena Schedule A, #3 Exhibit Form Subpoena for Hisamitsu America, Inc., #4 Exhibit Hisamitsu America, Inc. Subpoena Schedule A, #5 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order referenced in both subpoenas)(Demuth, Bradley) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #220 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth A. Wexler. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #221 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Justin Boley. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
July 9, 2015 Filing 221 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Justin N. Boley ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9664201.) filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boley, Justin) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 Filing 220 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kenneth A. Wexler ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9664176.) filed by Welfare Plan of the International Union of Operation Engineers Locals 137, 137A, 137B, 137C, 137R. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wexler, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2015 Filing 219 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2015 re #183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. Request to seal withdrawn by plaintiff. The Clerk will release the restrictions in place as to Dkt. 202-3, making the exhibit accessible to the public. FTR Time 2:00-2:28. Plaintiff Attorney Scott E. Perwin. Defendant Attorney Daniel B. Asimow, Emily H. Wood, Lara Palanjian, Karen Hoffman Lent, and Rafael Matias Langer-Osuna. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/8/2015)
July 7, 2015 Filing 218 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephone Conference held on 7/7/2015. Court Reporter Name n/a. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2015)
July 2, 2015 Filing 217 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #208 (Third Consolidated Corrected) byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Elkins, David) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 216 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #208 (Third Consolidated Corrected) of End-Payor Plaintiffs byActavis Plc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sunshine, Steven) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 215 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #208 (Third Consolidated Corrected) of End-Payor Plaintiffs byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 214 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
July 1, 2015 Filing 213 STIPULATED ORDER RE: APCO WORLDWIDE, INC. SUBPOENA by Hon. William H. Orrick adopting #212 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re APCO Worldwide, Inc. Subpoena filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 30, 2015 Filing 211 NOTICE by ALBERTSONS LLC, HEB Grocery Company LP, Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co Statement of Recent Decision (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case)(Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
June 29, 2015 Filing 210 NOTICE by City of Providence, Rhode Island Notice of Withdrawal of Derek Y. Brandt as Counsel of Record (Brandt, Derek) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
June 24, 2015 Filing 209 NOTICE of Change of Address by Bradley J Demuth (Demuth, Bradley) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 208 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected) Third Consolidated against Actavis Plc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 18, 2015 Filing 207 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byALBERTSONS LLC, HEB Grocery Company LP, Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 6/18/2015)
June 9, 2015 Filing 206 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Consolidated against Actavis Plc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed byEnd-Payor Plaintiffs'. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 6/9/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). See Docket Number #208 for Corrected 3rd Amended Complaint
June 5, 2015 Filing 205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc of Document Submitted for Filing Under Seal (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 204 Request for Judicial Notice re #183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Amended Complaint of Walgreen Co., et al. filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Related document(s) #183 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 203 REPLY (re #183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Amended Complaint of Walgreen Co., et al. ) filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted Version))(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A to Declaration of Daniel B. Asimow in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss or Stay Amended Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e) filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit A)(Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 to terminate motion and release 202-3; per oral withdrawal of request in motion hearing on 07/08/2015 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2015 Filing 201 ANSWER to #123 Second Amended Complaint DEFENDANTS ACTAVIS, INC.S (F/K/A WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.), WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.S, ANDA, INC.S, ANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.S, AND VALMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.S ANSWER TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES HEALTH ASSOCIATIONS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL byANDA Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Plc., Valmed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Sunshine, Steven) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2015 Filing 200 ANSWER to #123 Second Amended Complaint - Defendant Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc.'s and Defendant Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiff Government Employee Health Association's Second Amended Complaint byTeikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Teikoku Seiyaku Co., Ltd.. (Meckes, Joseph) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2015 Filing 199 ANSWER to #123 Second Amended Complaint of Government Employees Health Association byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/5/2015) Modified on 3/22/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2015 Filing 198 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Local 17 Hospitality Benefit Fund for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 197 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by DROGUERIA BETANCES, INC. for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Opper, Joseph) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 3, 2015 Filing 196 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint of Plaintiffs Rite Aid Corporation and Rite Aid Hdqtrs. Corp. filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
June 2, 2015 Filing 195 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William H. Orrick: Telephonic status conference conducted June 2, 2015. Court Reporter: n/a. Various discovery and procedural issues discussed. The Court directs that Actavis and Teikoku complete their production by July 10, 2015, with the privilege logs trailing slightly, subject to any good cause reason to extend them further. Similarly, the Court directs that Endo's main production be completed by July 17, 2015. Its supplementary production should be completed by August 1, 2015. The Court made July 17, 2015 the presumptive date for completion of all the plaintiffs' productions. Plaintiff Attorneys: David Nalven and Peter Kohn for Direct purchaser plaintiffs, Peter S.t Phillip for GEHA, and Dena Sharp for End payor plaintiffs. Defendant Attorneys: Joseph Meckes for Keikoku Pharma USA, Inc., Karen Lent for Actavis Plc., Daniel Asimow for Endo Pharmaceuticals, and Scott Perwin for Walgreen Co. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2015)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2015)
May 29, 2015 Filing 194 STATUS REPORT by All Parties. (Sharp, Christina) (Filed on 5/29/2015)
May 25, 2015 Filing 193 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OF THE OFFICIAL ELECTRONIC SOUND RECORDING - FTR 2:38-3:07 held on 04/22/2015, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Polvi, Telephone number 503.779.7406; email kpolvi@comcast.net. Tape Number: FTR 2:38-3:07. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #170 Transcript Order, #168 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2015. (Related documents(s) #170 , #168 ) (Polvi, Kelly) (Filed on 5/25/2015)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. William H. Orrick granting #186 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting reply deadline as to #183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Amended Complaint of Walgreen Co., et al.. Replies due by 6/5/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 22, 2015 Filing 190 RESPONSE (re #183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Amended Complaint of Walgreen Co., et al. ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay filed byALBERTSONS LLC, HEB Grocery Company LP, Safeway Inc., The Kroger Co., Walgreen Co. (Perwin, Scott) (Filed on 5/22/2015)
May 20, 2015 Filing 189 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Amended Complaint of Walgreen Co., et al. Extending Time for Defendants to File Reply in Support filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
May 19, 2015 Filing 188 EXHIBITS re #183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or Stay Amended Complaint of Walgreen Co., et al. - Redacted Exhibits A, B, C and D to the Declaration of Jody L. Travis filed byEndo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #183 ) (Asimow, Daniel) (Filed on 5/19/2015) </