The Wave Studio, LLC v. Visa, Inc.

Plaintiff: The Wave Studio, LLC
Defendant: Visa, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00239
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK filed by The Wave Studio, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/19/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Case Management Statement filed by The Wave Studio, LLC Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2015. Case Management Conference reset for 6/25/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/17/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Wave Studio, LLC v. Visa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wave Studio, LLC
Represented By: Amanda R. Conley
Represented By: Nate A. Garhart
Represented By: Vijay K. Toke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?