Racies v. Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Plaintiff: Phillip Racies
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00292
Filed: January 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting in part and denying in part 316 Stipulation Extending Time To File Stipulated Dismissal Of Plaintiffs Individual Claims. Motions due by 5/31/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting ( 308 309 and 311 ) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ( 268 and 271 ) MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND 269 MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE CLASSES. Telephonic Further Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2020 02:00 PM. All counsel shall use the following dial-in information to access the call: Dial-In: 888-808-6929/Passcode: 6064255. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 306 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Jeffrey S. Jacobson for Defendant. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(This order denies docket no. 263 ).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 291 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for his Reply in Support of 271 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 287 Stipulation Regarding Post-Trial Briefing and Hearing Schedule Re 268 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 271 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 269 MOTION Decertify the Class. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 270 FINAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING ( 201 , 202 ) Plaintiff's third and fourth motions in limine; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 204 Defendant's first motion in limine; GRANTING 205 Defendant's second motion in limine; and DENYING ( 240 , 245 ) Plaintiff's Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER FOR JURY MEALS DURING DELIBERATIONS. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/2/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL.(This order grants in part and denies in part docket no. 197 and denies docket nos. 203 , 208 ). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 195 Stipulation Re Exchange Of Demonstrative Exhibits For Trial. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Graham, Glenn. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 179 Administrative Motion Seeking Approval Of Agreed Upon Forms For Class Notice And Plan For Distribution. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 176 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 153 MOTION FOR BENCH TRIALCase Management Statement due by 2/12/2019 and Further Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 171 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jacobson, Jeffrey. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 168 Stipulation Regarding Resetting Hearing Date. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Granting Proposed Order Re Docket No. 165 Notice of Change in Counsel. Attorney Max A. Stein terminated. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/7/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 162 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(terminating 161 Motion for Pro Hac Vice). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 123 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATIONCase Management Statement due by 1/9/2018; Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2018 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE RENEWED ( 137 , 138 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2017)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 103 Stipulation Regarding Class Certification Briefing and Hearing Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 101 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Chang, Michael. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 94 Stipulation Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2016; Motions due by 6/16/2017;. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANT'S 70 DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFFS EXPERT EVIDENCE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT CONSOLIDATE THE RACIES AND MUSGRAVE CASES. Show Cause Response due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/20/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 73 Joint Stipulation Re Briefing Schedule For 70 Motion To Exclude Evidence, Opinions And Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Richard P. Bazinet. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Stipulation Re BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR ( 55 , 63 ) SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2015)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ORDER DENYING 57 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Djordjevic, Nada (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 50 Stipulated ESI ORDER (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 44 Case Management Conference - Initial. Motions due by 11/3/2015; Responses due by 11/24/2015; Replies due by 12/15/2021; Motion Hearing set for 12/31/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/1/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S 27 MOTION TO DISMISS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2015. Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2015 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/19/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, Case reassigned to Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/23/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Racies v. Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Racies
Represented By: Lindsey M Gomez
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Elaine A. Ryan
Represented By: Max A. Stein
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Syverson
Represented By: Stewart M. Weltman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quincy Bioscience, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?