Lucido v. Nestle Purina Pet Care Company
Plaintiff: Frank Lucido
Defendant: Nestle Purina Pet Care Company
Case Number: 3:2015cv00569
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (1) Granting 114 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 110 124 Defendant's Motions to Exclude the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Dr. Questen and Dr. Tegzes; and (3) Denying 215 217 219 Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record and Motion to Shorten Time. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 154 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SECOND ORDER re 154 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs' motion is granted in part and deferred in part. Defendant shall file a more specific declaration within a week.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER re 154 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/28/2016. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 109 Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Questen. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 (1) Set a Briefing Scheduling for the Motions to Strike Expert Testimony; etc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/2/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 Stipulation for Dismissal of Counts 44 and 45 only filed by Nestle Purina Pet Care Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re MSJ schedule and page limits. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER Re 99 Plaintiffs' Letter of June 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER 92 RE EXCHANGE OF EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/9/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER 79 : Further Case Management Conference continued from 4/28/3016 to 5/5/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Conference Statement due 4/28/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 Stipulation for dismissal for Plaintiffs David Balmer, Pat Kelly, Karen Baker only. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/12/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Plaintiff Richard Carter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Nestle Purina Pet Care Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO 4 PLAINTIFFS ONLY re 71 Stipulation filed by Reggie Smith, Regina Bollinger, Jennifer Hickey. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Frank Lucido, Motions terminated: 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint filed by Frank Lucido, 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Frank Lucido.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucido v. Nestle Purina Pet Care Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle Purina Pet Care Company
Represented By: Dale Joseph Giali
Represented By: Andrea M Weiss
Represented By: Carmine R. Zarlenga, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Lucido
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?