California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Gateway Frontline Services, Inc., d/b/a Gateway Group One
Plaintiff: California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund, David Huertas, Charles Gilchrist, David Stilwell, Raymond Nann and Larry Smith
Defendant: Gateway Frontline Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00973
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/21/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 STIPULATION AND JOINT REQUEST TO MODIFY PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER. Dispositive Motions to be heard due by 8/23/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 11/1/2017 08:00 AM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/25/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Stipulation. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 7/5/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 9/20/2017 08:00 AM before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/22/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/30/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 STIPULATION continuing Case Management Conference and Deadline to Complete Mediation. The deadline to complete mediation is continued to October 2, 2015. Case Management Conference continued to 11/3/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/08/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference continued to 10/6/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/01/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/28/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Gateway Frontline Services, Inc., d/b/a Gateway Group One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Service Employees Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Huertas
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Gilchrist
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stilwell
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Nann
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Anne M. Bevington
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Frontline Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?