Duguid v. Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: Noah Duguid
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00985
Filed: March 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 104 Motion to Set Aside. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 65 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 70 Stipulated Request for Modification of the Briefing Schedule and Rescheduling of Case Management Order. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Request for Order Extending Facebook's Time to Respons and Briefing Schedule filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 24 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE re 45 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Extension of Time in Which to Intervene filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 14, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulated Request for Order Changing the Dates of Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 5, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2015)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule filed by Noah Duguid. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 1, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duguid v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Duguid
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?