Ashton Woods Holdings L.L.C. et al v. USG Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Ashton Woods Holdings L.L.C., Beazer Homes Holdings Corp., D.R. Horton Los Angeles Holding Company, Inc., Hovnanian Enterprises, Inc., KB Home, Meritage Homes Corporation, M/I Homes, Inc., Pulte Home Corporation, Drees Company, Ryland Group, Inc., Toll Brothers, Inc. and TRI Pointe Homes, Inc.
Defendant: USG Corporation, New NGC, Inc., Lafarge North America, Inc., Continental Building Products, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, American Gypsum Company LLC, Tin, Inc. and Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv01247
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 136 Stipulation of Dismissal. This terminates docket no. 129 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 124 Stipulation Between Plaintiffs and L&W Regarding Dismissal of L&W. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING 82 MOTION FOR LIVE-STREAMED TRIAL TESTIMONY AND DENYING AS MOOT ( 91 , 97 , 92 , and 98 ) MOTIONS TO INTERVENE AND SHORTEN TIME. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Tulsi Gaonkar. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 95 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Laura Sexton. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2021)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 103 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT TRIAL ESTIMATES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/26/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2021)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 83 (Unopposed) Motion to Shorten Time. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/8/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 77 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Coggins, Paul. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2021)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 72 RENEWED MOTION TO SEAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2021)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Houtz, Lester. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Addy, Sundeep. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashton Woods Holdings L.L.C. et al v. USG Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Woods Holdings L.L.C.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beazer Homes Holdings Corp.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.R. Horton Los Angeles Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hovnanian Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KB Home
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meritage Homes Corporation
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M/I Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pulte Home Corporation
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drees Company
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryland Group, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toll Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRI Pointe Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Lawrence Butler
Represented By: John Theodore Ceglia
Represented By: Cindy Zone Reichline
Represented By: Brian Russell Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USG Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New NGC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafarge North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Building Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Gypsum Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?